Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/08/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
11/08/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-35102
|
11/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-35105
|
11/14/2022 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael B. Lee. (SC) | | |
11/14/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-35670
|
11/14/2022 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 1727 returned to Michael B. Lee P.C. (SC) | | |
11/16/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James A. Kohl. (SC) | | 22-36015
|
11/28/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/14/22. To Court Reporter: Kimberly Estala. (SC). (REJECTED PER 12/01/22 NOTICE). | | |
12/01/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC). | | 22-37813
|
12/02/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/14/22. To Court Reporter: Kimberly Estala. (SC) | | 22-37955
|
12/06/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-38247
|
12/06/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-38330
|
12/28/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted because Respondent is looking for a new attorney to represent him in this matter. It will be available for the premediation conference once it has found representation. (SC) | | 22-40679
|
01/06/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Day as counsel for respondent. Respondent's notice of appearance due: 30 days. (SC) | | 23-00468
|
01/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jessica E. Whelan and Erica C. Medley. (SC) | | 23-02726
|
01/31/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Adding Counsel and Resuming Settlement Proceedings. The clerk of this court shall add attorneys Jessica E. Whelan and Erica C. Medley, of the law firm Holland & Hart LLP, to the docket as counsel for respondent. As all parties are represented by counsel, settlement proceedings shall resume in this matter. The settlement judge shall file an early case assessment report within 30 days and a final settlement status report within 180 days. (SC) | | 23-03010
|
02/24/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion To Withdraw Jessica E. Whelan and Erica C. Medley as Counsel. (SC) | | 23-05768
|
03/02/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorneys Jessica E. Whelan and Erica C. Medley of Holland and Hart LLP as counsel of record for WLAB Investment, LLC in this appeal. WLAB Investment, LLC shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter a notice of appearance in this court or inform this court that they are not retaining new counsel. Settlement proceedings in this matter shall be stayed pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 23-06280
|
03/07/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Lesley B. Miller and Elva A. Castaneda. (SC) | | 23-06923
|
03/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Adding Counsel and Resuming Settlement. The clerk of this court shall add attorneys Lesley B. Miller and Elva A. Castaneda, of the law firm Kaempfer Crowell, to the docket as counsel for respondent. As all parties are represented by counsel, settlement proceedings shall resume in this matter. The settlement judge shall file an early case assessment report within 30 days and a final status report within 180 days. (SC) | | 23-07305
|
03/14/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 25, 2023, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 23-07836
|
05/10/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 23-14714
|
05/10/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Court reporter's certificate of service due: 30 days. Opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 23-14748
|
07/11/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-22110
|
07/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-22111
|
07/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-22112
|
07/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/11/2023). (SC) | | |
07/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-22117
|
07/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/11/2023). (SC) | | |
07/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/11/2023). (SC) | | |
07/11/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-22126
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-22245
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-22246
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-22247
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-22248
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-22250
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-22251
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 23-22252
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 23-22253
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8. (SC) | | 23-22254
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 9. (SC) | | 23-22255
|
07/12/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-22261
|
07/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service - Appendix to the Opening Brief - Vols. 1-9. (SC) | | 23-22291
|
08/03/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-25001
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-25007
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-25008
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-25010
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-25013
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-25014
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 23-25015
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 23-25016
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 8. (SC) | | 23-25017
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 9. (SC) | | 23-25018
|
08/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 10. (SC) | | 23-25019
|
08/28/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-28084
|
08/29/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
09/20/2023 | Other | Justice Linda Bell disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | | |
10/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Lesley B. Miller and Elva Castaneda Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent WLAB Investment, LLC. (SC) | | 23-33486
|
11/08/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Attorneys Lesley B. Miller and Elva A. Castaneda have filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent. The motion to withdraw does not appear to have been served on respondent as required by NRAP 46(e)(3). Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 23-36440
|
11/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent WLAB Investment, LLC.(SC) | | 23-36532
|
11/09/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service for Motion to Withdraw.(SC) | | 23-36550
|
11/17/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn3[In light of our disposition of this matter, we need not reach the parties' additional arguments] LS/EC/PL (SC) | | 23-37398
|
12/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Attorneys Lesley B. Miller and Elva A. Castaneda of the law firm of Kaempfer Crowell have filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. NRAP 46(e)(3); RPC 1.16(b). The clerk shall remove Ms. Miller, Ms. Casteneda, and Kaempfer Crowell, as counsel of record for respondent. This court issued an order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding on November 17, 2023. The remittitur is set to issue on December 12, 2023. WLAB Investment, LLC (WLAB) shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause counsel to enter an appearance. WLAB is cautioned that it may not appear or file documents without counsel. Issuance of the remittitur is stayed pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 23-38992
|
01/31/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On December 1, 2023, this court issued an order granting a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent and directing respondent to retain new counsel and cause counsel to enter an appearance by January 2, 2024. In that order, this court stated that issuance of the remittitur is stayed pending further order of this court. To date, no notice of appearance on behalf of respondent has been filed, and respondent has not otherwise communicated with this court. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC) | | 24-03732
|
01/31/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 24-03737
|
01/31/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC) | | |
02/09/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 02/01/24. (SC) | | 24-03737
|