Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/26/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-08717
|
02/26/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-08719
|
03/06/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marx Law Firm. Check no. 1005. (SC) | | |
03/07/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 19-10219
|
03/08/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC). | | 19-10469
|
03/20/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-12459
|
03/21/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC) | | 19-12502
|
03/21/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-12588
|
03/22/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC). | | 19-12852
|
03/25/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-12989
|
04/05/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Requested. (SC) | | 19-14882
|
04/25/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC). | | 19-18136
|
05/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 19-21910
|
06/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC). | | 19-25150
|
07/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for this Appeal and Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-31433
|
08/01/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for This Appeal and Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-32523
|
08/06/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for this Appeal and Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-33035
|
09/09/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 23, 2019. (SC) | | 19-37576
|
09/23/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-39497
|
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC) | | |
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume II (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC) | | |
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume III (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC) | | |
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IV (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC) | | |
09/24/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. | | 19-39612
|
09/30/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol I. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC) | | |
09/30/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol II. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC) | | |
09/30/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol III. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC) | | |
09/30/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol IV. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC) | | |
10/21/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Stay Briefing, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 19-43488
|
11/01/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order for Supplemental Briefing. The parties shall each have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental brief. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. fn1 [The motion to stay briefing or for an extension of time to file the answering brief is denied as moot.] (SC). | | 19-44998
|
11/18/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Briefing on Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-47235
|
11/18/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Supplemental to Response to Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for this Appeal and Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-47236
|
04/09/2020 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Non-Dispositional Opinion "Motion granted in part; appeal dismissed in part." We grant respondents' motion to substitute themselves for appellants as to those claims and to voluntarily dismiss this appeal as to those claims. Accordingly, we reinstate briefing solely as to the summary judgment on appellants' claims for fraud and elder exploitation. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this opinion to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Before Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Hardesty/Stiglich. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. SNP20-JH/LS/AS. (SC). | | 20-13445
|
05/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-17582
|
05/12/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: June 10, 2020. (SC). | | 20-18040
|
05/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellants' Appendix and Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC) | | 20-19910
|
06/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Motion to Strike Appellants' Appendix and Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC) | | 20-20934
|
06/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Appellants' Appendix and Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC). | | 20-21639
|
06/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-21836
|
06/22/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Strike and Regarding Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk shall strike the appendix filed on September 30, 2019. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended appendix that contains legible page numbers on all pages and an index that fully complies with NRAP 30(c)(2). Respondents shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-23093
|
06/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. I. (SC). | | 20-24003
|
06/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. II. (SC). | | 20-24004
|
06/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. III. (SC). | | 20-24005
|
06/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. IV. (SC). | | 20-24006
|
07/13/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-25757
|
07/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-25759
|
08/11/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension . Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 26, 2020. (SC) | | 20-29600
|
08/26/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-31543
|
08/27/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/21/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure (Justice Silver). The parties will have 10 days from the date of this order to file any objection based on my disclosure. (SC) | | 20-38585
|
11/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 20-42565
|
11/23/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP20-MG/LS/AS (SC) | | 20-42568
|
12/10/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' petition for rehearing due: December 28, 2020. (SC) | | 20-44961
|
12/28/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-46637
|
12/28/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Christian T. Balducci. (SC) | | |
01/13/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP20 - LS/AS. (SC) | | 21-01043
|
01/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: February 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01809
|
02/10/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-03987
|
02/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellants' Answer due: 14 days. (VACATED PER ORDER 2/19/21). (SC) | | 21-04990
|
02/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Vacating Order Directing Answer. Upon further consideration, the order filed on February 19, 2021, directing appellants to file an answer to respondents' petition for en banc reconsideration is hereby vacated. (SC) | | 21-05067
|
02/19/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 21-05069
|
03/17/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-07664
|
03/17/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/02/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07664
|