Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
01/05/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-00579
|
01/05/2018 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges. | | |
01/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-00581
|
01/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 18-00583
|
01/08/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Brandon L Phillips. Check no. 1104. | | |
01/08/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-01000
|
01/09/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 18-01066
|
01/10/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Minutes of December 5, 2017. | | 18-01417
|
01/10/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin. | | 18-01457
|
01/16/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Steven A. Gibson, Esq. and Jodi Donetta Lowry, Esq. hereby appear as attorneys of record for Defendant Gibson Lowry Burris LLP, a non-existent entity. | | 18-02073
|
01/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 18-02881
|
02/01/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Attorney Ryan Lower's Notice Regarding Modification of Caption. | | 18-04536
|
02/05/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 18-04834
|
02/07/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 18-05153
|
02/08/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Appellants have failed to file the docketing statement when due. Docketing statement due: 10 days. | | 18-05202
|
02/26/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-07280
|
02/26/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/26/17, 12/5/17. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. | | 18-07358
|
05/10/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 23, 2018. | | 18-17729
|
05/24/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to Filing Opening Brief. | | 18-19917
|
05/31/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. | | 18-20757
|
06/04/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 6, 2018. | | 18-21145
|
06/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Allow Late Filing of Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 18-21792
|
06/14/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Allow Late Filing of Opening Brief and Appendix | | 18-22842
|
06/20/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 22, 2018. | | 18-23642
|
06/21/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. | | 18-23681
|
06/21/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. | | 18-23684
|
06/21/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. | | 18-23690
|
06/21/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. | | 18-23691
|
06/21/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. | | 18-23692
|
06/26/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents Dickinson Wright, PLLC, Jodi Donetta Lowry, Jonathan M.A. Salls, Eric Dobberstein, and Michael G. Vartanian's Motion to Correct Caption. | | 18-24467
|
07/09/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents, Dickinson Wright, PLLC, Jodi Donetta Lowry, Jonathan M.A. Salls, Eric Dobberstein, and Michael G. Vartanian have filed a motion for an order removing "Gibson/Lowery, Burress, LLP (now known as Gibson Lowry, LLP)" and "Steve A. Gibson, Esq." from the caption of this appeal. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption on the docket to conform with the caption on this order. | | 18-25856
|
07/23/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 18-27904
|
07/23/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. | | 18-27905
|
08/27/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Allow The Late Filing of Reply Brief. | | 18-33512
|
08/31/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 4, 2018. | | 18-34174
|
09/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 18-34493
|
09/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. | | 18-35321
|
09/11/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
03/21/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC). | | 19-12521
|
06/13/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish, J.135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. EN BANC (SC) | | 19-25580
|
07/01/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Reheairng of Decision Reversing and Remanding the District Court's Order Granting Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-28205
|
07/01/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Steve L. Morris. (SC) | | |
07/22/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 19-30720
|
08/05/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-32923
|
09/06/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC). | | 19-37414
|
10/01/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-40739
|
10/01/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
10/11/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 7, 2019. (SC) | | 19-40739
|