Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/26/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-05750
|
02/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-05752
|
03/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-06221
|
03/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 21-06223
|
03/03/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael P. Lowry. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
03/03/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross- Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-06237
|
03/05/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Thomas Christensen (Appellants/Cross-Respondents). (SC) | | |
03/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-06498
|
03/10/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James A. Kohl. (SC) | | 21-07031
|
03/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-08944
|
03/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Notice Pursuant to NRAP 44. (SC) | | 21-09147
|
03/30/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-09149
|
04/07/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Certification. The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Aaron D. Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on March 30, 2021, appellant filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 41.1305(1). See NRAP 44. (SC) | | 21-09958
|
04/12/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. (SC) | | 21-10558
|
04/13/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 14 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent(s): 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant(s): 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent(s): 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-10615
|
04/27/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/01/20, 09/16/20 and 01/12/21. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 21-12040
|
05/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Respondent/cross-appellant's shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this ceros-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants/cross-respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that respondent/cross-appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-12743
|
05/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-12981
|
05/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. The cross-appeal is dismissed. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption on this court's docket consistent with the caption appearing on this order. The briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Appellants' opening brief and appendix remain due by July 12, 2021. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (SC) | | 21-13918
|
07/07/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/cross-respondents' opening brief and appendix due: July 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19409
|
07/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-20751
|
08/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties have filed a stipulation for a second extension of time for appellants to file the opening brief. The stipulation is disapproved. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-22264
|
08/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-22868
|
08/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-23158
|
08/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-23159
|
08/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 2 (Part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-23160
|
08/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 2 (Part 2 of 2). (SC) | | 21-23161
|
08/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-23162
|
08/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants timely filed the opening brief and appendix on August 9, 2021. This court takes no action in regard to appellants' motion for an extension of time filed on August 6, 2021. Respondent shall have until September 8, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-23204
|
09/08/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-26019
|
09/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Nevada Tavern Association In Support of Respondent's Answering Brief. (AMICUS BRIEF DETACHED AND FILED SEPARATELY). (SC) | | 21-26677
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Proposed amicus Nevada Tavern Association (NTA) has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of respondent's answering brief. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed amicus brief from the motion and shall file it separately. (SC) | | 21-27861
|
09/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of Nevada Tavern Association in Support of Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27863
|
10/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-28776
|
10/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date November 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28783
|
11/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-32052
|
11/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-32058
|
11/08/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Proof of Service for Motion to Extend Time. (SC) | | 21-32093
|
11/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until November 22, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-32183
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Removal of Attorney Virginia T. Tomova. (SC) | | 21-33775
|
12/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/6/21) (SC) | | |
12/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document/Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-34645
|
12/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-34682
|
12/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-35085
|
12/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-35184
|
12/10/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-12697
|
07/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Pending Settlement. (SC) | | 22-23116
|
07/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed notice informing this court that the parties have reached a settlement that will result in the resolution of this appeal. Motion or stipulation to dismiss due: August 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23869
|
08/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 22-26199
|
08/23/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC) | | 22-26316
|