Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Cary Colt Payne, Chtd. Check no. 1034. | | |
05/04/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 18-17115
|
05/04/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 18-17118
|
05/07/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | | 18-17197
|
05/17/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Anthony L Barney Ltd. Check no. 4803. (Cross-Appeal) | | |
05/17/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 18-18892
|
05/21/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 23, 2018, at 1:00 pm. | | 18-19258
|
06/01/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Appellant-cross respondent: due date - 10 days. | | 18-20945
|
06/07/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' (Raymond Christian, Susan Christian-Payne, Rosemary Keach) Docketing Statement. | | 18-21793
|
06/11/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to respondent/cross-appellant to file Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | | 18-22090
|
06/13/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Modifying Caption. Upon review of the documents before this court, including the parties' case appeal statements and appellants' docketing statement, it appears that Jacqueline Utkin, trustee, has not filed a notice of appeal and thus is properly named as a respondent, only, to both the appeal and the cross-appeal. Accordingly, the clerk of this court is directed to modify the caption of this docket to reflect the caption on this order. If any party is of the opinion that the caption, as modified, does not accurately reflect the status of the parties to this matter, that party shall notify this court in writing within 11 days of the date of this order. | | 18-22437
|
06/19/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-23383
|
09/18/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/4/18. | | 18-36443
|
10/04/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 18-39043
|
10/12/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellants and cross-appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent Jacqueline Utkin shall have 30 days from the date when appellants' opening brief is served to file an answering brief on appeal, and 30 days from the date when cross-appellant's combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal is served to file an answering brief on cross-appeal. If Utkin does not intend to file an answering brief on appeal and/or cross-appeal, she may so inform the court, in writing, within those same timeframes. | | 18-40182
|
10/18/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/19/17, 12/08/17, 01/17/18, 03/15/18, 04/04/18. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice. | | 18-41113
|
11/01/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/08/17. | | 18-43007
|
11/28/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/19/17, 01/17/18 and 03/15/18. (SC) | | 18-906056
|
12/03/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/17/18, 03/15/18, 10/19/17. (SC) | | 18-906733
|
01/09/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-01389
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Master Index to Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix. (SC) | | 19-01391
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-01451
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-01452
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-01453
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 4a. (SC) | | 19-01454
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 4b. (SC) | | 19-01455
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-01456
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-01457
|
01/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 7a. (SC) | | 19-01458
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 7b. (SC) | | 19-01464
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-01466
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-01467
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-01468
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-01469
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-01472
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 13a. (SC) | | 19-01473
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 13b. (SC) | | 19-01474
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 13c. (SC) | | 19-01475
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 13d. (SC) | | 19-01476
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 14a. (SC) | | 19-01477
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 14b. (SC) | | 19-01478
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 15. (SC) | | 19-01480
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 16. (SC) | | 19-01481
|
01/10/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume 17. (SC) | | 19-01482
|
01/15/2019 | Motion | Filed Attorney Jerimy Kirshcner & Associates, PLLC's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondent Jacqueline Utkin. (SC) | | 19-02301
|
01/24/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Caption. The clerk shall remove attorney Jerimy Kirschner and Jerimy Kirschner & Associates as counsel of record for Jacqueline Utkin. Appellants and cross-appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court in writing whether Ms. Utkin remains a party to this appeal. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 19-03700
|
01/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Response Regarding Respondent Utkin. (SC) | | 19-04736
|
02/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order Granting Motion and Regarding Caption. (SC) | | 19-05212
|
02/04/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Notice of Entry of Order. (SC) | | 19-05223
|
02/13/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Russel Geist as counsel for The Christian Family Trust). (SC) | | 19-06694
|
02/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Jacqueline Utkin shall remain a party to this appeal at this time. Ms. Utkin shall have 15 days from the date of this order to retain substitute counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. If no notice of appearance is filed on behalf of Ms. Utkin within this time period, Ms. Utkin shall proceed pro se in this appeal. Ms. Utkin shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief on appeal. Cross-appellant Anthony L. Barney, Ltd. shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Ms. Utkin shall have 30 days from service of the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal to file an answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 19-07071
|
03/18/2019 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Jacqueline Utkin's Document Asking to be Removed. (SC) | | 19-11925
|
03/27/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 05/07/19 ORDER). | | |
03/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC) | | 19-13650
|
03/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC) | | 19-13651
|
03/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC) | | 19-13652
|
03/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC) | | 19-13653
|
04/10/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Strike Combined Answering Brief/Cross Appeal Opening Brief, Dismiss Cross Appeal, Etc., and Stay of Briefing Pending Resolution. (SC) | | 19-15674
|
05/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Dismissing Cross-Appeal. Appellants/cross-respondents have filed a motion seeking to strike respondent/cross-appellant Anthony L. Barney, Ltd.'s combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal filed on March 27, 2019, and to dismiss Barney's cross-appeal. Appellants argue that respondent Jaqueline Utkin has refused to participate in the appeal, and such refusal should be construed as a confession of error. This court concludes that Barney's and Utkin's failure to oppose the motion constitutes an admission that the motion is meritorious, and grants the motion. Appellants/cross-respondents' appeal is dismissed as to Anthony L. Barney, Ltd. only. Anthony L. Barney, Ltd's cross-appeal is dismissed in its entirety, and the clerk shall strike its combined brief filed on March 27, 2019. March 18, 2019, in response to this court's February 14, 2019, order directing her to retain counsel or notify this court if she will be proceeding in pro se, Ms. Utkin filed a document, dated March 12, 2019, stating "I'm opting out?Please remove me." Accordingly, this appeal will be resolved on the opening brief and appendix filed January 9, 2019, and without an answering brief from Ms. Utkin. This court may treat Ms. Utkin's failure to file an answering brief as a confession of error. The clerk shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. (SC). | | 19-20035
|
05/07/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
05/10/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Sanctions and Award of Attorney's Fees. (SC) | | 19-20490
|
05/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion for Sanctions/Fees; Countermotion to Strike Motion and/or Deny Relief. (SC) | | 19-21632
|
05/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply to Appellant's Response to Motion for Sanctions and Award of Attorney's Fees; Response to Countermotion to Strike motion and/or Deny Relief. (SC) | | 19-21952
|
06/07/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Ingrid Ramos / Transcript Video Service stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/24/19. (SC) | | 19-24857
|
06/18/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Barney has now filed a motion for sanctions and attorney fees. Appellants have filed an opposition and countermotion to strike Barney's motion and for sanctions, and Barney has filed a reply. This court declines to strike Barney's motion and declines to impose sanctions or award fees to Barney or appellants. (SC) | | 19-26323
|
10/23/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Parties to Appeal. We reinstate the appeal as to Barney, Ltd. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption on this docket to include Anthony L. Barney, Ltd., as a respondent. Barney, Ltd., shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a new answering brief on appeal. Appellants shall have 14 days from when the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. We hereby dismiss the appeal as to Jacqueline Utkin. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file any motion to substitute the current trustee in her place. (SC) | | 19-43766
|
10/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Substitution of Party. (SC) | | 19-44425
|
10/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service of Motion to Substitute Party. (SC) | | 19-44442
|
11/06/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED - CERT. OF COMPLIANCE DOES NOT SPECIFY WORD COUNT). (SC) | | |
11/06/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-45636
|
11/06/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 2. (REJECTED - DOCUMENT PARTS IN THE WRONG SEQUENCE). (SC) | | |
11/06/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-45639
|
11/06/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-45640
|
11/06/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent Law Offices of Anthony L. Barney, Ltd.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-45670
|
11/06/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-45671
|
11/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Strike Barney Answering Brief; Alternatively Clarify Court's Order; Request Extension of Time for Trustee Substitution and Response. (SC) | | 19-47365
|
11/20/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Substitution. The clerk of this court shall add Fredrick P. Waid, Trustee of the Christian Family Trust, as a respondent to this appeal. Waid shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief, joinder to Anthony L. Barney, Ltd.'s answering brief, or notice that no answering brief will be filed. If an answering brief is filed, appellants shall have 7 days from the date that it is served to file and serve any reply. fn1 [The court defers ruling on appellants' November 19, 2019, motion to strike answering brief and clarify court's order.] (SC). | | 19-47471
|
11/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Response and Opposition to Motion to Strike Barney Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-48340
|
12/11/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Frederick P. Ward's Notice That No Answering Brief Will Be Filed. (SC) | | 19-50248
|
12/17/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Strike and Clarify. Appellants have filed a motion seeking three things: to strike the answering brief, clarification, and an extension of time for trustee substitution and response. First, appellants seek to strike Barney, Ltd.'s answering brief. The motion is denied. Second, appellants seek clarification, arguing that Barney, Ltd., should not be allowed to participate in this appeal. While appellants point to caselaw stating that a non-party may not appeal, they cite to nothing indicating that a non-party may not defend its judgment as a respondent to an appeal against it. Moreover, whether Barney, Ltd., had standing below is a question that goes to the merits of this appeal. Third, to the extent appellants seek additional time to substitute in the current trustee and for him to respond, the motion is denied as moot. Finally, Barney, Ltd., has improperly sought relief in the form of dismissal in the context of its opposition to appellants' motion. The request is denied. (SC). | | 19-51064
|
12/17/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-51087
|
12/17/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/16/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (VACATED PER 9/30/20 ORDER). (SC). | | 20-14596
|
04/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Decision Pursuant to NRAP 36(F). (SC) | | 20-16261
|
05/04/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-16778
|
05/04/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Anthony L. Barney. (SC) | | |
06/01/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion and Granting Petition for Rehearing. Appellants have filed a motion for this court to publish that order as an opinion. We deny the motion. Respondents have petitioned this court for rehearing of the order of reversal and remand. Having considered the petition for rehearing, we have determined that rehearing of this matter is warranted. Accordingly, we grant the petition for rehearing and submit this matter for decision on rehearing without further briefing or oral argument. (SC). | | 20-20467
|
09/30/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [Accordingly, we vacate our April 16, 2020, order of reversal and remand.] NNP20- RP/JH/EC. (SC) | | 20-35904
|
10/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (SC) | | 20-37830
|
12/03/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Hardesty, Parraguirre and Cadish, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. fn1[Respondent Anthony L. Barney, Ltd., subsequently filed a motion to publish the order as an opinion. We grant the motion and replace our earlier order with this opinion.] 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 73. NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC) | | 20-43713
|
12/28/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-46581
|
12/28/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/12/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 30, 2020. (SC) | | 20-46581
|