Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
12/22/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-36500
|
12/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 21-36502
|
12/22/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (Sealed) (SC) | | |
12/28/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-36869
|
01/11/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 22-01147
|
01/11/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-01148
|
01/11/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/12/21; 6/8/21 and 8/12/21. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice. (SC) | | 22-01172
|
01/12/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (Sealed) (SC) | | |
02/11/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Court Reporter Sherry Justice's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: March 10, 2022. (SC) | | 22-04692
|
02/16/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Micah Echols and David Snyder. (SC) | | 22-05166
|
03/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Court Reporter's Motion to Extend Time to Prepare Transcripts. (SC) | | 22-08029
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Rachel Chaisson of Transcript Video Services has filed a motion for a second extension of time to prepare and file certain transcripts. The motion is granted to the following extent. Court reporter certificate due: April 11, 2022. Given the extension of time to prepare and file transcripts, the time to file the opening brief and appendix is extended as follows. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: June 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-09682
|
04/05/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/22. (SC) | | 22-10588
|
04/05/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/8/21. (SC) | | 22-10592
|
06/07/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18095
|
06/21/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/6/21 and 12/9/21. (SC) | | 22-19607
|
06/21/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/12/21 and 8/12/21. (SC) | | 22-19608
|
06/23/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/23/22) (SC) | | |
06/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Portions of Appellant's Appendix. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/23/22) (SC) | | |
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1-7. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/23/22) (SC) | | |
06/23/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-19903
|
06/23/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-19914
|
06/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Portions of Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | 22-19915
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-19916
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 2. (SC) | | 22-19917
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 3. (SC) | | 22-19923
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 3 (cont...). (SC) | | 22-19933
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 4. (SC) | | 22-19935
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 5. (SC) | | 22-19934
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 6. (SC) | | 22-19936
|
06/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's, Volume 7. (SC) | | 22-19937
|
06/30/2022 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of Attorney for the Rights of Older Persons and Persons with a Physical Disability, an Intellectual Disability, or a Related Condition under NRS 427A. (SC) | | 22-20754
|
07/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file portions of the appendix under seal is granted. SRCR 7. The clerk shall file the portion of the appendix received on June 27, 2022, under seal. (SC) | | 22-21065
|
07/05/2022 | Appendix | Filed SEALED Appendix, pages 1-6 and pages 542 -549. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER FILED 7/5/22). (SC) | | |
07/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC) | | 22-23358
|
07/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Answering Brief due: August 24, 2022) (SC) | | 22-23366
|
08/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-26451
|
09/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until September 23, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 22-27847
|
09/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Appendix (Third Request). (SC) | | 22-29987
|
09/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Master Index to Respondents' Appendix. (SC) | | 22-30033
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 1 (Nos. 1-58, 65-147, 150-228). (SC) | | 22-30034
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 2 (Nos. 229-468). (SC) | | 22-30035
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 3 (Nos. 469-602, 608-613). (SC) | | 22-30036
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 4 (Nos. 666-723, 725-877). (SC) | | 22-30037
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 5 (Nos. 878-1030). (SC) | | 22-30038
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 6 (Nos. 1031-1089). (SC) | | 22-30039
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 7 (Nos. 1272-1338, 1356-1403). (SC) | | 22-30040
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 9 (Nos. 1482-1483, 1490-1687). (SC) | | 22-30041
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 10 (Nos. 1688-1895). (SC) | | 22-30042
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 11 (Nos. 1909-2038). (SC) | | 22-30043
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 12 (Nos. 2039-2219). (SC) | | 22-30044
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 13 (Nos. 2220-2330). (SC) | | 22-30045
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 14 (Nos. 2331-2361, 2367-2500). (SC) | | 22-30046
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 15 (Nos. 2501-2671). (SC) | | 22-30047
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 16 (Nos. 2672-2843). (SC) | | 22-30048
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix. Volume 17 (Nos. 2844-2937). (SC) | | 22-30049
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 19 (Nos. 3191-3219). (SC) | | 22-30050
|
09/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix, Volume 20 (Nos. 3220-3393). (SC) | | 22-30051
|
10/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: October 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31060
|
10/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Portions of Respondents' Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-31431
|
10/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-31766
|
10/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court defers ruling on the motion. Respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to submit paper copies of the documents they seek to file under seal. (SC) | | 22-32887
|
10/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Submitting Paper Copies of Paper Copies of the Portions of Respondents' Appendix Volumes for Filing Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-33643
|
10/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike Portions of Respondent's Appendix. (SC) | | 22-33976
|
11/07/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' response to Appellant's Motion to Strike Portions of Respondent's Appendix due: November 21, 2022. (SC) | | 22-34989
|
11/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-35055
|
11/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Respondents' Appendix. (SC) | | 22-36641
|
12/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Motion to Strike Portions of Respondents' Appendix. (SC) | | 22-37833
|
12/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents have filed a motion to file numerous documents in their appendix under seal. Appellant does not oppose the motion to seal but moves to strike several volumes of respondents' appendix on the basis that they contain documents that were not before the district court when the order challenged on appeal was entered. Respondents oppose the motion. The motion to strike documents from respondents' appendix is denied at this time. Respondents' motion to file documents under seal is granted to the following extent. The clerk shall file all portions of respondents' appendix received on October 27, 2022, under seal, except volume 8. The motion to seal is denied with respect to the document within volume 8. Respondents may file a renewed motion to file the document in volume 8 under seal within 7 days of the date of this order, if deemed warranted. fn1 [Appellant's untimely motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of the motion to strike is denied.] (SC) | | 22-38089
|
12/05/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents (SEALED) Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 1, 59-64; 148-149; Volume 3, 603-607; 614-665; Volume 4, 724; Volume 6, 1090-1271; Volume 7, 1339-1355; 1385-1395; Volume 9, 1484-1489; Volume 10, 1896-1908; Volume 14, 2362-2366; Volume 17, 2938-2981; Volume 18, 2982-3149; and Volume 19, 3150-3190. (SC) | | |
12/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Renewed Motion to File Documents in Appendix Volume 8 Under Seal (First Request). (SC) | | 22-38956
|
12/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on December 12, 2022, is granted. Respondents shall have until December 27, 2022, to file and serve any renewed motion to file the document in volume 8 of the appendix under seal. (SC) | | 22-39135
|
12/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents Renewed Motion for Leave to File Portions of Respondents' Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-40668
|
01/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents have filed a renewed motion for leave to file a portion of the appendix under seal. Specifically, respondents seek to seal a portion of volume 8 of the appendix containing financial and medical records. The unopposed motion is granted. The clerk shall file the following portions of volume 8 of the appendix, received on October 27, 2022, under seal: pages 1455-60, 1462-65, and 1476-81. The remainder of volume 8 shall be filed on this court's public docket. (SC) | | 23-01107
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix. Vol. 8 (SC) | | 23-01108
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' (SEALED) Portions of Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol 8. (pages 1455-60, 1462-65, and 1476-81). (SC) | | |
03/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 23-09083
|
03/28/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Maria L. Parra-Sandoval. (SC) | | 23-09481
|
07/05/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the notice of withdrawal of counsel, the clerk of this court shall remove Maria L. Parra-Sandoval as counsel of record for appellant. Attorneys Scott W. Cardenas and Elizabeth R. Mikesell of the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada shall remain counsel of record for appellant. (SC) | | 23-21342
|
07/06/2023 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. 139 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. SNP23-DH/PL/RP. (SC). | | 23-21507
|
07/31/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-24389
|
07/31/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
08/10/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 08/02/23. (SC) | | 23-24389
|