Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/31/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/31/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-31981
|
08/31/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-31983
|
08/31/2020 | Other | Chief Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges. (SC) | | |
09/08/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Stephens & Bywater. Check no. 3056. (SC) | | |
09/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-33011
|
09/09/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC) | | 20-33250
|
10/09/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 9, 2020, at 9:30 am. (SC). | | 20-37104
|
10/16/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC). | | 20-38081
|
10/23/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-38900
|
11/10/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 20, 2020, at 9:00 AM via Blue Jeans videoconference. (SC) | | 20-41219
|
11/23/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 81710/81510. (SC) | | 20-42649
|
12/02/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-43549
|
12/11/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/7/20. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC) | | 20-45023
|
03/01/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: March 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05925
|
03/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07653
|
03/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-07660
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 1 Parts 1-5. (SC) | | 21-07862
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 1. Part 6. Vols. 2-4. (SC) | | 21-07864
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-07863
|
04/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (United Automobile Insurance Company) (SC) | | 21-10566
|
04/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date for Respondent, United Automobile Insurance 5/19/21. (SC) | | 21-10597
|
05/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. The opening brief and appendix were filed on April 19, 2021. Respondents in Docket No. 81510 shall have until May 19, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief(s). Respondent Gary Lewis shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. fn1[United Automobile Insurance Company may file a single answering brief addressing each opening brief.] Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-12585
|
05/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (Gary Lewis) Answering Brief. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-13373
|
05/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 5/11/21) Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | |
05/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-13407
|
05/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Gary Lewis' Appendix Vol. 1 of 2. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-13935
|
05/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Gary Lewis' Appendix Vol. 2 of 2. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-13936
|
05/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent (United Automobile Insurance) Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-14477
|
05/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date is June 18, 2021. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-14506
|
06/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (United Automobile Insurance Company) Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-17644
|
06/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Cheyenne Nalder) Opposition to UAIC's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-18293
|
07/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (United Automobile Insurance Company) Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 81510/81710(SC) | | 21-19170
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. UAIC's answering brief due: July 19, 2021. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-19226
|
07/19/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (United Automobile Insurance Company) Answering Brief. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-20764
|
07/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief (UAIC's Supplemental Appendix) Vol.1. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-20765
|
07/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief (UAIC's Supplemental Appendix) Vol.2. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-20766
|
08/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-24143
|
08/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Reply Brief due: September 17, 2021. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-24150
|
09/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants Cheyenne Nalder and Gary Lewis' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-27030
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: October 15, 2021. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-27877
|
10/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Cheyenne Nalder's) Reply Brief on case no. 81710. Nos. 81510/81710. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/18/21) (SC) | | |
10/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike UAIC's Supplemental Appendices. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-29747
|
10/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-29748
|
10/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Enlarge the Record. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 21-29749
|
10/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-29753
|
10/19/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent (Cheyenne Nalder's) Reply Brief. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-30036
|
10/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Cheyenne Nalder's) Appendix to Reply Brief on case no. 81710. Nos. 81510/81710. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/19/21) (SC) | | |
10/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-30079
|
10/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Cheyenne Nalder) Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-30330
|
10/21/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (UAIC) Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Gary Lewis's Motion to Strike and Motion to Enlarge the Record. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-30610
|
10/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (UAIC) Notice of Appearance for Adrienne Brantley-Lomeli. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-30612
|
11/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall add Ms. Brantley-Lomeli to the docket of this appeal as counsel of record for UAIC. UAIC has filed a motion for an extension of time to file its responses to Gary Lewis's motion to strike and motion to enlarge the record. The motion is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). UAIC shall have until November 22, 2021, to file its responses. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-31493
|
11/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (UAIC) Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Gary Lewis's Motion to Strike and Motion to Enlarge the Record. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-33615
|
12/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. UAIC shall have until December 22, 2021, to file its responses. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-35884
|
12/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (UAIC) Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Gary Lewis's Motion to Strike and Motion to Enlarge the Record. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-36578
|
12/24/2021 | Motion | Filed United Automobile Insurance Company's Motion to Correct Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-36709
|
12/24/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent UAIC's Corrected Supplemental Appendix Tab 2 (Pages 65-345). Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-36710
|
12/24/2021 | Motion | Filed United Automobile Insurance Company's Combined Response to Appellant Gary Lewis's Motion to Strike and Motion to Enlarge the Record and Alternative Countermotion for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81510/81710 (SC) | | 21-36711
|
01/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Strike and Alternative Motion to Enlarge the Record and Granting Motion to Correct Supplemental Appendix. Appellant Gary Lewis has filed a motion to strike portions of respondent United Automobile Insurance Company's (UAIC) supplemental appendix. The motion to strike and alternative motion to enlarge the record are denied. The corrected supplemental appendix, tab 2 (pages 65-345) was filed on December 24, 2021. fn1[UAIC filed a motion for an extension of time to file its reply on December 22, 2021. The motion is granted. The reply was filed on December 24, 2021.] Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 22-01888
|
03/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/LS/MG. Nos 81510/81710. (SC) | | 22-08498
|
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos 81510/81710. (SC) | | 22-11250
|
04/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos 81510/81710. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 12, 2022. Nos. 81510/81710. (SC) | | 22-11250
|