Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/21/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
12/21/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 22-40007
|
12/21/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 22-40037
|
12/27/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Rodriguez Law Offices. Check no. 12055. (SC) | | |
01/06/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 23-00475
|
01/11/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 23-01024
|
03/31/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. It is uncertain whether the case is appropriate for mediation under the Court's Settlement Program. A resumed telephonic pre-mediation conference in this matter has been scheduled for May 2, 2022, at 10:00 AM. (SC) | | 23-09937
|
05/02/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 30, 2023, at 10:00 AM. It is still uncertain whether the case is appropriate for medication under the Court's Settlement Program. (SC) | | 23-13729
|
05/30/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 14, 2023. (SC) | | 23-16809
|
06/14/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 24, 2023, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 23-18859
|
06/15/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to October 3, 2023. (SC) | | 23-18973
|
07/24/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 23-23538
|
07/26/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-23894
|
08/09/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/15/2022. To Court Reporter: Gina Villani. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 23-25761
|
09/18/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance(Attorneys Lauren D. Wigginton, Daniel F. Polsenberg, Abraham G. Smith. for Appellant)(SC). | | 23-30500
|
09/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-30510
|
09/22/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant shall have until November 27, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-31186
|
11/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix(SC) | | 23-38344
|
11/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.(SC) | | 23-38537
|
12/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.(SC) | | 23-39466
|
12/11/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. Respondents have filed an opposition, and appellant has filed a reply. Cause appearing, appellant's motion is granted. Appellant shall have until December 27, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-39966
|
12/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix(SC) | | 23-42016
|
01/02/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response in Opposition to Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.(SC) | | 24-00070
|
01/09/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix(SC) | | 24-00994
|
01/09/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Declaration of Abraham G. Smith.(SC) | | 24-00995
|
01/22/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting a third extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. Respondents have filed an opposition and appellant has filed a reply and provided a declaration from appellant's counsel. The motion is granted. Appellant shall have until January 26, 2024, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 24-02398
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 1 (SC) | | 24-03251
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 2 (SC) | | 24-03255
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 3 (SC) | | 24-03256
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 5 (SC) | | 24-03258
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 6 (SC) | | 24-03259
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 7 (SC) | | 24-03260
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 8 (SC) | | 24-03262
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 9 (SC) | | 24-03263
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 10 (SC) | | 24-03264
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 11 (SC) | | 24-03265
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 4 (SC) | | 24-03270
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 12 (SC) | | 24-03274
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 13 (SC) | | 24-03275
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 14 (SC) | | 24-03276
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 15 (SC) | | 24-03277
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 16 (SC) | | 24-03278
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 17 (SC) | | 24-03279
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 18 (SC) | | 24-03280
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 19 (SC) | | 24-03281
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 20(SC) | | 24-03282
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 21 (SC) | | 24-03283
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 22 (SC) | | 24-03284
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 23 (SC) | | 24-03285
|
01/26/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (SC) | | 24-03294
|
02/21/2024 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix. (Due date: (March 27, 2024)(SC) | | 24-06122
|
02/21/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved.(March 27, 2024, to file their answering brief and appendix)(SC) | | 24-06138
|
03/18/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (SC) | | 24-09527
|
03/18/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 1 (SC) | | 24-09528
|
04/16/2024 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief(SC) | | 24-13311
|
04/17/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. "Reply Brief" Due date: 05-17-2024(SC) | | 24-13332
|