Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
02/07/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-05309
|
02/07/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 20-05311
|
02/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Document - Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC) | | |
02/11/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Mills & Mills Law Group, LLC. Check no. 2187. (SC) | | |
02/11/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC) | | 20-05756
|
02/24/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement (REJECTED PER 02/25/20 NOTICE). | | |
02/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Docketing Statement). (SC). | | 20-07538
|
02/25/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 20-07628
|
03/03/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-08439
|
03/20/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 25, 2020, at 1:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-11006
|
03/25/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-11533
|
04/01/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 20-12472
|
04/13/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/13/20). (SC) | | |
04/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-13946
|
04/14/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. REJECTED PER 4/14/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
04/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-14099
|
04/29/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:11/27/18. (SC) | | 20-16232
|
05/14/2020 | Transcript | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service - Transcript Re: All Pending Motions. (SC) | | 20-18429
|
05/15/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/23/19, 5/2/19, 5/22/19, 7/18/19, 10/11/19, 10/21/19 To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 20-18558
|
05/22/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/23/19, 5/2/19, 5/22/19, 7/18/19, 10/11/19, 10/21/19. (SC) | | 20-19653
|
05/26/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC) | | |
06/30/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-24212
|
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 (REJECTED PER 7/1/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 (REJECTED PER 7/1/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
07/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix to Opening Brief. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-24327
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I. (SC) | | 20-24821
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II. (SC) | | 20-24823
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II (DUPLICATE). (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume III. (SC) | | 20-24826
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SC) | | 20-24827
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume V. (SC) | | 20-24829
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VI. (SC) | | 20-24830
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII. (SC) | | 20-24831
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VIII. (SC) | | 20-24832
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IX. (SC) | | 20-24834
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume X. (SC) | | 20-24835
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume XI. (SC) | | 20-24837
|
07/28/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 13, 2020. (SC) | | 20-27434
|
08/13/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/13/20) | | |
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol VI - X. (SC) | | 20-29941
|
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol XVI. (SC) | | 20-29946
|
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol XI-XV. (SC) | | 20-29947
|
08/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-29977
|
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol I - Vol V (SC) | | 20-30006
|
08/14/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-30177
|
09/09/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-33174
|
09/09/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 20-39522
|
10/28/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
10/28/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 23, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system. On or before February 23, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). (COA). | | 21-03905
|
03/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. The argument currently scheduled for March 23, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. is vacated. Oral argument is rescheduled for March 30, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. Oral argument will be held by videoconference as outlined in our prior order setting oral argument. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (COA) | | 21-05991
|
03/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. 80548-COA.(COA21-BB/MG/JT) (COA). | | |
09/30/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (COA). | | 21-28064
|
09/30/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
10/26/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-30834
|
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/04/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30834
|