Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
06/20/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) | | |
06/20/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-23581
|
06/20/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days. | | 18-23583
|
07/02/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. John R. Blackmon, Esq., of Blackmon Law Group appearing as counsel for respondent. | | 18-24894
|
07/06/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Alex B. Ghibaudo. Check no. 1019. | | |
07/06/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-25707
|
07/06/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | | 18-25725
|
07/11/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Corrected Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. | | 18-26288
|
08/02/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Corrected Case Appeal Statement and Docketing Statement due: 10 days. | | 18-29687
|
08/22/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 18-32784
|
08/24/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time (Amended Notice of Appeal, Amended Case Appeal Statement, Docketing Statement, Transcript Request). | | 18-33232
|
08/28/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Concluding Settlement Proceedings. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Briefing and requesting of transcripts remains suspended pending further order of this court. | | 18-33639
|
09/13/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion and to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the case appeal statement, docketing statement, and transcript request form. This court is unable to extend the time to file a notice of appeal except as provided in NRAP 4(c). Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. | | 18-35859
|
09/20/2018 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 1090 returned to Alex B. Ghibaudo. | | |
09/20/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA) (SEALED) | | |
09/20/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Amended to Second NOA) (SEALED) | | |
09/26/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-37602
|
09/26/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/13/17, 6/14/17, 4/24/18 and 5/29/18. To Court Reporter: Kim Gurule. | | 18-37604
|
09/26/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Notice of Filing Amended Case Appeal Statement, Docketing Statement, and Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 18-37605
|
11/05/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC). | | 18-902718
|
12/03/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/10/18 and 08/31/18. To Court Reporter: Kim Gurule. | | 18-906680
|
12/28/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 18, 2019. (SC). | | 18-910783
|
12/31/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Court Reporter Transcript Video Services' Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: January 28, 2019. (SC). | | 18-910878
|
01/08/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Court Reporter's Statement Regarding Supreme Court Overdue Court Reporter Certificate. (SC) | | 19-01079
|
01/22/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 19-03154
|
01/29/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-04414
|
01/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appendix and Motion to Amend Opening Brief to Properly Reference the Appendix. (SC) | | 19-04415
|
02/12/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/24/18, 05/29/18, 07/10/18, 08/31/18, 06/13/17, 06/14/17. (SC). | | 19-06471
|
02/14/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 5, 2019. (SC) | | 19-07075
|
03/06/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeals and Stay Respondent's Responding Brief Deadline Pending this Court's Decision on this Here Motion. (SC) | | 19-09977
|
04/15/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Affirmative Relief in the Form of Sanctions Against Respondent and Her Counsel for Dilatory Tactics, Undue Delay, and Bad Faith Conduct (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/16/19). (SC) | | |
04/16/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Affirmative Relief in the Form of Sanctions Against Respondent and her Counsel for Dilatory Tactics, Undue Delay, and Bad Faith Conduct). (SC) | | 19-16613
|
04/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Affirmative Relief in the Form of Sanctions Against Respondent and Her Counsel for Dilatory Tactics, Undue Delay, and Bad Faith Conduct. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/18/19). (SC) | | |
04/18/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Affirmative Relief in the Form of Sanctions Against Respondent and Her Counsel for Dilatory Tactics, Undue Delay, and Bad Faith Conduct.). (SC) | | 19-17135
|
04/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File An Opposition and Countermotion to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-17441
|
04/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Affirmative Relief in the Form of Sanctions Against Respondent and Her Counsel for Dilatory Tactics, Undue Delay, and Bad Faith Conduct. (SC) | | 19-17442
|
04/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Affirmative Relief in the Form of Sanctions Against Respondent and her Counsel for Dilatory Tactics, Undue Delay, and Bad Faith Conduct. (SC) | | 19-18799
|
05/10/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Filing of an Opposition to the Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File an Opposition and Countermotion to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-20650
|
08/23/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion for leave to file an amended opening brief is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the amended opening brief and appendix received via e-flex on February 22, 2019. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. fn1 [Cause appearing, and despite respondent's objection, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opposition is granted. The opposition was filed on April 22, 2019. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to oppose the motion for an extension of time is denied as moot.] fn2 [Appellant's request for sanctions is denied. Respondent's motion for a stay pending resolution of the motion to dismiss is denied as moot.] (SC). | | 19-35386
|
08/23/2019 | Brief | Filed Second Amended Opening Brief. (SC). | | 19-35387
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume I. (SC). | | 19-35388
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume II. (SC). | | 19-35389
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume III. (SC). | | 19-35390
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume IV. (SC). | | 19-35391
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume V. (SC). | | 19-35392
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume VI. (SC). | | 19-35393
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume VII. (SC). | | 19-35394
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume VIII. (SC). | | 19-35395
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume IX. (SC). | | 19-35396
|
08/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume X. (SC). | | 19-35397
|
09/20/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 7, 2019. (SC) | | 19-39329
|
10/07/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-41526
|
10/22/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-43751
|
10/23/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/29/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorney. Emily McFarling, Esq. of McFarling Law Group substituting as counsel for respondent. (SC) | | 19-44405
|
12/23/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 28 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal from the September 4 order validating the prenuptial agreement in part should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days of service of the response. (SC). | | 19-51805
|
01/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause Why This Appeal Should Not Be Dismissed. (SC) | | 20-02918
|
02/06/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: February 19, 2020. (SC). | | 20-05163
|
02/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-06251
|
03/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal in Part. Because the September 4 order is not a final judgment, this court lacks jurisdiction over the appeal from that order. Accordingly, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED in part." fn1 [This appeal may proceed as to the appeal from the September 7, 2018, order denying the motion to relocate with the minor child.] SNP20-MG/LS/AS. (SC). | | 20-08328
|
04/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC). | | 20-15625
|
04/24/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP20-MG/LS/AS. (SC). | | 20-15670
|
05/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File A Petition For Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-18988
|
05/19/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-18991
|
05/19/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Alex B. Ghibaudo. (SC) | | |
05/22/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). The petition for rehearing was filed on May 19, 2020. (SC). | | 20-19593
|
07/01/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC). | | 20-24325
|
07/27/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-27164
|
07/27/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
08/11/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 29, 2020. (SC) | | 20-27164
|