Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/27/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
09/27/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-37830
|
09/27/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-37834
|
09/27/2018 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael K. Wall | | |
09/27/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-37969
|
09/28/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | | 18-38194
|
10/10/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. Due to scheduling problems, Settlement Judge requests case be reassigned to another Settlement Judge. | | 18-39801
|
10/16/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-40695
|
10/17/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. | | 18-40906
|
12/14/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 17, 2019. (SC). | | 18-908829
|
12/17/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27 (e) for Stay. (SC) | | 18-908982
|
12/21/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response in Opposition to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) For A Stay. (SC) | | 18-909911
|
12/21/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. Currently before the court is appellants' emergency motion to stay execution on the judgment, pending appeal. We deny the motion without prejudice. (SC). | | 18-910043
|
01/23/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 19-03565
|
02/04/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 2/11/19. (SC) | | 19-05378
|
02/15/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 4, 2019. (SC). | | 19-07407
|
03/12/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 19-10910
|
03/13/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-11120
|
03/13/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Second Amended NOA) (SC) | | 19-11213
|
03/19/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 19-12176
|
04/24/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings Pusuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect. 362. (SC) | | 19-18076
|
05/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents have filed a suggestion of bankruptcy. This appeal is stayed as to A Cab pursuant to the automatic stay provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Given the applicability of the automatic stay, A Cab's appeal may linger indefinitely on this court's docket pending final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. Accordingly, we conclude that judicial efficiency will be best served if the appeal is dismissed as to A Cab without prejudice. Accordingly, we dismiss this appeal as to A Cab only. The dismissal is without prejudice to A Cab's right to move for reinstatement of its appeal within 60 days of either the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, if A Cab deems such a motion appropriate at that time. (SC). | | 19-20027
|
05/09/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant Nady's Response due: 30 days. Respondents shall have 14 days from service of Nady's response to file and serve any reply. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 19-20378
|
06/07/2019 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appellant Creighton J. Nady 's Appeals Should Not be Dismissed. (SC) | | 19-24821
|
06/21/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant Creighton J. Nady's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appellant Creighton J. Nady's Appeal Should Not be Dismissed. (SC) | | 19-26934
|
06/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Errata to Reply to Appellant Creighton J. Nady's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appellant Creighton J. Nady's Appeal Should Not be Dismissed. (SC) | | 19-27111
|
07/12/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "This court concludes that it lacks jurisdiction, and ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC) | | 19-29735
|
08/06/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-32943
|
08/06/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
08/26/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 9, 2019. (REMITTITUR RECALLED/CASE REINSTATED PER ORDER 12/09/2019). (SC) | | 19-32943
|
11/13/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Reinstate Appeal. (SC) | | 19-46576
|
11/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Reinstate Appeal. (COA) | | 19-47356
|
12/09/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur, Reinstating Appeal, and to Show Cause. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur and reinstate A Cab's appeal. The clerk shall modify the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellant's response. The briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 19-49841
|
01/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Portions of Appellant's Appeal Should Not Be Dismissed. (SC) | | 20-01011
|
01/16/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Non-Reply by Respondents to Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause of December 9, 2019. (SC) | | 20-02363
|
03/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal, Amending Caption, and Reinstating Briefing. As A Cab concedes that the March 5, 2019, order is not substantively appealable, and that A Cab is not aggrieved by that order, the appeal from the March 5, 2019, order is dismissed. A Cab's unopposed request that this court add A Cab Series, LLC, as an appellant in this matter is granted. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. The briefing schedule in this appeal is reinstated as follows. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-08999
|
04/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-14151
|
04/15/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix Due June 4, 2020. (SC) | | 20-14198
|
05/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-19889
|
05/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Appellants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-20179
|
06/02/2020 | Other | Chief Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC) | | |
06/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants shall have until July 6, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have 60 days after the filing of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-21341
|
06/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-24214
|
07/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 5, 2020. (SC) | | 20-27247
|
08/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants Motion for Leave to File an Opening Brief That Exceeds the Word Limit NRAP (a)(7)(D)(SC) | | 20-28832
|
08/05/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-28835
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 1 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28836
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 2 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28838
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 3 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28839
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 4 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28840
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 5 of 52.(SC) | | 20-28842
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 6 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28844
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 7 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28849
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 8 of 52. Part 1 (SC) | | 20-28850
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 8 of 52 Part 2 (SC) | | 20-28851
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 9 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28853
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 10 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28854
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 11 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28855
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 12 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28858
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 13 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28861
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 14 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28862
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 15 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28863
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 16 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28864
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 17 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28865
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 18 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28866
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 19 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28869
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 20 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28871
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 21 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28875
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 22 to 52. (SC) | | 20-28877
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 23 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28876
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 24 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28878
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 25 to 52. (SC) | | 20-28879
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 26 to 52 (SC) | | 20-28880
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 27 to 52. (SC) | | 20-28881
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 28 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28882
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 29 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28884
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 30 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28892
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 31 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28883
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 32 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28885
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 33 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28886
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 34 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28887
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 35 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28888
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 36 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28889
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 37 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28891
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 38 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28894
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 39 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28895
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 40 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28896
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 41 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28897
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 42 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28898
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 43 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28899
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 44 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28900
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 45 of 52. SC) | | 20-28901
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 46 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28902
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 47 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28903
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 48 of 52 (SC) | | 20-28908
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 49 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28904
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 50 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28905
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 51 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28906
|
08/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief - Vol 52 of 52. (SC) | | 20-28907
|
08/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Appellant's Motion to File an Opening Brief that Exceeds the Word Limit NRAP 32(a)(7)(D). (SC) | | 20-29151
|
08/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation and respondent has filed a response. The motion is granted. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-31170
|
09/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-34423
|
09/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: October 23, 2020. (SC) | | 20-34445
|
10/23/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-38953
|
10/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume I. (SC) | | 20-38969
|
10/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume II. (SC) | | 20-38970
|
10/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume III. (SC) | | 20-38971
|
10/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume IV. (SC) | | 20-38972
|
10/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume V. (SC) | | 20-38973
|
10/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume VI. (SC) | | 20-38975
|
11/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-42170
|
11/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 23, 2020. (SC) | | 20-42174
|
12/22/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-46251
|
12/23/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 1, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-09640
|
05/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-14259
|
06/01/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Panel. (SC). | | |
12/30/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Herndon. fn1 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 84. En Banc. (SC). | | 21-37158
|
01/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Interest. (SC) | | 22-00589
|
01/13/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fee's. (SC) | | 22-01415
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Interest. (SC) | | 22-01705
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondents filed a motion requesting that this court award attorney fees or direct the district court to award attorney fees pursuant to Article 15, Section 16 of Nevada's Constitution, and to include in its mandate upon remand instructions about the allowance of interest, pursuant to NRAP 37(b). Appellants have filed an opposition to the order and respondents have filed a reply. Respondent's request for a modification of the mandate to include instructions based on NRAP 37(b) is denied. The clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-03633
|
02/03/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-03639
|
02/03/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03639
|