Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65456
Short Caption:HIGH NOON AT ARLINGTON RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASS'N VS. DIST. CT. (D.R. HORTON, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52798, 58533, 58630, 65423, 66085, 66101
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A542616Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/07/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/07/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Paul P. Terry, Jr..
04/18/2014Petition/WritFiled Petitioner, High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.14-12556
04/18/2014OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal.
04/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.14-12576
04/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.14-12578
04/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.14-12579
04/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.14-12580
04/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.14-12581
05/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.14-15556
06/11/2014Petition/WritFiled Real-Party-In-Interest, D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Answer to Petitioner's Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.14-19196
06/11/2014AppendixFiled Real-Party-In-Interest, D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Appendix to Answer to Petitioner's Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus .14-19197
06/27/2014Petition/WritFiled Petitioner, High Noon At Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association's Reply In Support Of Petition For Writ Of Prohibition Or Mandamus.14-21129
08/07/2014MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of all Parties' Petitions for Writ of Mandamus; Request for Expedited Consideration Pursuant to NRAP 8(2)(D)14-25939
08/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Expedited Response to Emergency Stay Motion. Real Party in Interest's Opposition due: Thursday, August 14, 2014, by 4 p.m. Petitioner's Reply due: Friday, August 15, 2014, by 4 p.m. All documents to be filed and served personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.14-26418
08/14/2014MotionFiled D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Limited Joinder To Petitioner's Emergency Motion For Stay Of District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution Of All Parties' Petitions For Writ Of Mandamus; Request For Expedited Consideration Pursuant to NRAP 8(2)(D).14-26684
08/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. Having considered the motion and joinder, we grant the motion and stay all further proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A542616, pending further order of this court.14-27035
11/03/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-36247
11/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, January 7, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-37885
12/01/2014MotionFiled Real-Party-In-Interest, D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Motion To Consolidate Writ Petitions For Oral Argument.14-39106
12/02/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Shortening Time to File Responses. In Docket No. 65456, oral argument has been scheduled for January 7, 2015. D.R. Horton, Inc., has filed motions to consolidate Docket No. 65993 with Docket No. 65456 for purposes of oral argument. Expedited responses to the motions would assist this court in efficiently managing its caseload. Accordingly, High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association (petitioner in Docket No. 65456) and First Light Homeowners Association (real party in interest in Docket No. 65993) shall each file a response to the motion in their respective case by noon on Thursday, December 4, 2014. NRAP 27(a)(3)(A). Nos. 65456/65993.14-39225
12/04/2014MotionFiled High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association's Notice Of Non-Opposition To Real Party In Interest D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Motion To Consolidate Writ Petitions For Oral Argument. Nos. 65456/65993.14-39521
12/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Shortening Time to File Reply. An expedited reply that includes a response to High Noon's statement regarding Wolfenzon Rolle and specifies which counsel will present argument on behalf of D.R. Horton, Inc., at any consolidated argument would assist this court in resolving the motion. Accordingly, D.R. Horton, Inc., shall file such a reply by noon on Tuesday, December 9, 2014. Nos. 65456/65993.14-39857
12/09/2014MotionFiled Affidavit Of Bruno Wolfenzon, Esq. In Response To Order Shortening TimeTo Reply.14-40055
12/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Cases for Oral Argument. Oral Argument will be held before the en banc court on January 7, 2015, at 10 a.m. in Carson City; each side will be allowed 20 minutes for argument. fn1[Counsel for each side shall coordinate among themselves how their time is to be allocated.] Nos. 65456/65993.14-40234
12/17/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP associating with Wolfenzon Rolle.14-41098
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 65456/6599314-42021
12/29/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. The court directs the parties to specifically address at oral argument, the effect of NRS 40.640(5)on the issues presented in Docket No. 65456. Nos. 65456/ 65993.14-42272
12/29/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Corrected Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 65456/6599314-42274
01/02/2015Notice/IncomingFiled D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Nevada Legislature Sixty-Eighth Session 1995 Summary of Legislation. Nos. 65456/65993.15-00081
01/02/2015Notice/IncomingFiled D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Nevada Legislature Sixty-Eighth Session 1995 Summary of Legislation. Nos. 65456/65993.15-00083
01/07/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/03/2015MotionFiled Real Party In Interest First Light Homeowners Association's Motion to Supplement Appendix. Nos. 65456/65993. (DETACHTED EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 5/8/15).15-10067
04/14/2015MotionFiled Response to Motion D.R. Horton's Response to First Light Homeowners Association's Motion to Supplement Appendix15-11096
04/14/2015MotionFiled Response to Motion D.R. Horton's Response to First Light Homeowners Association's Motion to Supplement Appendix. (Duplicate Filing)15-11097
05/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Real party in interest in Docket No. 65593 has filed a motion for leave to supplement the appendix with a report prepared by petitioner's expert. The motion is opposed. No cause appearing, we deny the motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the exhibits 1 and 2 to the motion filed on April 3, 2015, and return them unfiled. Nos. 65456/65993.15-14160
07/13/2015MotionFiled Real Party in Interest First Light Homeowners Association and Petition D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Pending Settlement and Motion to Stay Decision. Nos. 65456/65993.15-21215
07/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. The parties shall have 10 days from the date of this order to inform this court when the district court hearing regarding the proposed settlement is scheduled to take place. Nos. 65456/65993.15-22158
07/29/2015MotionFiled Joint Response to Supreme Court's Order to Show Cause.15-22982
09/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties shall have until September 11, 2015, to inform this court, in writing, of the date and/or results of any status hearing regarding the settlement agreement. Nos. 65456/65993.15-26778
09/04/2015MotionFiled Response to Supreme Court's Order Dated September 3, 2015. Nos. 65456/65993.15-26861
09/11/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report Regarding Settlement of Case. Nos. 65456/65993.15-27515
09/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner in Docket No. 65933 shall have until October 23, 2015, to file and serve a stipulation or motion to voluntarily dismiss this petition. Nos. 65456/65993.15-28503
10/19/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. No. 6593315-31706
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, the petition in Docket No. 65993 is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Nos. 65456/65993.15-32457
09/27/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its partial summary judgment order and reconsider the partial summary judgment in light of this order. Fn1[The honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter. The honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 66. EN BANC17-32837
09/27/2017WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the Opinion mailed to Attorney Paul Terry for service upon Judge Susan Johnson.17-32898
10/23/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-36233
10/23/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/23/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Susan Johnson on October 11, 2017.17-36238