Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/02/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
10/02/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-36303
|
10/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-36306
|
10/19/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Flangas McMillan Law Group, Inc.. Check No. 1666. (SC) | | |
10/19/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-38231
|
10/19/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC). | | 20-38303
|
10/20/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC). | | 20-38344
|
10/21/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals, Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-38575
|
10/27/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Due on Cross-Appeal (Sam Toll). Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | |
10/27/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal (Sam Toll). Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-39324
|
10/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee on Cross-Appeal. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-39326
|
10/29/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Luke Busby, LTD. Check No. 814. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | |
11/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. . Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-39814
|
11/03/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (No. 81874). (SC) | | 20-40071
|
11/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (No. 81874). (SC) | | 20-40986
|
12/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 81583/81726/81874 (SC) | | 20-43650
|
12/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-43904
|
12/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "The appeal in Docket No. 81583 is dismissed." The briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request in Docket Nos. 81726 and 81874. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and an appendix. SNP20 - MG/LS/AS. Nos 81583/81726/81874. SC) | | 20-45486
|
12/29/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-46856
|
12/29/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-46875
|
12/31/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Require Appeal Bond. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 20-47090
|
01/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 7, if he has not already done so, and provide this court with written proof of compliance. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 21-01401
|
02/09/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 2, 2021. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 21-03812
|
03/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. Nos. 81726/81874. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/3/21). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. Nos. 81728/81874 (SC) | | 21-06196
|
03/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1-6. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
03/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 7- 12. (Volume 7 starts with Exhibit, no cover page or index). (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 13. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
03/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Amended Joint Appendix. Vol. 7. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
03/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | 21-06654
|
03/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extension of Time to Respond to Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | 21-07775
|
03/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Appeals. Nos.
81726/81874. (SC) | | 21-07847
|
03/26/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due: April 15, 2021. Nos. 81726/81874 (SC). | | 21-08713
|
03/31/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Respondent/Cross-Appellant (Sam Toll's) Motion to Dismiss Appeals. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 21-09384
|
04/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | 21-09576
|
04/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant/cross-respondent (appellant) has filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss. Respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) opposes the motion. The motion is granted. The opposition was filed on March 31, 2021. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply in support of the motion to dismiss. Respondent's countermotion for an extension of time to file the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). Respondent shall have until May 3, 2021, to file and serve the combined brief. Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | 21-09590
|
04/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Notwithstanding appellant's failure to comply with this court's January 15 order, but based upon the information appellant has provided to this court, appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to demonstrate that the documents attached to the opposition relate to the appeal bonds for these appeals, and that the bond for each appeal has been paid. Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | 21-11093
|
04/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Order dated April, 16, 2021. Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | 21-11688
|
04/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874. (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Index to Appendix. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 8726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 4. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 5. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 6. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 7. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 8. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 9. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 10. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 11. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 12. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 13. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/21 ORDER). Nos. 81726/81874 (SC) | | |
05/20/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order. Because appellant does not demonstrate that the documents attached to his opposition related to the appeal bond in Docket No. 81874 and that the appeal bond had been paid, we grant the motion to dismiss as it relates to that appeal, and "we dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 81874." JH/RP/EC. (SC) | | 21-14539
|
06/14/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-16958
|
06/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/18/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16958
|
12/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Substitution of Attorneys from Flangas Law Group to Courtney G. Forster of Gunderson Law Firm. (SC) | | 21-34889
|
12/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding the substitution of counsel filed on December 7, 2021. The remittitur issued and this case was closed on June 14, 2021. (SC) | | 21-35026
|
01/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice. (SC) | | 22-00707
|
01/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, the appeal in Docket No. 81726 is dismissed. The stipulation also purports to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 81874. The appeal in Docket No. 81874 was dismissed on May 20, 2021. This court therefore takes no action on the stipulation to the extent it purports to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 81874. Nos. 810726/81874. (SC) | | 22-00721
|