Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/05/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC) | | |
11/05/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 18-902642
|
11/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC) | | 18-902644
|
11/05/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marquis Aurbach Coffing. Check no. 125318. (Cross-Appeal ) (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) (SC) | | |
11/05/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC) | | 18-902649
|
11/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 18-902652
|
11/13/2018 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Eric B. Zimbelman | | |
11/14/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC). | | 18-904169
|
12/03/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Late Partial Joinder to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 18-906778
|
12/03/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion for Leave to File Late Partial Joinder to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 18-906791
|
12/05/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Motion for Leave to File Late Partial Joinder to Docketing Statement and Partial Joinder to Helix Electric of Nevada's Docketing Statement). (SC) | | 18-907104
|
12/05/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Tom Stewart as counsel for Respondent/Cross-Appellant). (SC) | | 18-907148
|
12/18/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge intends to remain in contact with, and available to, the parties and their counsel for the next three weeks to see whether settlement efforts might lead to a resolution by agreement. Case Nos. 76276/77320. (SC). | | 18-909307
|
01/04/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Docket No. 76276 and Directing the Clerk to Transfer Partial Joinder from Docket No. 77320 to Docket No. 76276. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file a partial joinder to appellants' docketing statement and amended docketing statement is granted in Docket No. 76276. The motion filed on December 21, 2018, in Docket No. 77320 is denied as moot. We direct the clerk of this court to transfer the partial joinder received on December 3, 2018, in Docket No. 77320, to Docket No. 76276, and to file it. Nos. 76276/77320. (SC) | | 19-00511
|
01/07/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 76276/77320. (SC). | | 19-00923
|
01/09/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Respondent: 10 days Docketing Statement and 15 days transcript request. Appellant: 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent: 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant: 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent: 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 19-01207
|
01/17/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals (76276/77320). (SC) | | 19-02763
|
01/24/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate that No Transcript is Bring Requested. (SC) | | 19-03886
|
01/30/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (John Randall Jefferies and Christopher H. Byrd of Fennemore Craig for Respondent/Cross-Appellant). (SC) | | 19-04586
|
01/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Late Docketing Statement and Late Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 19-04591
|
03/04/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on January 30, 2019. The clerk shall reject the transcript request form received on January 30, 2019. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: 7 days. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement due: 14 days. (SC). | | 19-09605
|
03/04/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 19-09608
|
03/07/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Late Transcript Request Notice. (SC) | | 19-10358
|
03/07/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/19/18 To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 19-10383
|
03/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Amended Motion for Leave to File Late Transcript Request Notice. (SC) | | 19-10434
|
03/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall reject the certificate of no transcript request received on March 7, 2019. (SC) | | 19-11492
|
04/03/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. Appellant/Cross-Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. (SC) | | 19-14576
|
04/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Suspend Briefing Pending Outcome of Order to Show Cause in Supreme Court Case No. 76276. (SC) | | 19-15266
|
04/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Volume II and III (REJECTED PER REQUEST FROM ATTORNEY). (SC) | | |
06/26/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal and cross-appeal are suspended pending resolution of the jurisdictional issue in Docket No. 76276. Within 7 days of the filing of an order resolving the jurisdictional issue in Docket No. 76276, appellant/cross-respondent shall file a status report in this appeal. (SC) | | 19-27475
|
08/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On June 26, 2019, this court granted appellant/cross-respondent's motion to suspend briefing pending the resolution of a jurisdiction issue in the related appeal in Docket No. 76276. This court's order directed appellant/cross-respondent to file status report in this appeal within 7 days of entry of an order resolving the jurisdiction issue in 76276. To date, appellant/cross-respondent has not filed a status report in this appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant shall each have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a status report and to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of this appeal and cross-appeal. (SC). | | 19-34526
|
08/27/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent-Cross-Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-35829
|
08/27/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-35830
|
08/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Amended Docketing Statement Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-35831
|
08/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Amended Docketing Statement Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-35832
|
08/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Amended Docketing Statement Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-35837
|
08/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Amended Docketing Statement Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-35838
|
08/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Amended Docketing Statement Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-35840
|
08/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Status Report and Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 19-36250
|
08/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant APCO Construction, Inc.'s Status Report and Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 19-36497
|
09/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to File Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-36647
|
09/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-36960
|
01/14/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Counsel. Micah S. Echols, Esq. is no longer with the firm of Marquis Aurbach Coffing and no longer represents the APCO in the instant case. (SC) | | 20-01834
|
06/30/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC) | | |
07/15/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 20-26064
|
07/28/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-27531
|
08/21/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals, Granting Motion in 77320, and Reinstating Briefing in 77320. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. The motion to file an amended docketing statement in Docket No. 77320 is granted. The amended docketing statement was filed on August 27, 2019. The briefing schedule in Docket No. 77320 is reinstated. The briefing schedule in these consolidated appeals shall proceed as set forth in Docket No. 80508. Accordingly, appellant/cross-respondent shall have until September 2, 2020, to file and serve a single opening brief and an appendix. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC). | | 20-30913
|
08/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross Respondent Motion to Extend Time Unopposed to File Opening Brief. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 20-31471
|
08/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief and appendix due: October 2, 2020. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 20-31805
|
09/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request) Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 20-35472
|
10/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief and appendix due: October 16, 2020. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 20-36436
|
10/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw and to Remove from Service List. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, attorney Thomas Stewart) (SC) | | 20-37179
|
10/16/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross Respondent's Consolidated Opening Brief. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-37995
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 1-5. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-37997
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 6-10. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-37998
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 11-15. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38003
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 16-20. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38010
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 21-24. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38017
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 25-28. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38019
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 29-33. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38021
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 35-38. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38023
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 39-42. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38033
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 43-46 (Part 1). Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38034
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 47-50. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38038
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 51-53. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38041
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 54-57. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38045
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 58-61. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38047
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 62-65. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38048
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 66-69. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38049
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 70-73. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38050
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 74-77. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38052
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 78-81. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38055
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 82-85. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38056
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 86-89. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38058
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 90-93. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38060
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 94-97. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38061
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 98-101. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38063
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 102-105. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38065
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 106-109. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38068
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 110-113. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38071
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 114-117. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38073
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volumes 118-120. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38078
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Certificate of Service of Appendix (Volumes 1 - 120) Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38079
|
10/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Certificate of Service - Joint Appendix (Appendix Volumes 1 - 120). Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38106
|
10/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol 34. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-38663
|
11/11/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant APCO Construction, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 20-41230
|
12/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal is granted. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until February 4, 2021, to file and serve the combined brief. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 20-43776
|
02/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief/Opening Brief. (Second Request)Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-03298
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until February 18, 2021, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 21-04260
|
02/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief Combined Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-04815
|
03/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Consolidated Reply to Answering Brief and Answering Brief to Cross-Appeal. (First Request) Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-07650
|
03/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross Appeal. Due April 21, 2021. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-07658
|
04/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply to Answering and Answering Brief to Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-11574
|
05/18/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | |
05/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Cross Reply Brief. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-14615
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant's reply brief on cross-appeal due: June 4, 2021. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-14895
|
05/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-15202
|
05/27/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | |
10/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled before the Southern Nevada Panel on December 2, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 21-28538
|
11/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 21-33115
|
11/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-33213
|
12/02/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC). | | |
03/24/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. (THIS OPINION WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 8/8/22). "Affirmed." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 13. Nos. 77320/80508. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC). | | 22-09205
|
04/11/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Joel D. Henriod, Daniel F. Polsenberg, and Abraham G. Smith. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-11456
|
04/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-11457
|
05/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Polsenberg, Mr. Henriod, and Mr. Smith as counsel of record for appellant/cross-respondent on this court's docket. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed a motion requesting an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. The motion is granted. Appellant/cross-respondent's petition for rehearing due: May 11, 2022. No further extensions of time to file a petition for rehearing will be granted. If no petition for rehearing is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-14442
|
05/11/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-15026
|
05/11/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Joel D. Henriod. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | |
05/24/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nops. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 22-16438
|
06/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 22-18108
|
06/23/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent/cross-appellant's answer to the petition due: 14 days. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 22-19880
|
07/07/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/Cross-Apellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: July 21, 2022. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 22-21359
|
07/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answer to En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-22876
|
08/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Permission to File a Reply in Support of Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-24195
|
08/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 22-24615
|
08/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration and Withdrawing Opinion. fn1[In light of this order, the motion to file a reply is denied.] EN BANC Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 22-24709
|
12/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 22-38594
|
04/17/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9 [The Honorable Justices Patricia Lee and Linda Marie Bell did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 23-11619
|
05/12/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | 23-15027
|
05/12/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 77320/80508 (SC) | | |
05/23/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on May 17, 2023. Nos. 77320/80508. (SC) | | 23-15027
|