Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
01/05/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) HOWARD - C53867 | | 11-00487
|
01/20/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification in Compliance With NRAP 9(a)(C). | | 11-01995
|
01/25/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 11-02443
|
05/05/2011 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief to May 26, 2011. | | 11-13346
|
05/06/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for extension of time. Opening Brief and Appendix due May 26, 2011. | | 11-13419
|
05/12/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 11-14197
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. | | 11-14199
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. | | 11-14200
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. | | 11-14201
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. | | 11-14202
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. | | 11-14203
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. | | 11-14204
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 7. | | 11-14205
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8. | | 11-14206
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 9. | | 11-14207
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 10. | | 11-14210
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 11. | | 11-14211
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 12. | | 11-14212
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. | | 11-14213
|
05/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. | | 11-14214
|
06/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time First Request (Answering Brief). | | 11-17528
|
06/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Answering Brief due: July 13, 2011. | | 11-17662
|
07/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 11-20931
|
07/15/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: August 12, 2011. | | 11-21299
|
08/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension Of Time (Third Request). | | 11-24487
|
08/26/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: September 12, 2011. | | 11-26063
|
09/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File 36 Page Answering Brief. | | 11-27685
|
09/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We take no action on respondent's motion as it is unnecessary and direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's answering brief received on September 12, 2011. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 11-27888
|
09/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-27889
|
10/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-31697
|
10/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: November 14, 2011. | | 11-31773
|
11/09/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-34652
|
11/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
09/18/2012 | Motion | Filed Ex-Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed Under Seal. (SEALED) -Document UNSEALED per opinion filed 12/27/12.- | | 12-40881
|
09/24/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Ex-Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed Under Seal; and Motion to Unseal. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 9/25/12) -Document UNSEALED per opinion filed 12/27/12.- | | 12-40882
|
09/24/2012 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion for This Court to Seal the Opposition to Ex-Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed Under Seal. | | 12-30161
|
09/25/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall seal the opposition filed by the State on September 24, 2012, forthwith. | | 12-30203
|
09/25/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Reconsideration By Full Court. | | 12-30339
|
09/26/2012 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for this Court to Seal all Pleadings and Documents Related to the Ex-Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed in this Matter. | | 12-30416
|
09/27/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for This Court to Seal All Pleadings and Documents Related to the Ex-Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed in This Matter. | | 12-30590
|
09/28/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Respondents' Pleadings, Motion for Order Directing Respondents' Conduct with exhibits attached (SEALED). -Document UNSEALED per opinion filed 12/27/12.- | | 12-40883
|
09/28/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Of Appearance And Notice Of Termination Of Representation (Rene Valladares & Lori Teicher of the Federal Public Defender's Office appearing on behalf of appellant Samuel Howard and in the place and stead of Franny Forsman and Mike Charlton of the Federal Public Defender's Office). | | 12-30803
|
10/03/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Respondent's Pleadings, Motion for Order Directing Respondent's Conduct. | | 12-31270
|
10/08/2012 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to Emergency Motion under NRAP 27 (e) for this Court to Seal all Pleadings and Documents Related to the Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed in this Matter (SEALED). -Document UNSEALED per opinion filed 12/27/12.- | | 12-40884
|
10/25/2012 | Motion | Filed Supplement To Ex-Parte Motion For Subsitution Of Counsel. | | 12-33798
|
10/30/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion to Substitute Counsel. We therefore deny the motion to strike as to the opposition filed on September 24, 2012. We therefore defer ruling on the substitution. The Nevada FPD shall have 30 days to file a substitution that complies with NRAP 46(d)(2), and attorney Paola Armeni shall have 30 days to comply with SCR 42 and file a motion to associate the attorneys from the Federal Defender Services of Idaho. Fn1[Appellant's motion, filed on September 28, 2012, also asks the court to strike a motion filed by respondent on September 25, 2012, and to enter an order regarding respondent's conduct with respect to documents that appellant submitted to this court under seal. Those aspects of appellant's motion will be addressed separately.] Fn2[Because we do not address the merits of the alleged conflict or imputation of the conflict, we decline the State's request to remand for an evidentiary hearing on the motion.] Fn3[Current counsel must submit a substitution of counsel that complies with NRAP 46(d)(2) and to substitute foreign counsel, the substitution of counsel must be accompanied by a motion to associate that complies with SCR 42.] | | 12-34235
|
11/07/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion To Substitute Counsel and To Substitute Foreign Counsel (Paola M. Armeni, Esq. of Gordon and Silver, as local counsel, and Teresa A. Hampton and Brady Ward King of the Federal Defender Services of Idaho, as foreign counsel). | | 12-35263
|
11/08/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel (Brady Ward King, Esq. and Teresa Anne Hampton, Esq. of the Federal Defender Services of Idaho). | | 12-35307
|
11/15/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Substitution and Granting Motion to Associate Foreign Counsel. The Nevada Federal Public Defender's Office has filed a substitution of counsel, substituting Nevada attorney Paola M. Armeni and foreign counsel Teresa A. Hampton and Brady Ward King, with the Federal Defender Services of Idaho, as counsel for appellant. The substitution is approved. Ms. Hampton and Mr. King shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellant in this appeal. Nevada attorney Paola M. Armeni shall be responsible for all matters presented by appellant in this matter. | | 12-36288
|
12/27/2012 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Non-Dispositional Opinion. "Motion for reconsideration of order sealing documents granted; other motions denied." The clerk of this court shall unseal the documents filed on September 18, 2012; September 24, 2012; September 28, 2012; and October 8, 2012. Before Saitta, Pickering and Hardesty, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. NNP12 | | 12-40859
|
03/27/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers re: Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 56510, 55331/56701/56923, 57875, 59559, 57656, 57469, 58041 58048. (Letter entered in 56510 as document no. 13-09012.) | | |
09/19/2013 | Motion | Filed Application for Waiver of Fees Pursuant to Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42(3)(e) and (9). | | 13-28017
|
09/20/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Brady Ward King. | | 13-28188
|
09/30/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove Brady Ward King as counsel of record for appellant on this court's docket. We note that appellant remains represented by Teresa Hampton of the Federal Defender Services of Idaho and Nevada attorney Paola M. Armeni of Gordon Silver. | | 13-29116
|
09/30/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Waiving Fees Under SCR 42(3)(e). The application for waiver of the original fee required by SCR 42(3)(a) and annual renewal fee required by SCR 42(9) is granted. | | 13-29117
|
07/30/2014 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC | | 14-24922
|
08/21/2014 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 14-27559
|
09/24/2014 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 14-31639
|
10/20/2014 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 14-34812
|
10/20/2014 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/04/2014 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 24, 2014. | | 14-34812
|
12/22/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice for US Supreme Court. The filing for the petition for a writ of certiorari has been extended to February 21, 2015. | | 14-41799
|
03/03/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed February 23, 2015 and placed on the docket as Case No. 14-8546. | | 15-06700
|
04/30/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 15-13204
|