Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/26/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
05/26/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-16736
|
05/26/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-16738
|
05/26/2022 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Benjamin B. Childs. (SC) | | |
05/26/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-16780
|
05/27/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 22-16895
|
05/27/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/16/21 and 1/20/22. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter for Dept. 14, 8th JD. (SC) | | 22-16988
|
05/31/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-17113
|
06/06/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Supplemental Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/13/21. To Court Reporter: Department 14.(SC) | | 22-17972
|
06/07/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's (Precision Assets) Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-18177
|
07/11/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/16/21. (SC) | | 22-21712
|
07/22/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/13/21. (SC) | | 22-23146
|
08/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1-3. (SC) | | 22-26053
|
08/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 3-5. (SC) | | 22-26054
|
08/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 6-8. (SC) | | 22-26056
|
08/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-26057
|
08/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-26058
|
09/14/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent WFG National Title Insurance Company's answering brief due: October 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28707
|
09/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Precision Assets) Notice of Appearance for Micah S. Echols and David P. Snyder. (SC) | | 22-29415
|
09/20/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Precision Assets, LLC) Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (First Request) (SC) | | 22-29571
|
09/26/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Precision Assets' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-30147
|
09/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Acry Development LLC) Notice of Appearance for John Benedict. (SC) | | 22-30358
|
09/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Acry Development LLC) Motion to Extend Time to File it's Joinder to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-30361
|
09/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Acry Development LLC) Joinder to Respondent Presision Assets, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-30363
|
09/30/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix . Vol. 10 (SC) | | 22-30843
|
09/30/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service. (SC) | | 22-30844
|
10/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (WFG National Title Insurance Company) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-31210
|
10/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Acry Development LLC) Joinder to (WFG national Title Insurance Company) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-31373
|
10/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Respondent Precision Assets, LLC, has filed a motion for a 60-day extension of time to file an answering brief based on having just retained new counsel. Respondent Acry Development, LLC has filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file a joinder in Precision Assets' motion. Acry's motion is granted. The joinder was filed on September 27, 2022. The motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief(s) is granted to the following extent. Precision Assets' answering brief due: 30 days. Within the same time period, Acry shall file and serve its answering brief or a joinder in Precision Assets answering brief. fn1 [Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed on September 19, 2022, the clerk of this court shall add attorneys Micah S. Echols and David P. Snyder and the Claggett & Sykes Law Firm to the docket as counsel for respondent Precision Assets, LLC.] (SC) | | 22-31842
|
11/08/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Precision Assets Notice of Appearance for Charlie Finlayson. (SC) | | 22-35203
|
11/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent Precision Assets, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-35450
|
11/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent Acry Development LLC Joinder to Precision Assets, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-35452
|
11/30/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: December 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-37618
|
12/02/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (WFG National Title Insurance Company) Notice of Appearance for Christina V. Miller. (SC) | | 22-37885
|
12/05/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Precision Assets Notice of Supplement to NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. (SC). | | 22-38117
|
12/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Precision Assets Motion for Leave to Modify Caption. (SC). | | 22-38118
|
12/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Limited Non-Opposition to Precision Assets' Motion for Leave to Modify Caption. (SC). | | 22-38940
|
12/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing and having considered appellant's limited non-opposition, the motion to amend the caption filed by respondent Precision Assets is granted. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption to conform to the caption on this order. (SC) | | 22-39245
|
12/22/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC). | | 22-40281
|
12/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
01/09/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. (SC). | | 23-00605
|
01/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent Precision Assets's Motion to Strike Appellant's Supplemental Authority. (SC). | | 23-01762
|
01/19/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Supplement. (SC) | | 23-01829
|
01/19/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Acry Development LLC'S Joinder to Motion to Strike Appellant's Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 23-01869
|
01/20/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (WFG National Title Insurance Company) Joinder tp Precision Assets' Motion to Strike Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | 23-01948
|
01/27/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant filed supplemental authorities. Respondents have filed and joined in a motion to strike on the ground that the newly cited authorities were readily available to appellant before he filed the opening brief. Appellant opposes the motion. The motion to strike is denied. (SC) | | 23-02680
|
04/21/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." LS/PL/LB. (SC) | | 23-12433
|
05/08/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-14560
|
05/09/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-14610
|
05/09/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service for Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-14618
|
05/10/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Amended Petition for Rehearing. (SC). | | 23-14700
|
05/10/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Benjamin B. Childs. (SC). | | |
06/16/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). LS/PL/LB. (SC) | | 23-19155
|
06/29/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-20727
|
07/10/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days from the date of this order. (SC) | | 23-21882
|
07/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record with Exhibits. (SC) | | 23-22508
|
07/20/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Precision Assets' response due: August 3, 2023. (SC) | | 23-23301
|
07/20/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (WFG National Title Insurance Company) Opposition to Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. (SC) | | 23-23308
|
07/24/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's (WFG National Title Insurance Company) Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-23525
|
07/24/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's (Precision Assets) Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-23562
|
07/24/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Precision Assets) Response to Motion - Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. (SC) | | 23-23566
|
07/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Oppositions to Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. (SC) | | 23-24145
|
07/28/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a petition for en banc reconsideration and a motion to supplement the record with two newspaper articles addressing the general subjects of the issues on appeal. Respondents oppose the motion on the ground that the articles were not considered by the district court. Appellant has filed a reply. Having considered the arguments of the parties, this court is not convinced that supplementation of the record is warranted. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 23-24264
|
08/21/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (WFG National Title Insurance Company) Notice of Appearance for Hugo Hernandez-Diaz. (SC) | | 23-27170
|
08/24/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC) | | 23-27676
|
09/18/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-30423
|
09/18/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
10/02/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 09/20/23. (SC) | | 23-30423
|