Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81962
Short Caption:BROWN (LARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80094
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C326247Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/16/2022How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - Criminal. (SC)
10/20/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-38343
10/21/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Jill Hawkins. 9/6/17, 10/4/17, 10/11/17, 12/13/17. Robin Page. 10/31/17; 12/19/17; 2/27/18; 3/6/18; 4/3/18, 4/17/18; 4/24/18; 4/26/18; 5/8/18; 5/22/18; 5/31/18; 6/7/18; 8/9/18; 8/30/18; 11/27/18; 1/17/19; 3/21/19; 4/25/19; 5/30/19; 6/27/19; 8/01/19; 8/15/19; 8/20/19; 8/22/19; 10/29/19; 11/05/19; 11/14/19; 12/09/19; 12/10/19; 12/11/19; 12/12/19; 12/17/191; 12/18/19; 12/19/19; 12/20/19; 8/6/2020; 9/18/2020. Stacey Ray. 9/14/2017; 10/19/17. (SC)20-38662
10/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SEALED) (SC)
11/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (First Request) (SC)20-41183
11/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: December 10, 2020. (SC).20-41454
11/23/2020MotionFiled Court Recorder Robin Page's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts. (SC)20-42662
11/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Robin Page's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: December 9, 2020. (SC)20-42880
11/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)20-43078
11/30/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SEALED)(SC)
12/08/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:9/6/17, 10/4/17, 10/11/17, and 12/13/17. (SC)20-44597
12/10/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)20-44946
12/11/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Second Amended NOA) (SC)20-45117
12/15/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) District Court Minutes C-17-326247-1. (SC)
12/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/9/19, 12/10/19, 12/11/19, 12/12/19, 12/13/19, 12/17/19, 12/18/19, 12/19/19, and 12/20/19. (SC)20-45395
12/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/18/20. (SC)20-45398
12/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:10/31/17, 12/19/17, 2/27/18, 3/6/18, 4/3/18, 4/17/18, 4/24/18, 4/26/18, 5/8/18, 5/22/18, 5/31/18, 6/7/18, 8/9/18, 8/30/18, 11/27/18, 1/17/19, 3/21/19, 4/25/19, 5/30/19, 6/27/19, 8/1/19, 8/15/19, 8/20/19, 8/22/19, 10/29/19, 11/5/19, 11/14/19, and 8/6/20. (SC)20-45399
12/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/14/14 and 10/19/17. (SC)20-45400
12/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/5/20. (SC)20-46052
02/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-04726
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 18, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.21-05774
05/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule, Transmit Sealed Hearing Transcript, and to Unseal Record, or in the Alternative, Motion Seeking Guidance on How to Cite to Sealed Record. (SC)21-13751
05/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to unseal a transcript of a hearing that was sealed by the district court so that appellant can refer to the transcript in the context of this appeal. . Additionally, appellant requests that the briefing schedule in this matter be suspended pending this court's resolution of the motion to unseal. this court defers ruling on the motion to unseal. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to submit a copy of the transcript to this court. The submitted transcript will remain confidential pending this court's ruling on the motion to unseal. Within the same time period, respondent shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to unseal. The briefing schedule in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-14407
06/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to unseal a transcript sealed by the district court. The unopposed motion is granted The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the transcript received on May 24, 2021. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and an appendix. (SC)21-16077
06/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Second Request)(SC)21-17550
06/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 9, 2021. (SC)21-18347
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)21-19554
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC)21-19534
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC)21-19535
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC)21-19536
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC)21-19537
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC)21-19538
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC)21-19539
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)21-19540
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC)21-19542
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC)21-19544
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10. (SC)21-19546
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11. (SC)21-19547
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12. (SC)21-19549
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13. (SC)21-19552
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 14. (SC)21-19553
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 15. (SC)21-19555
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 16. (SC)21-19558
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 17. (SC)21-19561
07/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 18. (SC)21-19560
07/08/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-19622
07/08/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Allow Opening Brief to Exceed Word Limitations. (SC)21-19625
07/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The opening brief was filed on July 8, 2021. Respondent shall have until August 9, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-19980
08/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Karen Mishler, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-22980
08/09/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)21-22981
08/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until September 8, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-23217
09/08/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-26033
09/08/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)21-26034
09/08/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Video Recording of Proceedings. (SC)21-26036
09/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to transmit a copy of the JAVS recordings from the district court proceedings. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court the JAVS recordings in case number C-17-326247-1, from Department 21 on December 11, 2019. (SC).21-27294
09/30/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) copy of JAVS recordings from Department 21 on December 11,2019. (SC)
10/07/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (1st Request)(SC)21-28773
10/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: December 7, 2021. (SC)21-29843
11/02/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-31481
11/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
11/04/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice for Change of Attorneys, to Remove Navid Afshar. (SC)21-31691
02/16/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)22-05199
05/23/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Original Exhibit. District court clerk's original exhibit due: 14 days. (SC)22-16232
06/23/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Silver/Cadish/Pickering. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Cadish. Pickering, J., concurring. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 44. NNP22-AS/EC/KP. (SC).22-19853
07/18/2022RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned State's Exhibit 100 to the 8th JDC. (SC)22-22428
07/18/2022Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/26/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Original Exhibits. On June 23, 2022, this court issued an opinion affirming the district court's decision on appeal. The concurrance included photographs of two exhibits. We have determined that the original exhibits are necessary for this court to be able to reproduce adequate images in the published opinion. Accordingly, the district court clerk shall, within 14 days of the date of this order, transmit to this court the original State's Exhibit 100 "Photo?Foot Print" and State's Exhibit 215 "Photo?Polo Sport Shoe" that were admitted in district court case number C-17-326247-1 on December 13, 2019. See generally NRAP 30(d). The clerk of this court shall return the original exhibits to the district court clerk upon completion of the reproduction of the exhibits. (SC)22-23433
08/05/2022ExhibitFiled Returned Exhibit (original). Exhibit: 100 and 215 returned to district court. (SC)
08/16/2022RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 26, 2022. (SC)22-22428