Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
12/28/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. | | 12-41103
|
12/28/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 12-41105
|
01/14/2013 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. | | 13-01443
|
01/17/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Regarding Filing Fee. Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Appellant must first seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court. Appellant is cautioned that his failure either to properly seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court or to pay the filing fee within 30 days will result in the dismissal of this appeal. | | 13-01894
|
02/26/2013 | Order/Incoming | Filed Copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on February 1, 2013. | | 13-05963
|
02/26/2013 | Case Status Update | Pilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days. | | |
03/28/2013 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 13-09277
|
05/30/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due from district court clerk: 30 days. | | 13-15935
|
06/07/2013 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 1. | | 13-16736
|
06/07/2013 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 2. | | 13-16737
|
06/07/2013 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 3. | | 13-16738
|
06/07/2013 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 4. | | 13-16739
|
06/07/2013 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
09/18/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. The court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would benefit the court's review. If appellant does not wish to have pro bono counsel, appellant shall so advise the court in writing within 30 days of the date of this order. The clerk shall transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Appellate Law Section, Pro Bono Committee, State Bar of Nevada, for selection of pro bono counsel who shall, if pro bono counsel is accepted, enter an appearance for purposes of this appeal only within 30 days from the date of this order. This court shall establish a revised briefing schedule. Pro bono counsel shall appear at oral argument. This appeal no longer stands submitted for a decision on the appeal statement. The appeal is stayed pending further order of this court. | | 13-27686
|
11/08/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Status Report Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct appellant Bryan Fergason to file a written statement in this court within 15 days from the date of this order stating whether he wants to have a pro bono attorney appointed to represent him in this appeal or wants to continue to proceed without legal representation. We further direct the Pro Bono Committee to file a status report in this court within 30 days of this order. | | 13-33617
|
11/20/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice: Appellants Written Statement in Response to Court's Written Order of November 8, 2013. | | 13-35017
|
12/05/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Pro Bono Committee Status Report. | | 13-36659
|
12/10/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Ryan Daniels, Esq. appearing Pro Bono on behalf of Appellant, Bryan Fergason). | | 13-37175
|
12/23/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Compliance with NRAP 9 and Setting Briefing Schedule. We vacate the stay of this appeal imposed by our September 18, 2013, order. Appellant: Transcript Request due: 14 days; Opening Brief due: 120 days. Appellant shall state on the cover page of the opening brief whether it is a replacement brief or a supplement to appellant's previously filed proper person appeal statement. | | 13-38911
|
01/06/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/13/12. To Court Reporter: Jill Jacoby. | | 14-00356
|
01/27/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/13/12. | | 14-02745
|
04/24/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until April 29, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 14-13238
|
04/29/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Replacement Opening Brief. | | 14-13790
|
04/29/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume I. | | 14-13791
|
05/06/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Micah S. Echols, Esq. appearing on behalf of Respondent, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Dept). | | 14-14600
|
05/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 14-14602
|
05/28/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall have until July14, 2014, to file and serve the answering brief. | | 14-17170
|
07/15/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 14-22878
|
07/15/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service -Certificate of Service (Respondent's Appendix). | | 14-22880
|
07/15/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief -Respondent's Appendix, Volume 1. (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 8/25/14). | | |
07/15/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief -Respondent's Appendix, Volume 2. (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 8/25/14). | | |
07/15/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief -Respondent's Appendix, Volume 3. (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 8/25/14). | | |
07/23/2014 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Court to Take Judicial Notice. | | 14-24052
|
07/29/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file answering brief, provisionally received in this court on July 22, 2014. Fn1[We defer ruling on the July 23, 2014, motion to take judicial notice.] | | 14-24665
|
07/29/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 14-24667
|
08/25/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Take Judicial Notice and Striking Respondent's Appendix. | | 14-28018
|
08/27/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until September 5, 2014, to file and serve the reply brief. | | 14-28267
|
09/02/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Stay Briefing Schedule Pending Resolution of LVMPD's District Court Motion to Settle the Record Pursuant to NRAP 10(c). | | 14-28689
|
09/11/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule. Respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a motion to clarify the record in the district court under NRAP 10(c) and provide this court with a certified copy of the district court's order resolving the motion. Within that same time period, respondent shall file a motion in this court to either supplement the record with a supplemental appendix or file an amended answering brief. | | 14-30119
|
11/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Reinstate Respondent's Appendix in Part and Notice of Filing Amended Answering Brief. | | 14-36770
|
11/13/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Reinstate Respondent's Appendix in Part and Granting Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answering Brief. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental appendix. We direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's amended answering brief received on November 6, 2014. We hereby reinstate the briefing schedule in this appeal. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 14-37380
|
11/13/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. | | 14-37384
|
11/14/2014 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 1. | | 14-37597
|
11/14/2014 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 2. | | 14-37598
|
11/14/2014 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 3. | | 14-37599
|
12/11/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 14-40474
|
12/11/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: January 14, 2015. | | 14-40479
|
12/17/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (Bailey Kennedy in place and stead of Ryan Daniels, Esq). | | 14-41121
|
01/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 15-00887
|
01/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Reply Brief due: March 2, 2015. | | 15-02612
|
01/29/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. | | 15-03128
|
03/02/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-06524
|
03/02/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
08/28/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 13, 2015, at 3:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 15-26111
|
09/22/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument, Paul C. Williams of Bailey Kennedy on behalf of Appellant Bryan Fergason. | | 15-28653
|
09/30/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 15-29568
|
10/06/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. Michah S. Echols, Esq. of Marquis Aurbach Coffing will be appearing on behalf of Respondent, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Dept. | | 15-30214
|
10/13/2015 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP15-NS/KP/MG. | | |
12/24/2015 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed "Reversed and Remanded." Before Saitta, Gibbons, and Pickering, JJ. Author: Pickering, J., 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 94. NNP15. | | 15-39564
|
01/20/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-01943
|
01/20/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
02/02/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 27, 2016. | | 16-01943
|
03/24/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers dated March 21, 2016, with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65390/62357/66410/66474/62931/64946/67331/65143/62649. (Letter entered in 65390 as document no. 16-09339) | | |