Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/13/2017 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
07/13/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-23337
|
07/13/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days | | 17-23339
|
08/14/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 08/14/2017 - C292987). | | 17-27011
|
08/15/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-27205
|
08/21/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-27865
|
08/31/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 17-29364
|
09/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Transcript Request). | | 17-29787
|
09/12/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the transcript request forms received via E-Flex on September 5, 2017. | | 17-30570
|
09/12/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/21/17, 02/27/17, 02/28/17, 03/01/17, 04/18/17, and 05/23/17. To Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. | | 17-30571
|
09/12/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/23/17 and 02/24/17. To Court Reporter: Debbie Winn. | | 17-30572
|
09/12/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/07/16. To Court Reporter: Elsa Amoroso . | | 17-30573
|
09/12/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/22/17. To Court Reporter: Jennifer Gerold. | | 17-30574
|
09/12/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/25/14. To Court Reporter: Jo Ann Melendez. | | 17-30576
|
09/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Court Recorder's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts. | | 17-32997
|
10/03/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Briefing Schedule. Ms. Easley's Court Reporter Certificate due: November 1, 2017. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 26, 2017. | | 17-33466
|
11/08/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/07/16, 04/18/17, 05/23/17. | | 17-38425
|
11/08/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/21/17, 02/22/17, 02/23/17, 02/24/17, 02/27/17, 02/28/17, 03/01/17. | | 17-38426
|
12/27/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request) | | 17-44595
|
01/04/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 26, 2018. | | 18-00435
|
03/27/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). | | 18-11684
|
04/05/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 25, 2018. | | 18-12944
|
05/25/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief(Third Request). | | 18-20249
|
06/07/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 24, 2018. Counsel for appellant is directed to serve a copy of the motion requesting a third extension of time on her client and on the district court judge. Counsel shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file a certificate of service in this court. | | 18-21642
|
06/13/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Attorney's Certificate of Service on Appellant (Motion for Enlargement of Time-Opening Brief-Third Request). | | 18-22597
|
06/13/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Attorney's Certificate of Service on District Court (Motion for Enlargement of Time-Opening Brief-Third Request). | | 18-22598
|
07/25/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Fourth Request). | | 18-28400
|
08/03/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time - Opening Brief (Fifth Request). | | 18-29932
|
08/09/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the appendix received on August 3, 2018. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 13, 2018. | | 18-30534
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume I. | | 18-30536
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume II. | | 18-30537
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume III. | | 18-30538
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. | | 18-30540
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume V. | | 18-30541
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. | | 18-30542
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VII. | | 18-30543
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII. | | 18-30552
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IX. | | 18-30545
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume X. | | 18-30546
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XI. | | 18-30547
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XII. | | 18-30548
|
08/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XIII. | | 18-30549
|
08/14/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief ) (Sixth Request). | | 18-31282
|
08/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief) (Seventh Request). | | 18-31526
|
08/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Transmittal of Exhibits Pursuant to NRAP 30(D). | | 18-31529
|
08/16/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Volume XIV of Appellant's Appendix. | | 18-31808
|
08/21/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the opening brief received on August 15, 2018, and volume XIV of the appendix received on August 16, 2018. | | 18-32464
|
08/21/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-32467
|
08/21/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XIV. | | 18-32468
|
08/31/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Original Exhibit. Original Exhibit 122 due: 20 days. | | 18-34195
|
09/20/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 18-36900
|
09/27/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 19, 2018. | | 18-37777
|
11/16/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 18-904626
|
12/18/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time To File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 18-909224
|
12/27/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 31, 2019. (SC) | | 18-910572
|
02/01/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion For Enlargement Of Time To File Reply Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 19-05047
|
02/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 21, 2019. (SC). | | 19-06294
|
02/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 19-08617
|
03/04/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on February 28, 2019. (SC) | | 19-09591
|
03/04/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-09592
|
03/04/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/02/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 19-19323
|
05/02/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
07/24/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
12/09/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/09/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Petition for Supreme Court Review. (SC) | | 19-49895
|
12/17/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Review due: December 23, 2019. (SC). | | 19-50992
|
12/23/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Petition for Supreme Court Review (Second). (SC). | | 19-52042
|
12/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Petition for Supreme Court Review (Third). (SC) | | 19-52434
|
01/09/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Supreme Court Review Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 40B. (SC) | | 20-01197
|
01/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions for second and third extensions of time to file a petition for review are granted. The petition for review was filed on January 9, 2020. (SC). | | 20-01768
|
02/21/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC). | | 20-07089
|
03/06/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed State's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC). | | 20-08975
|
03/23/2020 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." Silver, J., dissenting. fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC). | | 20-11066
|
04/17/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-14674
|
04/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/05/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 22, 2020. (SC) | | 20-14674
|