Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/17/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Michael A. Royal. (SC) | | |
03/17/2020 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioners' Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition Under NRAP Rules 21(a)(6) and 27(e). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10434
|
03/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8 Staying Execution of Order Directing Petitioners to Disclose Private, Protected Information of Guests Not Involved in Underlying Lawsuit. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10435
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10440
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10441
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10443
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10444
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10445
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10447
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10448
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10449
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10450
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10451
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10453
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10454
|
03/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-10455
|
03/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Sean Claggett, William Sykes, Micah Echols, and Geordan Logan as Counsel for Real Party in Interest. (SC) | | 20-11332
|
03/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-11334
|
03/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Reply to Joyce Sekera's Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Under NRAP 27(e). (SC). (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). | | 20-11481
|
03/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals, (SC). | | 20-11589
|
03/26/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/26/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
03/26/2020 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioners' Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition Under NRAP Rules 21(a)(6) and 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11598
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11600
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11601
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11602
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11603
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11605
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11607
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11608
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11609
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11611
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11613
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11615
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11617
|
03/26/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11618
|
03/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8 Staying Execution of Order Directing Petitioners to Disclose Private, Protected Information of Guests Not Involved in Underlying Lawsuit. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11619
|
03/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11621
|
03/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Reply to Joyce Sekera's Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Under NRAP 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA). | | 20-11622
|
03/27/2020 | Other | Judge Bonnie A. Bulla disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
03/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay. Having reviewed the petition and supporting documents, we conclude that an answer may assist this court in resolving the petition. Therefore, real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 14 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. NRAP 21(b)(1). Petitioners shall have 7 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. Having considered the parties' arguments for and against the stay under these factors, we conclude that a stay is warranted pending our consideration of this writ petition. Accordingly, we grant petitioners' motion and stay the March 13 district court order, pending further order of this court. (COA). | | 20-11769
|
04/08/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real Party in Interest's Answer to the Petition for Writ due: April 24, 2020. (SC). | | 20-13406
|
04/24/2020 | Petition/Writ | Filed Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC) | | 20-15777
|
04/24/2020 | Petition/Writ | Filed DUPLICATE Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC) | | 20-15778
|
04/29/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Writ Petition due: May 15, 2020. (SC) | | 20-16147
|
05/15/2020 | Brief | Filed Petitioners' Reply Brief. (COA) | | 20-18567
|
05/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief Vol 14. (COA) | | 20-18568
|
05/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief Vol 15. (COA) | | 20-18569
|
05/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's Motion to Hold Decision in Abeyance. (COA) | | 20-19522
|
06/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest's unopposed motion to hold a decision in this matter in abeyance pending final resolution of a related matter pending before this court, Docket No. 79689-COA, is granted to the following extent. No disposition in this matter will be made until the petition for rehearing in the related matter is decided by this court. (COA) | | 20-21474
|
06/19/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate the order compelling discovery and conduct proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT | | 20-22941
|
06/19/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate the order compelling discovery and conduct proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT | | |
06/19/2020 | Writ | Filed Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the Order mailed to Attorney Michael Royal for service upon Judge Kathleen E. Delaney. (COA). | | 20-22947
|
06/24/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Party in Interest's Petition for Review due: July 21, 2020. (SC) | | 20-23393
|
07/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-26683
|
07/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest shall have until August 4, 2020, to file and serve any petition for review. If no petition for review is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 20-27546
|
08/04/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Real Party in Interest's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 20-28579
|
08/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (SC) | | |
08/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Case Closed | | |
09/11/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Petitioner's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 20-33449
|
09/21/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioners' answer to the petition for review due: October 9, 2020. (SC) | | 20-34562
|
10/09/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petitioners' Answer to Real Party in Interest's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 20-37151
|
10/23/2020 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied" fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC (SC) | | 20-38849
|
10/23/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-38901
|
10/23/2020 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |