Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
17-39489: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65935
Short Caption:FARMER (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C245739Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/05/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/05/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/26/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-20993
06/26/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).14-21011
06/27/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED-District Court Minutes.
06/27/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED-District Court Minutes.
07/16/2014MotionFiled Motion for Consolidation of Appeal. Nos. 65935/65936.14-23140
07/16/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-23155
07/17/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/8/08, 8/18/08, 8/20/08, 1/12/09, 1/21/09, 2/2/09, 6/17/09, 10/28/09, 3/17/10, 3/22/10, 4/7/10, 5/5/10, 5/19/10, 6/7/10, 6/28/10, 9/1/10, 9/22/10, 10/25/10, 12/1/10, 12/13/10, 3/7/11, 10/17/11, 10/19/11, 12/14/11, 2/6/12, 4/4/12, 7/23/12, 2/25/13, 1/27/14, 2/3/14, 2/4/14, 2/5/14, 2/6/14, 2/7/14, 2/10/14, 2/11/14, 2/12/14, 2/13/14, 2/14/14, 2/19/14, 2/20/14, 2/21/14, 2/24/14, 2/25/14, 2/26/14, 2/27/14, 2/28/14, and 5/28/14. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt, Julie Lever, Beverly Sigurnik, Rachelle Hamilton, and Lara Corcoran.14-23183
07/28/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Administratively Closing Appeal in Docket No. 63936 and Denying Motions to Consolidate. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close the appeal in Docket No. 65936 and transfer all documents filed in Docket No. 65936 to Docket No. 65935. Appellant's motions to consolidate these appeals are denied. Nos. 65935/65936.14-24465
07/28/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 65936 PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).14-24488
07/28/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED-District Court Minutes. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 65936 PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).
07/28/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED-District Court Minutes. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 65936 PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).
07/28/2014MotionFiled Motion for Consolidation of Appeal. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 65936 PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).14-24492
07/28/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 65936 PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).14-24493
07/28/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/9/08, 12/2/08, 12/11/08, 1/27/09, 5/19/09, 7/14/09, 11/17/09, 5/4/10, 6/7/10, 6/28/10, 9/22/10, 10/25/10, 12/1/10, 12/13/10, 3/7/11, 10/17/11, 10/19/11, 12/14/11, 2/6/12, 2/25/13, 1/27/14, 2/3/14, 2/4/14, 2/5/14, 2/6/14, 2/7/14, 2/10/14, 2/11/14, 2/12/14, 2/13/14, 2/14/14, 2/19/14, 2/20/14, 2/21/14, 2/24/14, 2/25/14, 2/26/14, 2/27/14, 2/28/14, and 5/28/14. To Court Reporter: Kristen Lunkwitz, Kerry Esparza, Beverly Sigurnik, Rachelle Hamilton, and Lara Corcoran. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/9/08, 12/2/08, 12/11/08, 1/27/09, 5/19/09, 7/14/09, 11/17/09, 5/4/10, 6/7/10, 6/28/10, 9/22/10, 10/25/10, 12/1/10, 12/13/10, 3/7/11, 10/17/11, 10/19/11, 12/14/11, 2/6/12, 2/25/13, 1/27/14, 2/3/14, 2/4/14, 2/5/14, 2/6/14, 2/7/14, 2/10/14, 2/11/14, 2/12/14, 2/13/14, 2/14/14, 2/19/14, 2/20/14, 2/21/14, 2/24/14, 2/25/14, 2/26/14, 2/27/14, 2/28/14, and 5/28/14. To Court Reporter: Kristen Lunkwitz, Kerry Esparza, Beverly Sigurnik, Rachelle Hamilton, and Lara Corcoran. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 65936 PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).14-24497
08/12/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/19/08.14-26377
08/14/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Cornelius stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/2/08, 12/11/08, 1/27/09, 5/19/09, 7/14/09, 11/17/09 & 5/4/10.14-26757
08/21/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Lever stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/18/08 and 8/20/08.14-27566
08/22/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/8/08.14-27774
09/02/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/19/11, 12/14/11, 2/6/12, 4/4/12, 7/23/12, 2/25/13, 1/27/14, 2/3/14-2/28/14 and 5/28/14.14-28785
09/04/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Beverly Sigurnik stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/12/09, 1/21/09, 2/2/09, 6/17/09, 10/28/09, 3/17/10, 3/22/10, 4/7/10, 5/5/10, 5/19/10, 6/7/10, 6/28/10, 9/1/10, 9/22/10, 10/25/10, 12/1/10, 12/13/10, 3/7/11.14-29328
10/15/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.14-34282
10/16/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief Due Date: November 24, 2014.14-34390
11/21/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/21/08, 6/17/08, (Christa Broka) 6/04/08 (G. DeLucca). To Court Reporter: Christa Broka and G. Delucca.14-38510
11/24/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix.14-38560
12/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 23, 2014.14-39317
02/23/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.15-05707
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol I.15-05709
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II.15-05711
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol III.15-05712
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV.15-05713
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol V.15-05714
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VI.15-05715
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VII.15-05717
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VIII.15-05718
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IX.15-05719
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol X.15-05720
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XI.15-05721
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XII.15-05723
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XIII.15-05724
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XIV.15-05725
02/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XV.15-05726
02/23/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Transmission of Original Exhibit 25.15-05729
02/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type/Volume Limitation and for Transmission of Exhibit. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on February 23, 2015. Answering Brief due: 30 days. District Court Exhibit 25 due: 15 days.15-06308
02/27/2015BriefFiled Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/12/15).
03/30/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).15-09487
03/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: April 29, 2015.15-09489
04/29/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief).15-13009
05/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 29, 2015.15-14113
05/29/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Respondent's Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.15-16376
06/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion for leave to file an answering brief that exceeds the type-volume limitation is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on May 29, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days.15-16857
06/02/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/12/15).
06/02/2015MotionFiled Motion to File Amended Answering Brief.15-16875
06/03/2015MotionFiled Motion to File Amended Opening Brief.15-16921
06/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the amended answering brief received on June 2, 2015. and the amended opening brief received on June 3, 2015, and strike the answering brief filed on June 2, 2015, and the opening brief filed on February 27, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days.15-17997
06/12/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief.15-17998
06/12/2015BriefFiled Amended Opening Brief.15-17999
07/07/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.15-20496
07/07/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: August 12, 2015.15-20564
08/12/2015BriefFiled Reply Brief.15-24375
08/12/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/26/2015MotionFiled Motion to Obtain Copy of Videotaped Deposition.15-25855
08/31/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-26359
10/15/2015Letter/IncomingFiled Letter to Honorable Judge James W. Hardesty.15-31376
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Robert Murdock has filed a motion to obtain a copy of an original trial exhibit (a CD recording) transmitted to this court by the district court clerk pursuant to appellant's motion. Cause appearing, the motion is granted to the following extent. Mr. Murdock may obtain a copy of the CD recording provided he duplicates the CD at this court, with his own equipment and at his own expense.15-32444
11/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Monday, December 5, 2016, @ 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas.16-34311
11/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-36212
12/01/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to Add Counsel (Ryan Bashor as counsel for the Appellant and will Participate in Oral Argument).16-37146
12/05/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/16/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Douglas/Gibbons/Parraguirre. Stiglich, J., with whom Cherry, C.J., and Hardesty, J., agree, dissenting.133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 86. EN BANC17-39489
11/30/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.17-41282
12/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.17-41977
12/21/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answer to Petition for Rehearing).17-44185
12/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: January 22, 2018.17-44249
01/23/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing.18-03058
02/23/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Hardesty, J., concurring.18-07163
03/20/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibit: State's Exhibit(s) 25 this day.18-10865
03/20/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2018.18-10865