Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/04/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/04/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-43949
|
12/04/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-43952
|
12/04/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Mark R. Thierman. (SC) | | |
12/04/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-44004
|
12/09/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonathan L. Andrews. (SC) | | 20-44756
|
12/17/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-45676
|
01/15/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-01380
|
01/21/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-01766
|
01/29/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/19/18. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC) | | 21-02774
|
04/22/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: May 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11590
|
04/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Leave to Amend Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-11832
|
04/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and to show cause. Appellants' motion for leave to file an amended docketing statement is granted to the following extent. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended docketing statement. Appellant's response to order to show cause due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing Suspended. (SC) | | 21-12334
|
04/30/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-12473
|
06/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-15553
|
06/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court construes the response as a motion for an extension of time to respond to this court's order to show cause, and the motion is granted to the following extent. Appellants shall have until July 15, 2021, to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents shall have 14 days from service of appellants' response to file and serve any reply. The briefing schedule in this appeal remains suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 21-17283
|
06/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause and Request to Reinstate/Set Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 21-18028
|
07/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-19978
|
08/11/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-23398
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-23400
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-23402
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-23404
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-23403
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-23405
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-23406
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-23407
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-23409
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 9. (SC) | | 21-23408
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 10. (SC) | | 21-23410
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 11 (SC) | | 21-23411
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 12. (SC) | | 21-23412
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 13. (SC) | | 21-23413
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 14. (SC) | | 21-23414
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 15. (SC) | | 21-23416
|
08/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 16. (SC) | | 21-23417
|
09/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel for Respondents (The Law Firm of Littler Mendelson, P.C. hereby substitutes in the place of Cohen-Johnson, LLC; Susan Hilden and Chris Davis as attorneys of record for Respondents). (SC) | | 21-25928
|
09/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-26008
|
09/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorneys Diana G. Dickinson and Montgomery Y. Paek of Littler Mendelson, P.C. have filed a substitution of counsel indicating that they are substituting as counsel of record for respondents in the place of attorneys Chris Davis and Susan Heaney Hilden. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall add Ms. Dickinson and Mr. Paek as counsel for respondents and remove Mr. Davis and Ms. Heaney Hilden. The stipulation of the parties extending the time for filing the answering brief is approved. Answering brief due: October 11, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26270
|
10/11/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-29179
|
11/02/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Reply Brief due: November 24, 2021. (SC) | | 21-31524
|
11/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limit for Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-33859
|
11/24/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-33860
|
11/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limit for Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-34102
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants have filed a motion requesting leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. Respondents oppose the motion. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. NRAP 32(a)(7)(D). The reply brief was filed on November 24, 2021. (SC). | | 21-34572
|
12/03/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
04/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for May 16, 2022, at 1:30 p.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-10240
|
04/29/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-13633
|
05/03/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-13982
|
05/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court En Banc. (SC). | | |
08/11/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. En Banc. (THIS OPINION WAS AMENDED PER THE ORDER AND AMENDED OPINION FILED ON 9/8/22). (SC). | | 22-25125
|
08/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Verified Bill of Costs Pursuant to NRAP 39. (SC) | | 22-26587
|
09/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Amending Opinion. On August 11, 2022, this court issued an opinion affirming the district court's final judgment. The opinion is amended as follows. On page 2, we strike the first paragraph and replace it. On page 8, we strike the last sentence and replace it. The amended opinion, which replaces the opinion filed on August 11, is being filed concurrently with this order. (SC) | | 22-28109
|
09/08/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Amended, Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. En Banc. (SC). | | 22-28110
|
09/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Bill of Costs. The clerk of this court shall issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $207.65 for insertion in the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-28573
|
09/13/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $207.65. (SC) | | 22-28580
|
09/13/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur/Memorandum of Costs and Disbursement. (SC) | | 22-28582
|
09/13/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28582
|