Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/25/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/25/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-08460
|
02/25/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-08462
|
02/26/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 19-08904
|
03/04/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Robert D Vannah Chartered. Check no. 5355. (SC) | | |
03/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 19-09656
|
03/05/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Jonathon Nitz. (SC). | | 19-09868
|
03/25/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-13085
|
04/02/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Settlement program (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/02/19). (SC). | | |
04/02/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 77678/78176. (SC). | | 19-14438
|
04/02/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program). (SC). | | 19-14450
|
04/03/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 19, 2019, at 1:00 pm. Case Nos. 77678/78176. (SC). | | 19-14510
|
04/03/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Cross-Appeal and Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. Appellants/cross-respondents and respondents/cross-appellants shall each have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 19-14573
|
04/17/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/29/18, 08/27/18, 08/28/18, 08/29/18, 08/30/18, 09/18/18, 11/15/18, 01/15/19. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-16911
|
05/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Amended Docketing Statements. The Parties Amended Docketing Statements due: 30 days. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC). | | 19-20502
|
05/14/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/29/18, 08/27/18, 08/28/18, 08/29/18, 08/30/18, 09/18/18, 11/15/18. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC). | | 19-21056
|
06/04/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (78176). Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-24269
|
06/05/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Amended Docketing Statement. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-24430
|
06/06/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (77678). Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-24613
|
06/06/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Errata to Amended Docketing Statement for 77678. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-24698
|
06/06/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Errata to Amended Docketing Statement for 78176. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-24699
|
06/28/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time for Filing of Opening Brief. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-27875
|
06/28/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief due: August 1, 2019. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-28001
|
08/01/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 08/05/19). Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | |
08/01/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Vols. 1-3 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 08/05/19). Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | |
08/05/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 5 days. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-32745
|
08/05/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' NRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statement. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-32849
|
08/08/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-33420
|
08/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Vol. 1 Part 1. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-33421
|
08/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Vol. 1 Part 2. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-33422
|
08/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Vol. 2 Part 1. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-33423
|
08/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Vol. 2 Part 2. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-33424
|
08/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Vol. 3. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-33425
|
08/29/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why the cross-appeal in Docket No. 77678 should not be dismissed, in whole or in part, for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants/cross-respondents may file a reply within 14 days of service of respondents/cross-appellants' response. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of the cross-appeal. Briefing is suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC). | | 19-36194
|
09/30/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Second Amended Docketing Statement. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-40532
|
09/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-40545
|
10/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Reply to Respondent/Cross Appellants' Response to the Order to Show Cause. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 19-42196
|
10/28/2019 | Motion | Filed Petitioner/Respondent's Motion to Consolidate Writ and Appeal (Nos. 77678/78176/79821). (SC) | | 19-44211
|
10/28/2019 | Motion | Filed Petitioner/Respondent's Motion to Consolidate Writ and Appeal (Nos. 77678/78176/79821) (REJECTED - DUPLICATE FILING). (SC) | | |
11/15/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Cross-Appeal, Granting Motions to Consolidate, Directing Answer, and Regarding Briefing. Accordingly, "the cross-appeal from the November 19, 2018, decision and order on motion to adjudicate attorney lien is dismissed." The cross-appeal shall proceed with respect to the October 11, 2018, decision and order on special motion to dismiss. The Law Office of Daniel S. Simon has filed motions to consolidate the writ petition in Docket No. 79821 with the consolidated appeals in Docket Nos. 77678 and 78176. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. Docket Nos. 77678 and 78176 are hereby consolidated with Docket No. 79821. In the original petition for a writ of mandamus filed in Docket No. 79821, petitioner challenges a district court order adjudicating an attorney lien. Having reviewed the petition, it appears that an answer may assist this court in resolving this matter. Daniel S. Simon and The Law Office of Daniel S. Simon shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Edgeworth Family Trust and American Grating, LLC, shall have 30 days from service of the combined answering and opening brief to file and serve a single document containing a reply brief on appeal, an answering brief on cross-appeal, and an answer, including authorities, on behalf of respondents in Docket No. 79821, against issuance of the requested writ. Daniel S. Simon and The Law Office of Daniel S. Simon shall have 30 days from service of the combined reply brief, answering brief, and answer to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC). | | 19-46946
|
12/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 19-50142
|
12/11/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due: January 15, 2020. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 19-50177
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 1 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01985
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 2 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01988
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 3 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01989
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 4 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01990
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 5 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01991
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 6 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01992
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 7 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01993
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 8 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01994
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 9 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01996
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 10 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01997
|
01/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume 11 of 11. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-01998
|
01/15/2020 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-02005
|
01/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of National Trial Lawyers in Support of Daniel S. Simon and The Law Office of Daniel S. Simon; and In Support of Affirmance of the Dismissal of the Conversion Claim. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-02131
|
01/16/2020 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae of the National Trial Lawyers in Support of Daniel S. Simon and The Law Office of Daniel S. Simon; and In Support of Affirmance of the Dismissal of the Conversion Claim. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-02132
|
01/16/2020 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
01/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion for En Banc Review. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-03823
|
01/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The unopposed motion of the National Trial Lawyers to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of Daniel S. Simon and the Law Office of Daniel S. Simon is granted. NRAP 29. The amicus brief was filed on January 16, 2020. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-04149
|
02/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Daniel S. Simon and the Law Offices of Daniel S. Simon have filed a motion for en banc review of these matters. This court will decide whether en banc review is appropriate once briefing is completed. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice at this time. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-05096
|
02/14/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief, Answering Brief to Cross Appeal, Answer to Writ, and Response to Amicus Brief. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-06285
|
03/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time for Filing of Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal and Reply in Support of Writ Petition. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-08846
|
03/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Law Office of Daniel S. Simon and Daniel S. Simon shall have until April 16, 2020, to file and serve a combined reply brief on cross-appeal and reply in support of the petition for a writ of mandamus. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC). | | 20-10199
|
03/28/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's/Petitioner's Appendix to Reply. Nos. 77678/78176/79821 (SC) | | 20-11932
|
03/28/2020 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal and Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-11933
|
03/30/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening.Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | |
09/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Voluntary Recusal for Justice Silver. Pursuant to NCJC Rule 2.11(A), I recuse myself from participation in this matter based on my friendship with Daniel Simon and his family. Nos. 77678/78176/79821 (SC) | | 20-35146
|
12/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On April 3, 2019, this court entered an order consolidating these matters for all appellate purposes. Upon further consideration, we conclude that consolidation of No. 79821 with Nos. 77678 and 78176 is not warranted. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to deconsolidate Docket No. 79821. Nos. 77678/78176/79821. (SC) | | 20-46675
|
12/30/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of the district court AFFIRMED in part and VACATED in part AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Nos. 77678/78176. EN BANC. (SC) | | 20-46934
|
01/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77678/78176. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/15/2021). (SC) | | |
01/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document - Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 21-01527
|
01/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Extend Time and for Rehearing. Nos. 77678/78176 (SC) | | 21-01642
|
01/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any petition for rehearing. Any petition for rehearing must be accompanied by the required filing fee. No action will be taken on the petition for rehearing contained within the extension motion. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 21-02398
|
01/26/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee/Rehearing Paid. $150.00 from Robert D Vannah Chartered. Check No. 8760. (SC) | | |
01/29/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77678/78176 (SC) | | 21-02887
|
01/29/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John B. Greene. Nos. 77678/78176 (SC) | | |
02/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Answer due: 14 days. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 21-03673
|
02/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Answer to Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77678/78176 (SC) | | 21-05219
|
03/18/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 77678/78176. EN BANC. (SC) | | |
03/22/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Corrected Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] Nos. 77678/78176. (SC). | | 21-08081
|
04/12/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-10361
|
04/12/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/07/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 13, 2021. Nos. 77678/78176. (SC) | | 21-10361
|