Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/08/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from McDonald Carano. Check no. 102990. | | |
09/08/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-30210
|
09/08/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 17-30212
|
09/11/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 17-30312
|
09/26/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 17-32674
|
09/26/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-32675
|
01/03/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-00307
|
01/03/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 8, 2018. | | 18-00309
|
02/08/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-05323
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume I. | | 18-05358
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume II. | | 18-05360
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume III. | | 18-05361
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IV part 1. | | 18-05397
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IV Part 2. | | 18-05398
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume V part 1. | | 18-05399
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume V Part 2. | | 18-05400
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VI part 1. | | 18-05401
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VI Part 2. | | 18-05402
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VI Part 3. | | 18-05403
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VII part 1. | | 18-05405
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VII Part 2. | | 18-05409
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VIII part 1. | | 18-05411
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VIII Part 2. | | 18-05412
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IX part 1. | | 18-05413
|
02/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IX Part 2. | | 18-05414
|
02/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume X. | | 18-05415
|
02/09/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XI. | | 18-05416
|
03/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of time for Respondents to file their Answering Briefs. | | 18-09456
|
03/15/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents Answering Briefs due: April 20, 2018. | | 18-10288
|
04/19/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney for Respondents State Engineer and Jason King (Justina Caviglia, Senior Deputy Attorney General in place of Micheline Fairbank, Senior Deputy Attorney General as counsel for Respondents). | | 18-15131
|
04/19/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondents Division of Water Resources, Department of Conservation, State Engineer and Jason King Answering Brief. | | 18-15181
|
04/20/2018 | Brief | Filed Intermountain Water Supply's Answering Brief. | | 18-15359
|
05/22/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-19407
|
05/22/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
05/23/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney for Respondent State Engineer (James Bolotin to replace Justina Caviglia as counsel for Respondents Jason King and Division of Water Resources, Department of Conservation.) | | 18-19705
|
07/11/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Tori N. Sundheim for Respondents, State Engineer and Jason King). | | 18-26339
|
09/26/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, November 7, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 18-37631
|
10/24/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-41885
|
11/06/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | 18-903118
|
11/07/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel (Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty) (SC) | | |
11/21/2018 | Brief | Filed State Engineer's Supplemental Brief in Respnose to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | 18-905233
|
03/07/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Intermountain Water Supply, Ltd.'s Motion for Substitution of Party. (SC) | | 19-10220
|
03/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall substitute IWS Basin as respondent in this appeal in place of Intermountain and shall modify the caption on the docket of this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. Counsel for IWS Basin shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve a notice of appearance. (SC) | | 19-10372
|
03/11/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Bradley J. Herrerma, Esq., of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Shcreck, LLP appearing as counsel for respondent IWS Basin, LLC. (SC) | | 19-10596
|
03/11/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Arthur A. Zorio, Esq., of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Shcreck, LLP appearing as counsel for respondent IWS Basin, LLC. (SC) | | 19-10597
|
03/12/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Respondent Jason King, Nevada State Engineer. (SC) | | 19-10811
|
03/12/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (James N. Bolotin withdraws as counsel for Respondents). (SC) | | 19-10813
|
03/13/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Substitution. Pursuant to the notice of substitution filed on March 12, 2019, Tim Wilson, P.E., is substituted in this matter in place of Jason King, P.E., as Nevada State Engineer. NRAP 43(c)(1). The clerk shall amend the caption accordingly. (SC). | | 19-11226
|
05/02/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Gibbons/Hardesty/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Gibbons/Pickering. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 13. NNP18-MG/JH/KP (SC) | | 19-19275
|
05/20/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Partial Rehearing Regarding the Court's Remand Instructions. (SC). | | 19-22080
|
05/20/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Debbie A. Leonard. (SC). | | |
05/20/2019 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Addendum to Appellant's Petition for Partial Rehearing Regarding the Court's Remand Instructions. (SC). | | 19-22081
|
05/31/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information. (SC) | | 19-23825
|
06/14/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 19-25786
|
07/09/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-29141
|
07/09/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
07/17/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 10, 2019. (SC) | | 19-29141
|