Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/26/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/26/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-31467
|
08/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-31470
|
08/26/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Joel D. Henriod. (SC) | | |
08/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-31572
|
08/31/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-31963
|
09/11/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/7/20. To Court Reporter: Not given. (SC) | | 20-33602
|
09/17/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-34356
|
12/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (Respondents') Motion for Remand Pursuant to NRAP 12A. (SC) | | 20-46338
|
12/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-46880
|
12/30/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 28, 2021. (SC) | | 20-46923
|
12/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Any Response to Respondents' Motion for Remand. (SC) | | 20-46972
|
01/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Exhibit in Support of Appellants' Motion for Remand Pursuant to NRAP 12A. (SC) | | 21-01545
|
01/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellants' opposition or response to the motion to remand due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-02484
|
01/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Remand and Unopposed Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 21-02732
|
04/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand. The motion for remand is granted, and this appeal is hereby remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of resolving respondents' motion to amend the August 11, 2020, attorney fees and costs award. Respondents shall have 45 days from the date of this order to either (1) notify this court of the district court's decision on their motion or (2) otherwise inform this court of the status of the district court proceedings. Briefing suspended. (SC) | | 21-10452
|
04/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answer to Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-10641
|
04/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties' April 13, 2021, stipulation to extend the deadline for filing the answering brief in this case is disapproved, as no opening brief has been filed and the briefing schedule was suspended on April 12, 2021. fn1 [It appears that the parties' stipulation may have been mistakenly filed under this docket.] (SC) | | 21-10995
|
05/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice to Court Clerk of Entry of Order Pursuant to NRAP 12A. (SC) | | 21-13436
|
05/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-13837
|
06/10/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 21-16724
|
06/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-17098
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: August 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18381
|
08/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-23698
|
08/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until September 13, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-24474
|
09/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Stay Appeal Pending Outcome of Case No. 81390. (SC) | | 21-26479
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a joint motion to "stay" this appeal pending resolution of the related appeal in Docket No. 81390. Alternatively, the parties ask that the deadline to file the opening brief be extended by 90 days. Cause appearing, the motion is granted to the following extent. Briefing is suspended. Appellants shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of this appeal. (SC) | | 21-27875
|
01/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. (SC) | | 22-02662
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have filed a motion to continue the "stay" of this appeal pending resolution of a related appeal in Docket No. 81390. The motion is granted to the following extent. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-03671
|
04/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-10476
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: May 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-11101
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-14304
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 2. (SC) | | 22-14306
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 3. (SC) | | 22-14307
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 4. (SC) | | 22-14308
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 5. (SC) | | 22-14309
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 6. (SC) | | 22-14310
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 7. (SC) | | 22-14311
|
05/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-14312
|
05/05/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER 6/8/22 ORDER). (SC) | | |
05/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on May 5, 2022, is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on May 4 and 5, 2022. Respondent's answering brief due: June 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14583
|
06/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion for Leave to Narrow the Issues Presented and For an Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-17707
|
06/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a joint motion to narrow the issues presented and for an extension of time for respondents to file the answering brief. The motion is granted as follows. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on May 5, 2022. Appellants' amended opening brief due: 7 days. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the amended opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 22-18261
|
06/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-19089
|
06/22/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-19702
|
06/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Volume 8. (SC) | | 22-19703
|
06/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The amending opening brief was filed on June 22, 2022. Respondents' answering brief due: July 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20055
|
07/19/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-22697
|
08/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Reply Brief due: September 1, 2022. (SC) | | 22-25827
|
09/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-27599
|
09/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Matters and Scheduling Oral Argument. The clerk shall consolidate these matters for dispositional purposes. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving these matters. Accordingly, they are scheduled for oral argument on December 6, 2022, at 3:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos 81689/84538 (SC) | | 22-35468
|
11/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-36757
|
11/30/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Joel D. Henriod to argue on behalf of the appellant) (SC) | | 22-37525
|
11/30/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Christina Wang to argue on behalf of Real Parties in Interest). (SC) | | 22-37638
|
11/30/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument is Wesley J. Smith. Nos. 81689/84538 (SC) | | 22-37689
|
12/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. NOS. 81689/84538. (SC) | | |
12/29/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Docket No. 81689 and Denying Petition for a Writ of Mandamus in Docket No. 84538. "We DENY the petition in Docket No. 84538 and AFFIRM the district court order challenged in Docket No. 81689." SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. Nos. 81689/84538. (SC) | | 22-40891
|
01/17/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' petition for rehearing due: January 31, 2023. Nos. 81689/84538. (SC) | | 23-01480
|
01/31/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 81689/84538 (SC) | | 23-03069
|
01/31/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Joel D. Henriod. Nos. 81689/84538 (SC) | | |
02/13/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The Honorable Justice Hardesty having retired did not participate in the decision on rehearing.] SNP22 - LS/DH. (SC) | | 23-04396
|
02/24/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/Petitioners shall have unitl March 13, 2023, to file and serve the petition for en banc reconsideration. Nos. 81689/84538 (SC) | | 23-05757
|
03/13/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 81689/84538 (SC) | | 23-07701
|
03/24/2023 | Other | Justice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC) | | |
03/27/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [The Honorable Patricia Lee, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter] EN BANC Nos. 81689/84538 (SC) | | 23-09242
|
04/21/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 23-12434
|
04/21/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
05/10/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on April 24, 2023. (SC) | | 23-12434
|