Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-00912
|
01/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-00916
|
01/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-00918
|
01/20/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-01649
|
01/22/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jerimy Kirschner & Assoc. Check No. 0326. (SC) | | |
01/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-02050
|
01/28/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John Walter Boyer. (SC) | | 21-02621
|
02/12/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-04296
|
02/12/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/22/21. (SC) | | 21-04320
|
02/19/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 22, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 21-04966
|
04/13/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/26/21. (SC). | | 21-10736
|
05/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's motion to recuse settlement judge. (SC) | | 21-14112
|
05/18/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Appellant filed a motion to recuse the Settlement Judge. The Settlement Judge hereby recuses himself and requests that we reassign this case to a new settlement judge as soon as possible. (SC) | | 21-14236
|
05/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Recuse Settlement Judge. (SC) | | 21-14266
|
05/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a status report requesting that this case be reassigned to a new settlement judge. We direct the clerk to issue a notice of reassignment. fn1 [In light of this order, the motion to recuse settlement judge filed by appellant on May 17, 2021, and the errata to motion to recuse settlement judge filed on May 18, 2021, are denied as moot.] (SC) | | 21-14394
|
05/19/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 21-14439
|
05/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Cary Duckworth) Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-15006
|
05/26/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Proof of Service on the Settlement Judge. (SC) | | 21-15154
|
05/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent, Cary Duckworth, has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The motion is denied. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. (SC) | | 21-15175
|
05/28/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-15422
|
06/02/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-15662
|
06/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Cary Duckworth) Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-16494
|
06/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/17/21)(SC) | | |
06/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-17460
|
06/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Opposition. (SC) | | 21-17492
|
06/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-17546
|
06/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The opposition was filed on June 17, 2021. Respondents shall have until June 24, 2021, to file and serve a reply, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-17815
|
06/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Cary Duckworth) Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-18269
|
07/29/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/9/21. (SC) | | 21-22071
|
07/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent Cary Duckworth has filed a motion to dismiss the appeal on the ground that the report does not fall within the parameters for appealability under NRS 155.190, and it does not dispose of all the issues and is therefore not a final appealable order. Appellant opposes the motion. Cary has filed a reply. The motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice to this court's right to address the jurisdictional limits in the disposition of the merits. (SC) | | 21-22139
|
08/03/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/16/21. (SC) | | 21-22528
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 14, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25326
|
09/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-26566
|
09/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/14/21) (SC) | | |
09/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-26575
|
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL) (SC) | | |
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-26711
|
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-26712
|
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-26713
|
10/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Cary Duckworth's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief on Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 21-28817
|
10/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent Cary Duckworth's Answering Brief due: November 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28820
|
11/05/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/3/21. (SC) | | 21-31951
|
11/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Cary Duckworth) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-32787
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Cary Duckworth) Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1-2. (PER PHONE CALL WITH COUNSEL, REJECTED TO SUBMIT SEPERATELY) (SC) | | |
11/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-32879
|
11/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-32882
|
01/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
01/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismissal with Prejudice. (SC) | | 22-01501
|
01/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC) | | 22-02412
|
01/24/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC) | | |
01/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address for Jolyy Urga Woodbury & Holthus'. (SC) | | 22-02727
|