Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/11/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/11/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
08/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-23366
|
08/16/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kainen Law Group. Check no. 7097. (SC) | | |
08/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 21-23897
|
08/18/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC). | | 21-24110
|
09/01/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 25, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-25516
|
09/03/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-25792
|
10/25/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-30755
|
10/26/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent(s): 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. (SC) | | 21-30819
|
11/09/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/16/18, 8/27/19, 5/13/20, 2/25/21, 4/30/21, and 6/14/21. Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting and Transcription. (SC) | | 21-32266
|
12/01/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: December 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34260
|
12/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-34775
|
12/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: January 10, 2022. (SC) | | 21-35035
|
12/29/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/16/18, 8/27/19, 5/13/20, 2/25/21, 4/30/21, and 6/14/21. (SC) | | 21-36975
|
01/10/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 22-01000
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01001
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01002
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01003
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01004
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01005
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 6. (SC) | | 22-01006
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1 Part 7. (SC) | | 22-01007
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01008
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01009
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01010
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01011
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01012
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 6. (SC) | | 22-01013
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 7. (SC) | | 22-01014
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 8. (SC) | | 22-01015
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2 Part 9. (SC) | | 22-01016
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01017
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01018
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01019
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01020
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01021
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 6. (SC) | | 22-01022
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 7. (SC) | | 22-01023
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 8. (SC) | | 22-01024
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 9. (SC) | | 22-01025
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 10. (SC) | | 22-01026
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 11. (SC) | | 22-01028
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 12. (SC) | | 22-01029
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3 Part 13. (SC) | | 22-01030
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01031
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01032
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01033
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01034
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01035
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 6. (SC) | | 22-01036
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 7. (SC) | | 22-01037
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 8. (SC) | | 22-01038
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 9. (SC) | | 22-01039
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 4 Part 10. (SC) | | 22-01040
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01041
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01042
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01043
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01044
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01045
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 6. (SC) | | 22-01046
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 7. (SC) | | 22-01048
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 8. (SC) | | 22-01049
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5 Part 9. (SC) | | 22-01050
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01051
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01052
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01053
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01054
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01055
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 6. (SC) | | 22-01056
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 7. (SC) | | 22-01057
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 6 Part 8. (SC) | | 22-01058
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 7 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-01060
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 7 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-01061
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 7 Part 3. (SC) | | 22-01062
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 7 Part 4. (SC) | | 22-01063
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 7 Part 5. (SC) | | 22-01064
|
01/19/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Errata to Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 22-01943
|
01/27/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: February 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-02748
|
02/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-04197
|
02/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until February 11, 2022, to file and serve the fast track response. (SC) | | 22-04366
|
02/11/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-04792
|
02/11/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Amended Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-04793
|
03/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
05/12/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn3 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/DH/MG. (SC) | | 22-15100
|
06/06/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-17839
|
06/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17839
|