Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/26/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/26/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-02369
|
01/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-02371
|
02/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Audrey Kramer. Check no. 637. (SC) | | |
02/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 21-03920
|
02/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Michael K. Wall of the law firm of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC as counsel for respondent Breckenridge Property Funds 2016, LLC). (SC) | | 21-04180
|
02/17/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC). | | 21-04686
|
02/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/01/19 and 09/08/20. To Court Reporter: Michelle Loomis. (SC) | | 21-05344
|
03/02/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-06152
|
03/09/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. The district court clerk's record on appeal due: April 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-06779
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume I. (SC) | | 21-09599
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume II. (SC) | | 21-09600
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume III. (SC) | | 21-09602
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume IV. (SC) | | 21-09605
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume V. (SC) | | 21-09608
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-09612
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume VII. (SC) | | 21-09613
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume VIII. (SC) | | 21-09614
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume IX. (SC) | | 21-09615
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume X. (SC) | | 21-09616
|
04/02/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume XI. (SC) | | 21-09619
|
04/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michel Loomis stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/01/19 and 09/08/20. (SC) | | 21-10241
|
05/24/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' opening brief due: June 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-14835
|
06/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-18209
|
06/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until July 14, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief. (SC) | | 21-18561
|
07/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Opening Brief of Appellants. (SC) | | 21-20426
|
07/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter Returning Appendices. (SC) | | 21-20432
|
08/09/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel H. Stewart of the law firm of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC hereby appears on behalf of Breckenridge Property Funds 2016, LLC). (SC) | | 21-23061
|
08/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-23062
|
08/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC's answering brief due: September 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23345
|
08/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation shall have until August 30, 2021, to file and serve their answering brief. (SC) | | 21-23877
|
08/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-25182
|
09/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-26674
|
10/06/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Reply Brief due: November 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28631
|
11/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Reply Brief to Appellee, National Default Servicing Corporation's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-31489
|
11/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Permission to File over-sized Reply Brief in Excess of Words/Pages in Support of Appellants' Reply Brief to Appellee, Breckenridge's Answering Brief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Appellant, Audrey Kramer Filed Concurrent Herewith; in Support Thereof. (SC) | | 21-31494
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening & Reply Briefs. (SC) | | 21-31498
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening & Reply Briefs. "Appellant-Leo Kramer's Bankruptcy Case # 10-43951" Summary of Schedules. RJN-1 (SC) | | 21-31502
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening Brief & Reply Briefs. Licensed Private Investigator, William J. Paatalo's Updated Declaration, Cirriculum Vitae. Exhibit - "Final Report of the Examiner" RJN-2. (SC) | | 21-31509
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening & Reply Briefs " Final report of the Examiner" RJN-3 "Vol-1, Pages 1-123". (SC) | | 21-31511
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening & Reply Briefs " Final report of the Examiner" RJN-3 "Vol-2, Pages 124-239". (SC) | | 21-31513
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening & Reply Briefs " Final report of the Examiner" RJN-3 "Vol-3, Pages 240-369". (SC) | | 21-31515
|
11/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Requests to Take Judicial Notice. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/9/21) (SC) | | |
11/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-32255
|
11/09/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-32268
|
11/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Motion to Strike Requests to Take Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 21-32437
|
11/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Motion to Strike Requests to Take Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants' Opening Brief & Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-33258
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-33864
|
12/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants, who are proceeding pro se, have filed a motion asking that this court take judicial notice of three documents. They have also filed a motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the page and type-volume limitation. Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC has filed a motion to strike the motion for judicial notice and portions of the reply brief. Appellants oppose the motion. Breckenridge's request to strike the motion for judicial notice is denied. Nevertheless, this court construes the motion to strike as an opposition to the motion for judicial notice and construes appellants' opposition to Breckenridge's motion as a reply in support of the motion for judicial notice. Having considered the parties' filings, the motion for judicial notice is denied. To date, respondent Alyssa McDermott has not filed an answering brief in this matter. However, in their docketing statement, appellants state that McDermott is not a respondent to this matter. Accordingly, unless any party objects, in writing, within 7 days of the date of this order, the clerk shall modify the caption in this matter to remove respondent Alyssa McDermott. Appellants' motion to file a reply brief in excess of the page and type-limitations of NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) is denied. The clerk shall reject the reply brief received on November 2, 2021. Appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief that complies with the page or type-volume limitations of NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). | | 21-34690
|
12/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief to Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-36506
|
12/22/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/11/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-04721
|
02/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
02/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
05/06/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-14483
|
05/06/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
05/27/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
05/27/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
05/27/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
05/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-16951
|
06/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until June 24, 2022, to file and serve a petition for review. If no petition for review is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-17272
|
06/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Proper Person Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-18247
|
06/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' petition for review due: July 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20053
|
07/12/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-21887
|
07/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Petitioners' Motion requesting Admittance and Review of Transcripts from May 1, 2019 & September 8, 2020 Motion Hearings in the Third Judicial District Court of Lyon County. (SC) | | 22-21889
|
07/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellants/Petitioners' Motion for Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants/Petitioners' Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-21890
|
07/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Breckenridge Property Funds 2016, LLC's Notice of Appearance for Robert E. Werbicky. (SC) | | 22-22716
|
07/19/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Petitioners' Motion requesting Admittance and Review of Transcripts from May 1, 2019 & September 8, 2020 Motion Hearings in the Third Judicial District Court of Lyon. (SC) | | 22-22718
|
07/19/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Appellants/Petitioners' Motion for Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants/Petitioners' Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-22719
|
07/25/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants shall have until August 9, 2022, to file and serve a reply to the opposition to motion requesting admittance and review of transcripts filed on July 19, 2022; and a reply to the opposition to motion for request for judicial notice in support of appellants/petitioners' petition for review filed on July 19, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23334
|
07/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Joinder to Breckenridge Properties Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Request for Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 22-23521
|
07/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Joinder to Breckenridge Properties Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Admittance and Review of Transcripts. (SC) | | 22-23522
|
08/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Proper Person Motion. Petitioners' Reply to Respondent, Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Appellants/Petitioners' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants/Petitioners' Petition for Bill of Review. (SC) | | 22-24858
|
08/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Proper Person Motion. Petitioners' Reply to Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Appellants/Petitioners' Motion Requesting Admittance and Review of Transcripts from May 1, 2019 & September 8, 2020, Motion Hearings in the Third Judicial District Court of Lyon County. (SC) | | 22-24859
|
08/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Proper Person Motion. Petitioners' Motion to Strike National Default Servicing Corporation's Joinder Motion to Breckenridge Properties Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Appellant/Petitioners' Motion for Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellants/Petitioners' Petition for Bill of Review. (SC). | | 22-24862
|
08/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Proper Person Motion. Petitioners' Motion to Strike National Default Servicing Corporation's Joinder Motion to Breckenridge Properties Fund 2016, LLC's Opposition to Appellant/Petitioners' Motion Requesting Admittance and Review of Transcripts from May 1, 2019 & September 8, 2020, Motion Hearings in the Third Judicial District Court of Lyon County, in Support of Appellants/Petitioners' Petition for Bill of Review. (SC) | | 22-24863
|
09/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellants have filed pro se motions to admit and review transcripts of the district court proceedings and to take judicial notice of certain documents. The motion to provide this court with additional transcripts is denied at this time. The motion for judicial notice is also denied. fn1 [Appellants' have filed an unopposed motion to strike the joinders as untimely. Although the joinders were filed beyond the time allowed to oppose appellants' motions, this court denies the motions to strike. This court has also considered appellants' replies in support of their motions although they exceed the page limitations. See NRAP 27(d)(2).] (SC) | | 22-28535
|
09/13/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN Banc (SC) | | 22-28618
|
09/13/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-28619
|
09/13/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28619
|