Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-06276
|
03/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-06278
|
03/08/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC) | | |
03/10/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Amanda M. Roberts. (SC) | | |
03/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-06925
|
03/11/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 21-07179
|
03/29/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 30, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-09019
|
04/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-09544
|
04/12/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 4/12/21)(SC) | | |
04/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-10431
|
04/19/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-11203
|
06/30/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 21-18886
|
07/01/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-18970
|
09/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-27973
|
09/29/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/24/19, 02/21/20, 03/27/20, 07/23/20, 08/06/20, 08/07/20, 11/19/20, 01/12/21. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/29/21). (SC) | | |
09/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Notice of Request for Transcripts. (SC) | | 21-27987
|
09/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Request for Transcripts. (SC) | | 21-28103
|
10/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Combined Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Request for Transcripts. (SC) | | 21-28679
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcript request form. Appellant shall have until November 22, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-30372
|
10/26/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/24/19, 2/21/20, 3/27/20, 7/23/20, 8/6/20, 8/7/20, 11/19/20, and 1/12/21. To Court Reporter: Maria Balagtas. (STRICKEN PER 12/3/21). (SC) | | |
11/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-33164
|
11/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Countermotion for Sanctions. (SC) | | 21-33383
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for a second extension (45 days) to file the opening brief is denied. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. The request for transcripts filed on October 6, 2021, does not conform to the provisions set forth in NRAP 9(a)(3). The clerk of this court shall strike the request for transcripts filed in this court on October 26, 2021. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form that fully complies with NRAP 9(a)(3). (SC) | | 21-34604
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. I. (SC) | | 21-35216
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. II. (SC) | | 21-35226
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. III. (SC) | | 21-35217
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. IV. (SC) | | 21-35218
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. V. (SC) | | 21-35220
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. VI. (SC) | | 21-35221
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. VII. (SC) | | 21-35222
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. VIII. (SC) | | 21-35231
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. IX. (SC) | | 21-35232
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. X. (SC) | | 21-35234
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XI. (SC) | | 21-35300
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XII. (SC) | | 21-35237
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XIII. (SC) | | 21-35240
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XIV. (SC) | | 21-35242
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XV. (SC) | | 21-35241
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XVI. (SC) | | 21-35244
|
12/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. XVII. (SC) | | 21-35243
|
12/10/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/24/16; 2/21/20; 3/27/20; 7/23/20; 8/6/20; 8/7/20; 11/19/20; and 1/12/21. (SC) | | 21-35261
|
12/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-35288
|
12/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) - Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent Emily's Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-36276
|
12/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-36277
|
12/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address & Phone Number for Respondent's Counsel. (SC) | | 21-36339
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-00794
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 2. (SC) | | 22-00795
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 3. (SC) | | 22-00796
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 4. (SC) | | 22-00797
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 5. (SC) | | 22-00798
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 6. (SC) | | 22-00799
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 7. (SC) | | 22-00800
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 8. (SC) | | 22-00801
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 9. (SC) | | 22-00802
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 10. (SC) | | 22-00803
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 11. (SC) | | 22-00804
|
01/11/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01065
|
01/11/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to the Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01115
|
01/28/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [Respondent's request for additional sanctions is denied. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief, errata, and appendix were filed on January 10 and 11, 2022. (SC) | | 22-02896
|
02/09/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Appellant. (SC) | | 22-04394
|
02/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Set Aside Order of Dismissal. (SC) | | 22-04573
|
02/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Set Aside Order Dismissing Appeal and Request for Sanctions. (SC) | | 22-05073
|
02/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to set aside this court's order dismissing the appeal. This court construes the motion to set aside the order as a petition for rehearing and will take no action on the petition until the filing fee is paid. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. If the filing fee is not paid within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-05090
|
02/22/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid on Rehearing. $150.00 from Gallagher Attorney Group LLC, check no. 1175. (SC) | | |
02/23/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Petitioner's Non-Compliance with This Court's Order & Request for Entry of Order Sanctioning Petitioner. (SC) | | 22-05841
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding respondent's opposition to appellant's motion to set aside the order dismissing this appeal. The request for sanctions is denied. (SC) | | 22-06210
|
03/18/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | 22-08618
|
04/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-11504
|
04/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
04/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel. (SC) | | 22-12281
|
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 13, 2022. (SC) | | 22-11504
|
05/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Denise A. Gallagher, Esq. and Gallagher Attorney Group, LLC, from the docket as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 22-14943
|