Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
01/05/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-00723
|
01/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-00726
|
01/08/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of George O. West III. Check no. 10593. | | |
01/08/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-01005
|
01/09/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. | | 18-01200
|
01/10/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-01327
|
01/10/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 18-01335
|
01/11/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | | 18-01531
|
02/12/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 18-05765
|
02/13/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 18-05925
|
02/14/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request | | 18-06124
|
04/24/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 18-15566
|
04/24/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: June 13, 2018. | | 18-15569
|
06/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Amended Motion to Take Judicial Notice. | | 18-22231
|
06/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice. | | 18-22311
|
06/13/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-22402
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. | | 18-23055
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. | | 18-23056
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3 Part 1. | | 18-23057
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3 Part 2. | | 18-23058
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. | | 18-23059
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. | | 18-23060
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. | | 18-23061
|
06/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. | | 18-23062
|
07/06/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motion and amended motion to take judicial notice of the legislative history of NRS 41.600 and the Nevada Deceptive Trade Practices Act are granted. This court will take judicial notice of the documents attached to the June 12, 2018, motion when resolving this appeal. | | 18-25653
|
07/11/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Filing Respondents' Brief (Answering Brief). | | 18-26280
|
07/11/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 13, 2018. | | 18-26282
|
08/14/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 18-31279
|
08/14/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | | 18-31281
|
08/15/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Answering Brief and Appendix). | | 18-31460
|
08/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 18-32858
|
08/23/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: October 15, 2018. | | 18-32867
|
10/15/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-40415
|
10/15/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/29/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 18-906218
|
11/29/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
11/29/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
09/05/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Gibbons, C.J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. (COA) | | 19-37098
|
09/05/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Gibbons, C.J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. (SC) | | |
09/19/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
09/19/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/19/2019 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
09/19/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Petition for Review due: October 7, 2019. (SC) | | 19-39219
|
10/04/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address (Jeffery A. Bendavid and Stephanie J. Smith are now practicing with the firm Bendavid Law). (SC) | | 19-41259
|
10/07/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Review. (SC) | | 19-41514
|
11/07/2019 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review "Review denied." fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC) | | 19-45864
|
12/02/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-48635
|
12/02/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/13/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 6, 2019. (SC) | | 19-48635
|