Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/18/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
11/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 11-35707
|
11/18/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 11-35709
|
11/21/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Greenberg Traurig. Check no. 517734. | | |
11/22/2011 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | | 11-36109
|
11/29/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 11-36612
|
01/11/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 19, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. | | 12-01022
|
01/17/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Respondent's Status of Court Employee. | | 12-01679
|
01/23/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a "Notice of Respondent's Status as Court Employee." This court has reviewed the notice and is aware of respondent's employment status. It does not appear that any further action is required at this time. | | 12-02253
|
01/25/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 26, 2012. | | 12-02746
|
06/04/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests a 90 day extension for this appeal to remain in the settlement program in order for the parites to complete negotiations. | | 12-17406
|
06/06/2012 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to August 20, 2012. | | 12-17684
|
08/20/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 29, 2012 at 2:00 pm. | | 12-26181
|
08/30/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests that this case remain in the settlement program for an additional 45 days. | | 12-27573
|
12/27/2012 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We approve an extension to the amount of time this matter amy be assigned to the settlement program. Final Status Report due within 30 days. | | 12-41017
|
02/13/2013 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Counsel report that the parties are making substantial progress toward a settlment and will file a motion that the case remain in the settlement program for an additional period of time. The delays have been caused by illness and travel schedules. | | 13-04732
|
02/15/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time for Settlement Conference. | | 13-04937
|
02/28/2013 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to May15, 2013. We note that this motion is the third request for an extension of time for this appeal to remain in the settlement program and that this matter has been pending in the settlement program significantly longer than the time limits set forth in NRAP 16(f). Accordingly, no further extensions will be granted. If the settlement judge's report does not indicate that the parties have agreed to a settlement, this matter shall proceed to briefing. | | 13-06270
|
05/15/2013 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 13-14323
|
05/15/2013 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 10 days transcript request; 60 days opening brief and appendix. | | 13-14398
|
05/30/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Additional Transcript is Being Requested. | | 13-15952
|
07/15/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. | | 13-20612
|
07/15/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: August 14, 2013. | | 13-20617
|
08/14/2013 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief of Appellant. | | 13-23968
|
08/14/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. | | 13-23972
|
08/16/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Appendix Volume 1 to Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 13-24146
|
08/16/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service Certificate of Service | | 13-24294
|
09/10/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | | 13-26672
|
09/10/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: October 14, 2013. | | 13-26675
|
10/10/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 13-30268
|
10/23/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall have until October 28, 2013, to file and serve the answering brief. | | 13-31891
|
10/24/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). | | 13-32120
|
11/08/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall have until November 27, 2013, to file and serve the answering brief. | | 13-33606
|
11/26/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Fourth Request). | | 13-35706
|
12/20/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until December 30, 2013, to file and serve the answering brief. | | 13-38840
|
12/30/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | | 13-39547
|
01/17/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall have until February 13, 2014, to file and serve the answering brief. | | 14-01840
|
01/21/2014 | Other | Chief Justice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. | | |
02/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | | 14-03995
|
03/28/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate with Case No. 63804. | | 14-09872
|
03/31/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on March 3, 2014. | | 14-10014
|
03/31/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 14-10016
|
04/29/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: May 7, 2014. | | 14-13855
|
05/06/2014 | Motion | Filed for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 14-14645
|
06/13/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on May 22, 2104, in Docket No. 59691. To the extent that respondent, in his response to the motion to consolidate, seeks to have the appeal in Docket No. 63804 dismissed, that request is denied. fn1[In light of this order, the briefing schedule in Docket No. 63804 is vacated.] Nos. 59691/63804. | | 14-19569
|
06/13/2014 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 59691/63804. | | 14-19570
|
06/13/2014 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 59691/63804. | | |
07/22/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. Nos. 59691/63804. | | 14-23751
|
01/20/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This appeal may be assigned to the court of appeals for disposition. Each party shall have until January 27, 2015, to file a written statement of no more than 500 words. No extensions of time will be granted. Nos. 59691/63804. | | 15-01912
|
01/27/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Statement Re Court Assignment. Nos. 59691/63804. | | 15-02886
|
01/30/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals. We direct the clerk of this court to assign these appeals to the Court of Appeals for disposition. Nos. 59691/63804 | | 15-03322
|
04/07/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Fn19[We further deny each party's request for attorney fees on appeal, and Hunter's motion to strike Gang's notices of supplemental authorities.] Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Silver. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Nos. 59691/63804 | | |
05/02/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 59691/63804. | | |
05/02/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 59691/63804. | | 16-13561
|
05/02/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 59691/63804. | | |
05/20/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 5, 2016. | | 16-13561
|
08/08/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.) | | |