Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/29/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
07/29/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-31789
|
07/29/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-31791
|
07/29/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-31881
|
07/30/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Michael Lehners. Check no. 6598. (SC) | | |
07/30/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC). | | 19-32096
|
10/14/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. This case is still under consideration for the settlement program. (SC) | | 19-42476
|
01/10/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. After lengthy discussions with counsel over the time the case has been in the settlement program, it is now apparent that this case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 20-01220
|
01/16/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-02301
|
01/23/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-03281
|
01/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC). | | 20-03717
|
02/13/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 20-06062
|
02/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-06472
|
02/25/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC). | | 20-07524
|
04/15/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-14417
|
04/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1. (SC) | | 20-14500
|
04/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2. (SC) | | 20-14503
|
04/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3. (SC) | | 20-14505
|
04/16/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit Certificate of Service (Appellants' Opening Brief). (SC) | | 20-14545
|
05/15/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: May 29, 2020. (SC) | | 20-18655
|
05/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Motion). (SC) | | 20-20367
|
06/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: June 29, 2020. (SC). | | 20-20583
|
06/17/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Of Disassociation. (SC) | | 20-22562
|
06/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Motion). (SC) | | 20-24062
|
07/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until July 29, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-24757
|
07/10/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Melanie D. Morgan, Esq. of the Law Firm of Akerman, LLP Appearing as Counsel for Respondent Federal Notion al Mortgage Association. (SC) | | 20-25449
|
07/29/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-27711
|
08/19/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 8/19/2020) (SC) | | |
08/19/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.. (SC) | | 20-30609
|
08/20/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-30735
|
08/21/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 20-36107
|
10/01/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/16/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the entire judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
03/04/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record. (SC) | | 21-06366
|
03/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for appellants has filed, in the Court of Appeals, a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The clerk shall file this document in this court. The clerk shall file a copy of this order in both courts. The motion to withdraw is granted. The clerk shall remove Michael C. Lehners as counsel of record for appellants. On March 5, 2021, appellants submitted in this court a pro se petition for review. This court construes the submission of this document as notification that appellants wish to proceed in this appeal pro se. The clerk shall file the petition for review received on March 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07134
|
03/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record. (Appellants counsel) (SC) | | 21-07137
|
03/11/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals | | |
03/11/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Appellants Patricia Anthony and William Anthony Claim Notice (in lieu of Petition) for Review. (SC) | | 21-07138
|
04/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice Extension Claims of New Discovery Regarding Claim Notice (in lieu of Petition) for Review. (SC) | | 21-09628
|
04/12/2021 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 21-10519
|
04/12/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-10520
|
04/12/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/27/2021 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document: "Extension Claims of more new Discovery; Re-instate expunged Testimony/Public Records: Claim Notice (in lieu of Petition) for review". (SC) | | 21-12007
|
05/07/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-10520
|