Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/21/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
12/21/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 15-39090
|
12/21/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 15-39092
|
12/21/2015 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn | | |
12/22/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 15-39228
|
12/23/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | | 15-39458
|
01/11/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-00733
|
01/13/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. | | 16-01213
|
01/14/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 16-01354
|
01/29/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 16-03095
|
04/14/2016 | Brief | Filed Appelant's Opening Brief. | | |
04/14/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-11738
|
04/14/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. | | 16-11739
|
04/14/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. | | 16-11740
|
04/14/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Laurel Handley and Jory Garabedian to Replace Michael Brooks as counsel for the Respondent). | | 16-11783
|
04/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert Eisenberg as counsel for the Respondent). | | 16-11933
|
05/05/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Answering Brief Deadline. | | 16-14160
|
05/05/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 15, 2016. | | 16-14164
|
06/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-19042
|
06/23/2016 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondence and Affirmance. | | 16-19647
|
06/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Agency's Motion to Associate Counsel (Howard N. Cayne, Esq.). | | 16-20236
|
07/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Attorney Howard N. Cayne of the law firm of Arnold & Porter, LLP, shall be permitted to appear on behalf of the Federal Housing Finance Agency in this appeal. Nevada attorney Leslie Bryan Hart, of the law firm of Fennemore Craig, P.C., shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Cayne in this matter. | | 16-21966
|
07/18/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to FIle Reply Brief. | | 16-22330
|
07/18/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: August 17, 2016. | | 16-22335
|
08/17/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. | | 16-25557
|
08/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 26, 2016. | | 16-25985
|
08/26/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-26690
|
08/26/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
10/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal For Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 16-32108
|
01/18/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email Address for Arnold & Porter LLP (Amicus Curiae Howard N. Cayne). | | 17-01776
|
09/13/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-30753
|
09/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 17-31931
|
09/25/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, November 6, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 17-32455
|
09/26/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondents Amended NRAP 31(e) Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 17-32592
|
09/27/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time at Oral Argument. | | 17-32782
|
09/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency to Participate in Oral Argument. | | 17-33032
|
09/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Amicus Curiae's Motion for Additional Time for Oral Argument. | | 17-33033
|
10/04/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion to extend oral argument in this matter to 60 minutes. The motion is denied. Amicus Curiae has filed a motion for leave to participate in oral argument. The motion is granted. Oral Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes and shall be allocated in the following manner: 15 minutes to appellant, 10 minutes to respondent, and 5 minutes to the Federal Housing Finance Agency as amicus curiae. | | 17-33743
|
10/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's Motion to Associate Counsel. | | 17-35575
|
10/23/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-36256
|
10/24/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Second Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 17-36568
|
10/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Attorney Michael A.F. Johnson of Arnold & Porter, LLP shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in this matter. Nevada attorney Leslie Bryan Hart of Fennemore Craig, P.C. shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Johnson in this appeal. | | 17-36589
|
10/25/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Jacqueline Gilbert and Karen Hanks as counsel for the Appellant). | | 17-36730
|
11/06/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
03/21/2018 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC | | 18-10977
|
04/04/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Reissue Order as an Opinion. | | 18-12879
|
05/17/2018 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[We previously issued our decision in this matter in an unpublished order. we grant Fannie Mae and its amicus curiae FHFA's motion to reissue the order as an opinion, and issue this opinion in place of our prior order.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 36. EN BANC | | 18-18816
|
06/11/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-22042
|
06/11/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/22/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 14, 2018. | | 18-22042
|