Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/10/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC). | | |
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I. (SC). | | 21-23223
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I, Cont... (SC). | | 21-23224
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II. (SC). | | 21-23225
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. III. (SC). | | 21-23226
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. III, Cont... (SC). | | 21-23227
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. IV. (SC). | | 21-23228
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. V. (SC). | | 21-23229
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. VI. (SC). | | 21-23230
|
08/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC). | | 21-23234
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. VII. (SC). | | 21-23268
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. VIII. (SC). | | 21-23269
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. VIII, Cont... (SC). | | 21-23270
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. VIII, Cont... (SC). | | 21-23271
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. IX. (SC). | | 21-23272
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. X. (SC). | | 21-23273
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. X, Cont... (SC) | | 21-23274
|
09/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-25947
|
09/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief due: October 11, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26306
|
10/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-28746
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Brian C. Padgett's motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Padgett shall have until November 10, 2021, to file and serve an opening brief. If Padgett does not timely file an opening brief, this matter will be submitted for decision without briefing or oral argument. (SC) | | 21-30308
|
11/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-32272
|
11/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 21-33201
|
11/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-33354
|
11/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The motions of Brian C. Padgett for third and fourth extensions of time to file the opening brief are granted. The opening brief was filed on November 18, 2021. The State Bar of Nevada shall have until December 20, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-33443
|
12/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request). (SC) | | 21-35682
|
12/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amended Certificate of Service. (Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time) (SC) | | 21-35974
|
12/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The State Bar shall have until January 19, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-36423
|
01/19/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/20/22) (SC) | | |
01/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.(SC) | | 22-02015
|
01/20/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-02101
|
02/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 22-05504
|
02/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Brian C. Padgett shall have until March 14, 2022, to file and serve any reply brief. (SC) | | 22-06092
|
03/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time (Second Request) for Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-08033
|
03/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: March 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08299
|
03/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-09185
|
03/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-09629
|
03/29/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-09784
|
03/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Brian C. Padgett's motions for third and fourth extensions of time to file the reply brief are granted. The reply brief was filed on March 30, 2022. (SC) | | 22-09868
|
03/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/19/2022 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Order of Disbarment. "We disbar attorney Brian C. Padgett from the practice of law." En Banc. (SC). | | 22-15846
|
05/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Padgett - Notice to Courts No. 83347. (SC) | | 22-15960
|
06/13/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-18670
|
06/13/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on June 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18670
|