+
Party Information
|
Role | Party Name | Represented By |
Appellant | Jacksonville Police and Fire Pension Fund | Brian W. Boschee
(Holley Driggs/Las Vegas)
Adam D. Hollander
(Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman, LLP)
Mark Lebovitch
(Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman, LLP)
Debbie A. Leonard
(McDonald Carano LLP/Reno)
William N. Miller
(Holley Driggs/Las Vegas)
Jeffrey A. Silvestri
(McDonald Carano LLP/Las Vegas)
Jeroen Van Kwawegen
(Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman, LLP)
Amanda C. Yen
(McDonald Carano LLP/Las Vegas)
Alla Zayenchik
(Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman, LLP)
|
Reference Party | Dish Network Derivative Litigation | |
Respondent | Cantey M. Ergen | James C. Dugan
(Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP)
Tariq Mundiya
(Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP)
Joshua H. Reisman
(Reisman Sorokac)
Robert R. Warns, III
(Reisman Sorokac)
Mary K. Warren
(Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP)
|
Respondent | Carl E. Vogel | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Kirk B. Lenhard
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Jeffrey S. Rugg
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Charles M. Lillis | Robert S. Brady
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Emily V. Burton
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Robert J. Cassity
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
C. Barr Flinn
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
David J. Freeman
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
David C. McBride
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
J. Stephen Peek
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
Holly Stein Sollod
(Holland & Hart, LLP/Denver)
|
Respondent | Charles W. Ergen | James C. Dugan
(Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP)
Tariq Mundiya
(Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP)
Joshua H. Reisman
(Reisman Sorokac)
Robert R. Warns, III
(Reisman Sorokac)
Mary K. Warren
(Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP)
|
Respondent | David K. Moskowitz | Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Kirk B. Lenhard
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Jeffrey S. Rugg
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | George R. Brokaw | Robert S. Brady
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Emily V. Burton
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Robert J. Cassity
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
C. Barr Flinn
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
David J. Freeman
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
David C. McBride
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
J. Stephen Peek
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
Holly Stein Sollod
(Holland & Hart, LLP/Denver)
|
Respondent | James DeFranco | Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Kirk B. Lenhard
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Jeffrey S. Rugg
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Kyle J. Kiser | Bruce R. Braun
(Sidley Austin LLP/Chicago)
Zachary Madonia
(Sidley Austin LLP/Chicago)
James J. Pisanelli
(Pisanelli Bice, PLLC)
Debra L. Spinelli
(Pisanelli Bice, PLLC)
|
Respondent | R. Stanton Dodge | Bruce R. Braun
(Sidley Austin LLP/Chicago)
Zachary Madonia
(Sidley Austin LLP/Chicago)
James J. Pisanelli
(Pisanelli Bice, PLLC)
Debra L. Spinelli
(Pisanelli Bice, PLLC)
|
Respondent | Thomas A. Cullen | Bruce R. Braun
(Sidley Austin LLP/Chicago)
Zachary Madonia
(Sidley Austin LLP/Chicago)
James J. Pisanelli
(Pisanelli Bice, PLLC)
Debra L. Spinelli
(Pisanelli Bice, PLLC)
|
Respondent | Tom A. Ortolf | Robert S. Brady
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Emily V. Burton
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Robert J. Cassity
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
C. Barr Flinn
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
David J. Freeman
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
David C. McBride
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
J. Stephen Peek
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
Holly Stein Sollod
(Holland & Hart, LLP/Denver)
|
Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/19/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
10/19/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 15-31734
|
10/19/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 15-31736
|
10/19/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson. Check No. 25177. | | |
10/20/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Notice of Referral to Settlement Program and Suspension of Rules. | | 15-31965
|
10/20/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 15-31969
|
10/21/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. | | 15-32084
|
11/10/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 15-34213
|
11/10/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 15-34222
|
11/10/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 15-34272
|
12/07/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. | | 15-37259
|
12/09/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 15-37579
|
12/17/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 15-38612
|
02/18/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Motion to Set Length of Consolidated Brief. | | 16-05193
|
02/18/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's NRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statement. | | 16-05208
|
02/18/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Motion to Set Length of Consolidated Brief and Appellant's NRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statement. | | 16-05315
|
03/03/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 22, 2016. | | 16-06958
|
03/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of No Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Motion to Set Length of Consolidated Brief. | | 16-07131
|
03/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Notice of No Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Motion to Set Length of Consolidate Brief. | | 16-07258
|
03/10/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion to consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Opening Brief and Appendix (45 pages or 21,000 words) due: June 9, 2016. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-07671
|
05/26/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16673
|
05/26/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of 1) Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix 2) Appendices Volumes 1 through 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16674
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16701
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16702
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16704
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16705
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16706
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16707
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16708
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16709
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16710
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16711
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16712
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16713
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16714
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16716
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16717
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16718
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 17 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16719
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 18 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16720
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 19 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16722
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 20 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16723
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 21 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16725
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 22 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16726
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 23 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16727
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 24 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16728
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 25 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16729
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 26 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16730
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 27 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16731
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 28 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16732
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 29 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16733
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 30 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16734
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 31 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16735
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 32 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16736
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 33 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16737
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 34 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16738
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 35 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16739
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 36 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16740
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 37 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16741
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 38 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16742
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 39 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16743
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 40 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16744
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 41 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16745
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 42 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16746
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 43 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16747
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 44 of 44. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-16748
|
05/27/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Appellant's Opening Brief [Redacted]. | | 16-16749
|
06/08/2016 | Motion | Filed The SLC's Limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix and Countermotion for Leave to Make Additional Redactions. Nos. 69012/69729. (DETACHED EXHIBIT C AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/20/16). | | 16-17764
|
06/08/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service. (The SLC's Limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix and Countermotion for Leave to Make Additional Redactions.) Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-17766
|
06/13/2016 | Motion | Filed SLC's Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page and Type-Volume Limitations in the Answering Brief. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-18289
|
06/13/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for (1) The SLC to file the Answering Brief and (2) Jacksonville to file the Reply Brief. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-18290
|
06/13/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Motion for Leave to Exceed Page and Type-Volume Limitations in Answering Brief. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-18443
|
07/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Respondent Special Litigation Committee of Dish Network Corporation's Answering Brief and to Seal Portions of the Answering Appendix. | | 16-23578
|
08/17/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. SLC also agrees to appellant's motion that referenced documents at pages JA007346-47, JA007356-57 and JA007468 of Volume 30, pages JA007502 and JA7535-43 of Volume 31, pages JA007769-72 of Volume 32 and page JA008245 of Volume 34 of the sealed portions of the Joint Appendix may be unsealed and disclosed publicly. The clerk of this court shall unseal the identified portions of the joint appendix, filed as "Appendix to Opening Brief." The clerk of this court shall file the redacted opening brief provisionally received on May 31, 2016, and shall file under seal the unredacted opening brief and sealed portions of the appendix to the opening brief, provisionally received in this court on May 27, 2016. The clerk of this court shall file SLC's redacted answering brief and appendix Volume I, provisionally received on July 28, 2016, and the sealed copies of the answering brief and Volume II of the appendix received on August 2, 2016. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, appellant Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund's reply brief shall be due September 26, 2016. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file SCL's "limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix and Countermotion for Leave to Make Additional Redactions" with "Sealed Exhibit C," provisionally received on June 10, 2016.] Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-25582
|
08/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (Redacted). Nos. 69012/69729. (BRIEF STRICKEN PER ORDER 10/20/16). | | |
08/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (SEALED). | | |
08/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Special Litigation Committee of DISH Network Corporation's Answering Brief (Redacted) Nos. 69012/69729 | | 16-25601
|
08/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Special Litigation Committee of DISH Network Corporation's Answering Brief (Volume I). Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-25602
|
08/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Special Litigation Committee of DISH Network Corporation's Answering Brief (SEALED). Nos. 69012/69729. | | |
08/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Special Litigation Committee of DISH Network Corporation's Answering Brief (Volume Il) (SEALED). Nos. 69012/69729 | | |
08/17/2016 | Motion | Filed The SLC's Limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix and Countermotion for Leave to Make Additional Redactions with SEALED Exhibit C. Nos. 69012/69729. | | |
08/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed SEALED Portions of Joint Appendix (CD-ROM included), vols. 7-13, 18-20, 23-39, and 41. (JA007346-47, JA007356-57 and JA007468 of Volume 30, pages JA007502 and JA7535-43 of Volume 31, pages JA007769-72 of Volume 32 and page JA008245 of Volume 34 unsealed and filed separately.) Nos. 69012/69729. | | |
08/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Portions - JA007346-47, JA007356-57 and JA007468 of Volume 30, pages JA007502 and JA7535-43 of Volume 31, pages JA007769-72 of Volume 32 and page JA008245 of Volume 33. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-25617
|
08/18/2016 | Motion | Filed SLC's Motion Seeking Clarification of Order Dated August 17, 2016. Nos. 69012/69729. (DETACHED APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF (REDACTED) ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/20/16.) | | 16-25668
|
08/30/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to the Motion Seeking Clarification of Order Dated August 17, 2016. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-26951
|
09/27/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 69012/69729. (BRIEF SEALED PER ORDER 10/20/16). | | |
09/27/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 69012/69729. | | |
10/03/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 69012/69729. (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/20/16). | | 16-30714
|
10/20/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The SLC asks this court to withdraw the redacted opening brief that was filed pursuant to this court's order on August 17, 2016, and to file in its stead the "fully redacted version" of the opening brief that was attached as Exhibit C to the SLC's "Limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Seal Portions of the Appendix and Countermotion for Leave to Make Additional Redactions with SEALED Exhibit C," filed June 8, 2016. We grant the SLC's unopposed motion. The clerk of this court shall strike the redacted opening brief filed August 17, 2016, and shall detach Exhibit A, the "fully redacted" brief, from SLC's motion for clarification and file it separately. The SLC has also filed an unopposed motion to file a redacted reply brief in place of the reply brief filed by appellant on September 27, 2016. We grant the motion. The clerk of this court shall seal the reply brief filed September 27, 2016. The clerk shall detach Exhibit A, the redacted reply brief, from the SLC's motion and file it separately. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 16-32818
|
10/20/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (Redacted). (DETACHED FROM SLC'S MOTION FILED 8/18/16 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/20/16.) | | 16-32902
|
10/20/2016 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. (DETACHED FROM SLC'S MOTION FILED 10/3/16 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/20/16.) | | 16-32912
|
02/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-05866
|
03/01/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Response To Appellant's Notice Of Supplemental Authority. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-07083
|
03/02/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amended Certificate of Service (Respondent's Response To Appellant's Notice Of Supplemental Authority). | | 17-07101
|
04/25/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-13619
|
04/26/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument.Argument is scheduled for Monday, June 5, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-13840
|
05/22/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-16978
|
06/05/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/14/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and vacated in part." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Pickering, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 61. EN BANC Nos. 69012/69729 | | 17-31069
|
10/02/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-33294
|
10/02/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Jeffrey A. Silvestri | | |
10/09/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer to Petition due: 15 days. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-34223
|
10/24/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents George R. Brokaw, Charles M. Lillis and Tom A. Ortolf's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-36585
|
12/08/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 69012/69729. | | 17-42325
|
01/02/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 69012/69729 | | 18-00041
|
01/02/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 69012/69729 | | |
01/19/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 8, 2018. | | 18-00041
|