Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/21/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
09/21/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-37058
|
09/21/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-37061
|
09/21/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 18-37063
|
09/28/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nationwide Legal Nevada. Check no. 27303. | | |
09/28/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-38110
|
10/02/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. | | 18-38439
|
10/17/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-40805
|
10/29/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Nos. 76198/77007). | | 18-42307
|
11/15/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Order to Show Cause and Denying Motion. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why the appeal in Docket No. 77007 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellants' response. The deadline to file documents in Docket No. 77007 are suspended. The joint motion to consolidate these appeals is denied at this time. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 18-904341
|
12/13/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause and Denying Motion. (SC) | | 18-908525
|
12/17/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants Response to Courts Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 18-909166
|
01/28/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 77007. Respondents shall have 30 days from service of the opening brief in Docket No. 77007 to file and serve a single answering brief addressing all issues in these appeals. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve a single reply brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-04301
|
02/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-06638
|
02/12/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief due: March 29, 2019. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-06640
|
03/13/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief (Second Request). Nos. 76198/77077. (SC) | | 19-11205
|
03/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief (Second Request). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-11280
|
03/15/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply to Response to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief (Second Request). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-11639
|
03/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 29, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 77007. (SC) | | 19-12057
|
04/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief (77007)(Third Request). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-17474
|
04/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief (Third Request). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-17547
|
04/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply to Response to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief (Third Request). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-18287
|
05/02/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief in Docket No. 77007 due: 14 days. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC). | | 19-19225
|
05/16/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief (70007). Nos. 76198/77007. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 05/16/19). (SC) | | |
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 1. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21593
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 2. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21594
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 3. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21595
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 4. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21596
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 5. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21597
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 6. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21599
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 7. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21600
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 8. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21601
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 9. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21602
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 10. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21603
|
05/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (77007) - Volume 11. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21604
|
05/16/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief (77007) due: 5 days. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21641
|
05/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-21918
|
06/17/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix Volumes 1-2 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 06/18/19). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | |
06/18/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief and Appendix due: 5 days. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-26318
|
06/19/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-26426
|
06/19/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-26427
|
06/19/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 2. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-26430
|
07/17/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time (REJECTED PER ATTORNEY REQUEST). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | |
07/17/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time (REJECTED - DUPLICATE FILING). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | |
07/17/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time (Appellant's Reply Brief). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-30321
|
07/18/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 5, 2019. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-30411
|
08/05/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time (Appellant's Reply Brief). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-32782
|
08/13/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until August 19, 2019, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-34040
|
08/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Exceed Type Volume Limitation (Reply Brief). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-34749
|
08/19/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) (REJECTED PER 08/26/19 ORDER). | | |
08/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation and Countermotion to Strike Portions of Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-35596
|
08/26/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Reply Brief. Cause appearing, appellants' motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. Because the brief is not prepared in accordance with NRAP 32, the clerk of this court shall reject the reply brief filed on August 19, 2019. Appellants' Reply brief due: 7 days. fn1 [Appellants' opening brief was rejected for this same reason on May 16, 2019.] Nos. 76198/77007. (SC). | | 19-35650
|
08/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH ATTORNEY). (SC) | | 19-36325
|
08/30/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (REJECTED FOR MISSING WORD COUNT ON CERT. OF COMPLIANCE). (SC) | | |
09/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-36650
|
09/03/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | |
10/22/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Joel D. Henriod, Daniel Polsenberg and Dan Waite of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christine LLP associate with Richard Haskin of Gibbs, Giden, Locher, Turner, Senet & Wittbrodt, LLP for Appellants). Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 19-43714
|
01/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties shall submit a response within 10 days of the date of this order addressing whether Dr. Lamothe has any interest in the outcome of these consolidated appeals or whether the outcome may affect him in any way. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 20-01201
|
01/21/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants shall have until February 4, 2020, to file and serve their response to this court's order filed January 10, 2020. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC). | | 20-02832
|
01/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to January 10, 2020 Order. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 20-02852
|
01/28/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Response to January 10, 2020 Order. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 20-03851
|
03/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC). | | 20-08227
|
03/02/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP20-MG/LS/AS. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC). | | 20-08333
|
03/05/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Bill of Costs. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 20-08832
|
03/20/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: April 3, 2020. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 20-11004
|
04/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Costs. Respondents filed a timely bill of costs seeking costs for producing transcripts. The cost of producing transcripts is not allowable under NRAP 39(c) and therefore is disallowed. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC). | | 20-16476
|
05/04/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-16695
|
05/04/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/12/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 15, 2020. Nos. 76198/77007. (SC) | | 20-16695
|