Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/24/2022 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-20058
|
07/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC) | | 22-22528
|
07/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant has filed an informal brief. Respondents need not file a response to the brief unless ordered to do so by this court. (SC) | | 22-23736
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-27133
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-27259
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-27260
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 4A. (SC) | | 22-27270
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 4B. (SC) | | 22-27271
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-27272
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-27273
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-27275
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-27280
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-27281
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 10. (SC) | | 22-27283
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 11A. (SC) | | 22-27292
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 11B. (SC) | | 22-27298
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 12. (SC) | | 22-27300
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 13. (SC) | | 22-27301
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 14. (SC) | | 22-27303
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 15. (SC) | | 22-27306
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 16. (SC) | | 22-27307
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 17. (SC) | | 22-27308
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 18. (SC) | | 22-27310
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 19. (SC) | | 22-27313
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 20. (SC) | | 22-27314
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 21. (SC) | | 22-27318
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 22. (SC) | | 22-27319
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 23. (SC) | | 22-27320
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 24. (SC) | | 22-27323
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 25. (SC) | | 22-27324
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 26. (SC) | | 22-27325
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 27. (SC) | | 22-27326
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 28. (SC) | | 22-27327
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 29. (SC) | | 22-27328
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 30. (SC) | | 22-27329
|
08/30/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal, Vol. 31. (SC) | | 22-27330
|
08/31/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential Documents from District Court Clerk. (SC) | | |
09/09/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC) | | |
09/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Compel. (SC) | | 22-28482
|
10/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a "motion to compel" seeking to compel the correction and completion of the record in this case. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 22-31093
|
01/23/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Affidavit. (SC) | | 23-02080
|
02/07/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's pro se affidavit filed January 23, 2023. It does not appear to seek any relief from this court. (SC) | | 23-03785
|
02/15/2023 | Other | Justice Linda Bell disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
02/16/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." LS/EC/PL. (SC) | | 23-04875
|
03/01/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Affidavit." (SC). | | 23-06081
|
03/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's pro se affidavit filed March 1, 2023. It does not appear to seek any relief from this court. (SC) | | 23-06522
|
03/03/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-06547
|
03/20/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). LS/EC/PL. (SC) | | 23-08487
|
04/03/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-10179
|
04/14/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 23-11586
|
05/09/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 23-14621
|
05/09/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
05/22/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2023. (SC) | | 23-14621
|