Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/23/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/23/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-05295
|
02/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-05297
|
02/23/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Prescott T. Jones. (SC) | | |
02/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-05341
|
02/24/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (SC) | | 21-05442
|
03/16/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-07640
|
04/07/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC). | | 21-10075
|
04/08/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-10105
|
04/22/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/29/16, 7/11/17, 8/20/19, 3/3/20, 9/15/20, 1/6/21, and 2/9/21. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 4/22/21) (SC) | | |
04/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-11646
|
04/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/29/16, 7/11/17, 8/20/19, 3/3/20, 9/15/20, 1/6/21, and 2/9/21. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (SC) | | 21-11719
|
05/27/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/11/17, 8/20/19, 1/6/21, and 2/9/21. (SC) | | 21-15247
|
06/01/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette G. Sison stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/29/16. (SC) | | 21-15546
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 21, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19273
|
07/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-21218
|
07/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/27/21)(SC) | | |
07/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 3 Part 2- Volume 5 part 3. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/27/21) (SC) | | |
07/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6-9. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/27/21)(SC) | | |
07/27/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. (SC) | | 21-21651
|
07/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-21753
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-21763
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-21765
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-21766
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-21767
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-21768
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-21769
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-21770
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-21771
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-21772
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-21773
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-21774
|
07/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-21775
|
07/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on July 27, 2021. Respondents' answering brief due: August 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-21931
|
08/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Ingrid Patin's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC) | | 21-24671
|
08/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent Ingrid Patin's Answering Brief due: September 27, 2021. | | 21-24676
|
09/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Micah S. Echols, and David P. Snyder of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm hereby enter their appearance as counsel for Respondents). (SC) | | 21-27674
|
09/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-27677
|
10/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Briefs due: October 27, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28353
|
10/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-30981
|
11/22/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: December 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-33537
|
12/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-35421
|
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 6, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-13828
|
05/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-16459
|
06/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court En Banc. (SC). | | |
09/12/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." PICKERING, J., dissenting. EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-28431
|
09/26/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Reissue September 12, 2022, Order of Affirmance as an Opinion. (SC) | | 22-30221
|
11/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Publication. Respondents have filed a motion for this court to publish that order as an opinion. Having considered the motion, we conclude that publication is not warranted. We deny the motion. fn1 [The Honorable Justice Silver having retired did not participate in the decision of this motion.] (SC) | | 22-35857
|
11/18/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-36314
|
11/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 21, 2022. (SC) | | 22-36314
|