Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/19/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
09/19/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-28984
|
09/19/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 16-28986
|
09/19/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 16-28988
|
09/19/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jeffrey Albregts. Check No. 1115. | | |
09/19/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 16-29043
|
09/21/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | | 16-29307
|
09/29/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-30332
|
10/03/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 14, 2016 at 10:00 am. | | 16-30721
|
10/11/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Attorney's Updated Telephone Numbers (Jeffrey Albregts). | | 16-31663
|
10/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court issued a notice directing appellant to file a case appeal statement. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. | | 16-32084
|
10/17/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-32382
|
10/20/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-32921
|
11/21/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 16-36168
|
11/29/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/13/16-6/15/16. To Court Reporter: None listed. | | 16-36923
|
12/30/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Judy Chappell stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/13/16, 06/14/16, 06/15/16. | | 16-40568
|
02/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Opening Brief and Appendix. On October 20, 2016, we entered an order reinstating the briefing of this appeal and directing appellant to file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 18, 2017. To date, Appellant has failed to comply. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 20 days. | | 17-04971
|
02/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Unopposed) Motion To Continue Deadline For Opening Brief (Second Request). | | 17-06173
|
02/28/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief & Appendix due: April 3, 2017. | | 17-06803
|
04/03/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Opening Brief. | | 17-10979
|
04/03/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol 1. | | 17-11064
|
04/03/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol II. | | 17-11065
|
04/03/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol III. | | 17-11066
|
04/03/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol IV. | | 17-11067
|
04/03/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol V. | | 17-11069
|
04/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol VI. | | 17-11076
|
04/18/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time For Respondent to File Answering Brief. | | 17-12815
|
04/18/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 2, 2017. | | 17-12824
|
04/25/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. The law firm of Lawrence J. Semenza, III. P.C. has changed its name to Semenza Kircher Rickard. | | 17-13755
|
06/02/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 17-18346
|
06/06/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 16, 2017. | | 17-18701
|
06/16/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 17-20063
|
06/16/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume I. | | 17-20064
|
06/16/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume II. | | 17-20065
|
06/16/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume III. | | 17-20066
|
06/16/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume IV. | | 17-20067
|
07/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipluation to Extend Time For Appellant to File Reply Brief. | | 17-23677
|
07/25/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 21, 2017. | | 17-24612
|
08/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant LaBarbera's Reply Brief. | | 17-27986
|
08/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/13/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol 1 (Pages 143 to 195). | | 17-38895
|
01/03/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 18-00281
|
01/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 14, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-02764
|
02/27/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-07598
|
03/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion To Postpone Oral Argument. | | 18-09586
|
03/12/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for Wednesday, March 14, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the Northern Panel on the next available argument calendar. | | 18-09645
|
03/21/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 18-11105
|
05/22/2018 | Other | Justice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. | | |
07/19/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. NNP18-MD/KP/JH | | 18-27541
|
08/13/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-31078
|
08/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
08/24/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2018. | | 18-31078
|