Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
03/19/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-10797
|
03/19/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 20-10800
|
03/19/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 20-10835
|
03/23/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Levine & Garfinkel. Check no. 15409. (SC) | | |
04/01/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 22, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-12421
|
04/08/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 20-13246
|
05/22/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 20-19705
|
05/27/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-20038
|
06/01/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Requested. (SC). | | 20-20490
|
06/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert L. Eisenberg as counsel for Appellant). (SC) | | 20-21004
|
08/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals and to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Nos. 80427/80831). (SC) | | 20-30566
|
08/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Regarding Briefing and Counsel. Shawn Bidsal shall have until September 24, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief in Docket No. 80427. CLA Properties LLC shall have 30 days from service of the opening brief in Docket No. 80427 to file and serve a combined answering brief in Docket No. 80427 and opening brief in Docket No. 80831. Bidsal shall have 30 days from service of CLA Properties' combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief in Docket No. 80427 and answering brief in Docket No. 80831. CLA Properties shall have 30 days from service of Bidsal's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief in Docket No. 80831. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-31160
|
09/23/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Daniel F. Polsenberg and Abraham G. Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP appear as counsel for appellant Shawn Bidsal. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-34996
|
09/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-34998
|
10/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Shawn Bidsal's opening brief and appendix due: October 23, 2020. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-36085
|
10/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-39035
|
10/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion for an Extension for The Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-39475
|
11/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief on Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-40271
|
11/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix in docket No. 80427 due: November 24, 2020. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-41126
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 1, Pages 1-250. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42922
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 2, Pages 251-500, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42923
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 3, Pages 501-750, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42925
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 4, Pages 751-1000, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42926
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 5, Pages 1001-1250. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42927
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 6, Pages 1250-1500, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42928
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 7, Pages 1501-1750, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42929
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 8, Pages 1751-2000, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42930
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 9, Pages 2001-2250. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42931
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 10, Pages 2251-2500, Part 1. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42932
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 11, Pages 2501-2750. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42933
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 12, Pages 2751-3000. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42934
|
11/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 13, Pages 3000-3078. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42935
|
11/24/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Shawn Bidsal's Opening Brief. (No. 80427) Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-42947
|
12/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Answering Brief (Frist Request). Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-45873
|
12/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 25, 2021. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 20-45910
|
01/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time for Combined Answering/Opening Brief (Second Request). Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-01567
|
01/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. CLA Properties LLC's combined answering brief and opening brief due: February 24, 2021. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-02780
|
02/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-05151
|
03/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-08462
|
03/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: April 23, 2021. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-08470
|
04/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-11579
|
04/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Shawn Bidsal shall have until May 24, 2021, to file and serve the combined reply brief in Docket No. 80427 and answering brief in Docket. No. 80831. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-12469
|
05/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (Reisman Sorokac, as attorneys of record in the place and stead of Levine & Garfinkel). Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-13141
|
05/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Substitution of Counsel. CLA Properties LLC has filed a substitution of counsel purporting to substitute the law firm of Reisman Sorokac in place of Levine & Garfinkel. The substitution is disapproved because it does not appear to be signed by both the withdrawing attorney and the new attorney. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-13730
|
05/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-14857
|
05/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Sean Bidsal shall have until June 23, 2021, to file and serve the combined reply brief in Docket No. 80427 and answering brief in Docket. No. 80831. fn1[These consolidated appeals do not involve a cross-appeal.] Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-15417
|
06/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (Respondent/Appellant CLA Properties, LLC hereby substitutes the law firm of Reisman Sorokac, as attorneys of record in the place and stead of Levine & Garfinkel). Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-16214
|
06/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-18156
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Shawn Bidsal has filed a motion requesting a fourth extension of time to file his combined brief. The motion is granted. Bidsal shall have until July 23, 2021, to file and serve the combined reply brief in Docket No. 80427 and answering brief in Docket. No. 80831. (SC) | | 21-19231
|
07/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Combined Reply Brief in Docket No. 80427 and Answering Brief in Docket No. 80831. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-21422
|
08/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Reply Brief. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-24377
|
08/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 09/22/21 in case no. 80831. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-24382
|
09/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief in Docket Number 80831. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 21-25706
|
09/03/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | |
01/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 22-02923
|
03/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. Nos 80427/80831. (SC) | | 22-08571
|
04/01/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. CLA Properties LLC shall have until April 18, 2022, to file and serve the petition for rehearing. Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 22-10152
|
04/18/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing (80831). Nos. 80427/80831 (SC) | | 22-12169
|
04/18/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert L. Eisenberg. (SC) | | |
05/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing denied in Docket No. 80831." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 80427/80831. (SC) | | 22-13981
|
06/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-17310
|
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 2, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17310
|