Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/06/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/06/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-49634
|
12/06/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-49638
|
12/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Waive Filing Fee and to Combine Appeals. Nos. 78964/80167. (SC). | | 19-51995
|
12/30/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Waive Filing Fee and to Combine Appeals due: January 14, 2020. (SC). | | 19-52315
|
01/21/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Micah S. Echols, Esq. and Claggett & Sykes Law Firm as counsel for Appellant). (SC) | | 20-02858
|
01/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/23/20). (SC) | | |
01/21/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal and Firm Disassociation (Thomas W. Stewart). (SC) | | 20-02878
|
01/23/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC) | | 20-03155
|
01/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC) | | 20-03735
|
01/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC) | | 20-03736
|
01/31/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC) | | 20-04368
|
02/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal and Regarding Motions. The appeal in Docket No. 78964 is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The appeal in Docket No. 80167 shall proceed. The motion to waive the filing fee in Docket No. 80167 is denied. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee in Docket No. 80167. fn1[Respondents' motion for an extension of time to file the response to the "Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases" is granted. The response was filed on January 27, 2020.] NNP20-RP/JH/EC Nos. 78964/80167. (SC) | | 20-06249
|
02/18/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Micah S. Echols. (SC) | | |
02/19/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-06802
|
02/20/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John Walter Boyer. (SC) | | 20-06994
|
03/10/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 20-09514
|
03/11/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-09704
|
03/11/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 20-09708
|
03/17/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 20-10456
|
05/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC). | | 20-19635
|
05/29/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: June 12, 2020. (SC) | | 20-20397
|
06/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC). | | 20-21524
|
06/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 9, 2020. (SC). | | 20-21571
|
06/12/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 20-22114
|
06/22/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss due: July 6, 2020. (SC) | | 20-22990
|
07/06/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC). | | 20-24858
|
07/09/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. (SC). | | 20-25376
|
07/09/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. (SC). | | 20-25377
|
07/09/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. (SC). | | 20-25378
|
07/09/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. (SC). | | 20-25385
|
07/09/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. (SC). | | 20-25389
|
07/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC). | | 20-25396
|
07/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss and Granting Extension of Time. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The motion to dismiss this appeal is denied. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 10, 2020. (SC). | | 20-26121
|
08/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-29413
|
08/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: August 24, 2020. (SC) | | 20-30647
|
08/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 20-31186
|
08/31/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SKRICKEN PER 9/3/20 ORDER). (SC) | | |
09/01/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-32291
|
09/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time filed on August 24, 2020, is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The amended opening brief was filed on September 1, 2020. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on August 31, 2020. Respondent shall have until October 1, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-32550
|
09/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-35919
|
09/30/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC) | | 20-35937
|
11/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-39811
|
11/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 2, 2020. (SC). | | 20-40684
|
12/01/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-43468
|
12/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 16, 2020. (SC) | | 20-44936
|
12/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 20-45545
|
12/23/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-46465
|
12/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on December 16, 2020, is granted. The answering brief was filed on December 23, 2020. Appellant shall have until January 22, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 20-46619
|
01/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01815
|
02/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-03335
|
02/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 19, 2021. (SC) | | 21-03619
|
02/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-05073
|
02/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 5, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-05211
|
03/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-06578
|
03/08/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-08772
|
03/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
03/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
07/21/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) (REPLACED BY OPINION FILED 10/28/21) | | 21-21054
|
07/21/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) (REPLACED BY OPINION FILED 10/28/21) | | |
08/03/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's motion to reissue order as an opinion due: August 18, 2021. (COA) | | 21-22509
|
08/16/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 08/30/21 ORDER). | | 21-23727
|
08/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 08/30/21 ORDER). | | |
08/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reissue July 21, 2021 Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding as a Published Opinion. (COA) | | 21-23981
|
08/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur and Reinstating Appeal. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur and reinstate this appeal. (SC). | | 21-25211
|
08/31/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Scott E. Lundy, Esq., of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm hereby enters his appearance as associated counsel for Appellant). (COA) | | 21-25323
|
09/07/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2021. (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 08/30/21 ORDER). (SC) | | 21-23727
|
10/28/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court of Appeal. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Tao/Bulla. Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. fn1 [We originally resolved this appeal in an unpublished order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Appellant subsequently filed a motion to publish the order as an opinion. We grant the motion and replace our earlier order with this opinion.] 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. Court of Appeals MG/JT/BB. (COA). | | 21-31018
|
10/28/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court of Appeal. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Tao/Bulla. Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. fn1 [We originally resolved this appeal in an unpublished order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Appellant subsequently filed a motion to publish the order as an opinion. We grant the motion and replace our earlier order with this opinion.] 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. Court of Appeals MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA). | | |
11/30/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 21-34051
|
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
12/15/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34051
|