Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/09/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
09/09/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-37533
|
10/15/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. (SC) | | 19-42686
|
11/09/2019 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed copy of minute order from the November 5, 2019 hearing in which Michael D. Lasher was confirmed as counsel for Appellant. (SC) | | 19-46143
|
11/18/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Setting Briefing Schedule. The clerk of this court shall add Michael D. Lasher as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Appellant's Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC). | | 19-47154
|
12/02/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/08/19, 02/05/19, 02/26/19, 06/11/19, 06/17/19, 06/18/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19, 07/25/19. To Court Reporter: Dept. 29. (SC). | | 19-48741
|
12/02/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC). | | 19-48765
|
12/12/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Melissa Murphy-Delgado stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/08/19, 01/22/19, 02/05/19, 02/26/19, 06/11/19, 06/17/19, 06/18/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 08/13/19. (SC) | | 19-50294
|
03/09/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 03/09/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
03/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Opening Brief). (SC) | | 20-09243
|
03/12/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-09920
|
03/12/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes 1-10 (REJECTED PER 3/13/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
03/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-09958
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 1. (SC) | | 20-10320
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 2. (SC) | | 20-10322
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 3. (SC) | | 20-10323
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 4. (SC) | | 20-10324
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 5. (SC) | | 20-10325
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 6. (SC) | | 20-10326
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 7. (SC) | | 20-10327
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 7. (SC) | | 20-10328
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 8. (SC) | | 20-10329
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 9. (SC) | | 20-10330
|
03/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief AA Vol 10. (SC) | | 20-10331
|
04/13/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-13817
|
04/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-13819
|
04/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-13820
|
04/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Bail On Appeal. (SC) | | 20-15061
|
05/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Bail. Appellant has filed a motion for bail pending appeal. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 20-16540
|
05/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief (REJECTED PER 5/4/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
05/04/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Reply brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-16797
|
05/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-16829
|
05/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/17/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand. We remand this case to the district court for the limited purpose of conducting an evidentiary hearing to consider the merits of Dorado's motion in the first instance. We retain jurisdiction over all other issues raised by Dorado.The district court shall have 90 days from the date of this order to conduct the evidentiary hearing and enter a written order. The district court clerk shall transmit the written order to this court within 5 days after it is entered. (SC) | | 20-30339
|
09/08/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Letter Bench Memo Concerning Proper Standard to Evaluate Pre-Indictment Delay in Charging. (SC) | | 20-32890
|
12/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On August 17, 2020, this court entered an order that remanded this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of conducting an evidentiary hearing on appellant's motion to dismiss the indictment for preindictment delay and lack of jurisdiction. The district court judge was directed to conduct the evidentiary hearing and enter an order resolving the motion within 90 days. The district court's order on limited remand is now overdue. The district court judge shall have 7 days from the date of this order to comply with the August 17, 2020, order or inform this court that additional time is needed to comply with the order. The district court clerk shall transmit a copy of the written order to this court within 5 days after entry of the order. (SC) | | 20-43619
|
12/08/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Motion. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/2/2020, requests for Extension of Time in Regards to Orders dated 08/17/2020 & 12/02/2020 - C323098. (SC) | | 20-44527
|
12/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The district court shall have until December 30, 2020, to enter the order on limited remand. The clerk of the district court shall transmit a copy of the written order to the clerk of this court within 5 days of entry of the order. (SC) | | 20-44660
|
12/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant Ramon Dorado's Motion to Supplement Pleadings and the Record on Appeal. (SC) | | 20-46321
|
12/30/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Pre-Indictment Delay and Lack of Jursidiction After Limited Remand from Nevada Supreme Court. Certified copy of order filed in district court on December 29, 2020. (SC) | | 20-46943
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief that does not exceed 10 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation and a supplemental appendix containing the transcripts of the proceedings conducted in November and December of 2020. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of appellant's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief that does not exceed 10 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation. Appellant shall have 14 days from service of respondent's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief that does not exceed 5 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation. (SC) | | 21-00641
|
01/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Brief/Supplemental. (SC) | | 21-01895
|
01/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 1, 2021, to file and serve a supplemental opening brief that does not exceed 10 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation and a supplemental appendix containing the transcripts of the proceedings conducted in November and December of 2020. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of appellant's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief that does not exceed 10 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation. Appellant shall have 14 days from service of respondent's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief that does not exceed 5 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation. (SC) | | 21-02191
|
02/24/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-05449
|
02/24/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Amended Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-05459
|
02/24/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Amended Index to Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-05491
|
02/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 21-05670
|
03/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-08828
|
10/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for December 7, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-30663
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-33784
|
11/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument. (SC) | | 21-33873
|
12/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Amended Index to Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-34387
|
12/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Opposition to Motion To Strike Portions of Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-34551
|
12/07/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day before the en banc court. Case submitted for decision. (SC) | | |
02/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to strike a portion of appellant's supplemental appendix. The motion is denied. fn1[The title of the motion indicates that respondent seeks to strike a portion of appellant's amended index to the supplemental appendix. However, as the motion actually seeks to strike documents within the appendix, not merely the index, the motion is treated as a motion to strike a portion of the supplemental appendix.] (SC) | | 22-06104
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED." NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC) | | 22-06165
|
03/22/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-08933
|
03/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08933
|