Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Concerning Implementation by Justice Courts of Governor's Emergency Directive 008 Regarding Evictions. (AO-0012) | | 20-13504
|
03/21/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Administrative order regarding court operations under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related coronavirus filed in the Carson City Justice/Municipal Court on March 16, 2020. | | 20-13305
|
03/21/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Administrative order regarding the temporary reduction of public hours of the Clerk's Offices and Juvenile Services and allowing of electronic submittal of court documents under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related coronavirus filed in the Carson City Justice/Municipal Court on March 20, 2020. | | 20-13315
|
03/21/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Administrative order regarding staying of eviction and foreclosure matters under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related Coronavirus filed in the Justice Court of Carson Township on April 1, 2020. | | 20-13317
|
03/21/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary reduction of public hours of the Clerk's Offices and allowing of electronic submittal of court documents under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related Coronavirus filed in the Storey County and the Virginia Township Justice Court on March 24, 2020. (Administrative Order). | | 20-13433
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Justice Court of Incline Village-Crystal Bay Township Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Incline Village-Crystal Bay Township (Washoe) on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order). | | 20-13351
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Incline Village-Crystal Bay Township Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Incline Village-Crystal Bay Township (Washoe) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-2). | | 20-13353
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Amended administrative order in response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) transmission filed in the Justice Court of Reno Township (Washoe) on March 19, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-3). | | 20-13365
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) and Nevada Supreme Court Order AO-0012 filed in the Justice Court of Reno Township (Washoe) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-4). | | 20-13367
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Sparks Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-1). | | 20-13371
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Sparks Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on March 20, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-2). | | 20-13374
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Amended order regarding Sparks Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on April 2, 2020. (Amended Administrative Order 2020-2). | | 20-13377
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Sparks Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-3). | | 20-13378
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Sparks Municipal Court response to Coronavirus (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Sparks (Washoe) on March 17, 2020. (Judicial/Administrative Order). | | 20-13369
|
03/22/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Wadsworth Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Wadsworth Township (Washoe) on March 19, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-01). | | 20-14056
|
03/23/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order in regards to the 3rd JD, the Dayton Township Justice Court, Canal Township Justice Court, and Walker River Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 3rd JD. (Administrative Order 20-01). | | 20-13407
|
03/23/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the 3rd JD, the Dayton Township Justice Court, Canal Township Justice Court, and Walker River Justice Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 3rd JD. (Administrative Order 20-02). | | 20-13410
|
03/24/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Eastline Township Justice Court and West Wendover Municipal Court regarding temporary procedures in criminal, civil, and traffic cases in response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Eastline Township Justice Court and West Wendover Municipal Court (Elko) on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-01). | | 20-13385
|
03/24/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Eastline Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Eastline Township (Elko) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-02). | | 20-13387
|
03/24/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Elko Township Justice Court and City of Elko Municipal Court regarding temporary procedures in criminal, civil, and traffic cases in response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Elko Township Justice/Municipal Court (Elko) on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-01). | | 20-14027
|
03/24/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Elko Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Elko Township on April 3, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-02). | | 20-14029
|
03/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order filed in the Justice Court of Beatty Township (Nye) on March 18, 2020. (Court No. 2020-1). | | 20-13413
|
03/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order filed in the Justice Court of Pahrump Township (Nye) on March 16, 2020. (Court No. 2020-1). | | 20-13414
|
03/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Amended administrative order regarding Pahrump Justice Court's response to Coronavirus (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Pahrump Township (Nye) on March 24, 2020. (Amended Administrative Order. 2020-1). | | 20-13415
|
03/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Pahrump Justice Court's response to Coronavirus (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Pahrump Township (Nye) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order. 2020-2). | | 20-13417
|
03/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Amended administrative order regarding the Tonopah Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Tonopah Township (Nye) on March 18, 2020. (Amended Administrative Order. 20-01). | | 20-13418
|
03/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Tonopah Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Tonopah Township (Nye) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order. 20-02). | | 20-13419
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Meadow Valley Township Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Meadow Valley Township (Lincoln) on March 31, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-01). | | 20-13403
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Meadow Valley Township Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Meadow Valley Township (Lincoln) on April 7, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-02). | | 20-13405
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Standing order regarding hearing with parties who are in custody filed in the Justice Court of Ely Township (White Pine) on March 16, 2020. | | 20-13420
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Standing order regarding COVID-19 (Coronavirus) precautions filed in the Justice Court of Ely Township (White Pine) on March 17, 2020. | | 20-13421
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Standing order regarding Ely Justice Court's response to COVID-19 filed in the Justice Court of Ely Township (White Pine) on March 26, 2020. | | 20-13422
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Ely Justice Court's additional response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Order Staying Eviction Proceedings filed in the Justice Court of Ely Township (White Pine) on April 1, 2020. | | 20-13424
|
03/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding appearances and testimony via audiovisual transmission equipment at preliminary hearings filed in the Justice Court of Ely Township (White Pine) on April 9, 2020. | | 20-13572
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Boulder Township Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Boulder Township Justice Court (Clark) on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-01). | | 20-13436
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal, civil, and traffic cases filed in the Justice Court, Henderson Township (Clark) on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order). | | 20-13477
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding unlawful detainer cases, including the supplemental remedy of summary eviction filed in the Justice Court, Henderson Township (Clark) on March 24, 2020. (Administrative Order). | | 20-13478
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court, Henderson Township (Clark) on April 2, 2020. (Administrative Order). | | 20-13481
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Henderson Municipal Court's procedures regarding the Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Henderson on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-02). | | 20-13483
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. 1st Amended order regarding the Henderson Municipal Court's procedures regarding the Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Henderson on March 31, 2020. (Amended Administrative Order 20-02). | | 20-13484
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporarily closing the traffic counter at the Regional Justice Center concerning access to Las Vegas Justice Court and Municipal Court facilities filed on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-04) | | 20-13506
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township on March 13, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-02). | | 20-13437
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal, civil and traffic cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-03). | | 20-13440
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal and civil cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-04). | | 20-13441
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on March 19, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-05). | | 20-13443
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding unlawful detainer cases, including the supplemental remedy of summary eviction filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on March 24, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-06). | | 20-13460
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Las Vegas Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Las Vegas Township (Clark) on March 31, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-07). | | 20-13462
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on April 3, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-08). | | 20-13463
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas (Clark) on March 16, 2020. (Ref: JO-2.48) | | 20-13468
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Amended order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas (Clark) on March 30, 2020. (Ref: JO-2.48 AMENDED) | | 20-13501
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) -updated matters filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas (Clark) on March 18, 2020. (Ref: JO-2.49) | | 20-13471
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas (Clark) on March 18, 2020. (Ref: JO-2.50) | | 20-13472
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas (Clark) on March 18, 2020. (Ref: JO-2.51) | | 20-13473
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas on April 16, 2020. (Ref: JO-2.52). | | 20-14637
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures for criminal, civil and traffic cases filed in the Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township (Clark). (Administrative Order 2020-02). | | 20-13488
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding unlawful detainer cases including the supplemental remedy of summary eviction filed in the Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township (Clark) on March 25, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-03). | | 20-13490
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding North Las Vegas Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of North Las Vegas Township (Clark) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-04). | | 20-13492
|
03/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Mesquite Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Mesquite Township (Clark) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-04). | | 20-13496
|
03/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the 9th JD, East Fork Justice Court, Tahoe Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 9th JD, East Fork Justice Court, Tahoe Justice Court (Douglas) on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-01). | | 20-13344
|
03/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Misdemeanor Treatment Court of the East Fork Justice Court filed in the East Fork Justice Court (Douglas) on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-02). | | 20-13345
|
03/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding East Fork Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the East Fork Township (Douglas) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-03). | | 20-13346
|
03/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Tahoe Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Tahoe Justice Court (Douglas) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-04). | | 20-13348
|
03/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding pandemic response (inmates) filed in the Justice Court of New River Township (Churchill) on March 12, 2020. (Administrative Order) | | 20-13327
|
03/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding pandemic response (court dates and times) filed in the Justice Court of New River Township (Churchill) on March 20, 2020. (Administrative Order) | | 20-13334
|
03/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding pandemic response (courthouse closure) filed in the Justice Court of New River Township (Churchill) on March 23, 2020. (Administrative Order) | | 20-13335
|
03/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding pandemic response (civil) filed in the Justice Court of New River Township (Churchill) on March 26, 2020. (Administrative Order) | | 20-13336
|
03/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding New River Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of New River Township (Churchill) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order) | | 20-13339
|
03/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Argenta Justice Court regarding temporary procedures in criminal, civil, and traffic cases in response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Argenta Justice Court (Lander) on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-01). | | 20-13390
|
03/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Argenta Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Argenta Township (Lander) on April 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-02) | | 20-13392
|
04/23/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal cases and civil cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on April 22, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-09). | | 20-15360
|
04/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Second amended order regarding the Henderson Municipal Court's Procedures regarding the Coronavirus Diesease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal court of the City of Henderson (Clark) on April 30, 2020. (2nd Amended Administrative Order 20-02) | | 20-16442
|
05/07/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Amended order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Updated Matters filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas on May 6, 2020. (JO-2.51 Amended) | | 20-17300
|
05/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding administrative matter regarding temporary procedures in criminal cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on May 26, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-10). | | 20-19905
|
05/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding administrative matter regarding temporary procedures in civil cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on May 28, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-11). | | 20-20308
|
05/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures for criminal, civil, and traffic cases filed in the Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township (Clark) on May 28, 2020. (Administrative Order# 2020-05) | | 20-20399
|
06/01/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding clerical error and the posting of bail filed in the Justice court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on June 1, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-12). | | 20-20532
|
06/02/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding the Las Vegas Municipal Court procedures regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas on June 1, 2020. (JO-2.53). | | 20-20798
|
06/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding Sparks Justice Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on June 2, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-5) | | 20-20960
|
06/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding face coverings and social distancing in response to COVID-19 filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on June 5, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-13). | | 20-21330
|
06/09/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in civil cases filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on June 5, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-6) | | 20-21607
|
06/17/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding face coverings and social distancing in response to COVID-19 filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on June 12, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-14). | | 20-22648
|
06/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding customer-service hours of the Las Vegas Justice Court filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on June 26, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-15). | | 20-23892
|
06/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding guidelines for administrative own recognizance releases for the Las Vegas Justice Court filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on June 30, 2020. (Administrative Order #18-04). | | 20-24182
|
07/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order in regards to temporary procedures in civil cases; collections and evictions was filed in the Justice Court of Sparks Township (Washoe) on July 7, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-7). | | 20-25097
|
07/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order regarding typographical signatures for electronic filing in civil cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township (Clark) on July 8, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-16) | | 20-25152
|
08/18/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order in regards revoking and replacing ADKT 20-001 for purposes of management of the Douglas County Judiciary during this extraordinary time. This order will remain in effect until modified or rescinded by subsequent order. It shall be reviewed by the Douglas County Judiciary not less than every 30 days. (Administrative Order #20-07). | | 20-30454
|
08/20/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order In The Administrative Matter Regarding Suspension of JCRLV 34(f)(3)(B); filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada on August 20, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-17) | | 20-30763
|
09/17/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Second Amended Order in the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Criminal, Civil, and Traffic Case filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada. (Administrative Order # 20-03). | | 20-34330
|
09/28/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Order Rescinding Administrative Order #20-03 filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada on September 28, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-18) | | 20-35603
|
10/21/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Judicial/Administrative Order In the Matter of the Las Vegas Municipal Court Procedures Regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Defendant Transports from the City of Las Vegas Detention Center. | | 20-38546
|
10/23/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Administrative Order 2020-8. In the Administrative Matter Concerning the Review and Consolidation of Prior Administrative Orders, and the Extension of the Moratorium on Evictions for Non-Payment of Rent. (Administrative Order 2020-8). | | 20-38958
|
11/24/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. Administrative Order 20-19. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Criminal Cases and Civil Cases. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada, November 24, 2020. | | 20-42869
|
11/30/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Matter of the Las Vegas Municipal Court Procedures Regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID 19). Filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas County of Clark on November 23, 2020. | | 20-43281
|
12/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Filed in Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada on December 2, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-06). | | 20-43927
|
12/17/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Matter of the Las Vegas Municipal Court Procedures Regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19). Filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas, County of Clark, State of Nevada (Administrative Order). | | 20-45710
|
01/05/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Civil Case. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada (Administrative Order #21-01). | | 21-00154
|
01/14/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Continuing Matter of the Las Vegas Municipal Court Procedures Regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19). Filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas County of Clark, State of Nevada. (Judicial/Administrative Order). | | 21-01177
|
02/17/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Filed in Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township on January 11, 2021. (Administrative Order 2021-01). | | 21-04632
|
02/17/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Filed in Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township on February 16, 2021. (Administrative Order 2021-02). | | 21-04633
|
03/23/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Filed in Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township on March 17, 2021. (Administrative Order 2021-01). | | 21-08350
|
04/01/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Civil Cases. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County Nevada. (Administrative Order #21-03). | | 21-09448
|
05/25/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Courtroom Assignments and Virtual Hearing. Filed May 20, 2021, in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada. (Administrative Order # 21-04). | | 21-14929
|
05/28/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Face Covings and Social Distancing In Response to Covid-19. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada on May 27, 2021. (Administrative Order # 21-05). | | 21-15322
|
06/10/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Civil Cases. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada on June 10, 2021. (Administrative Order # 21-06). | | 21-16750
|
06/24/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Filed in the Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township, Clark County Nevada on June 16, 2021. (Administrative Order 2021-04) | | 21-18234
|
07/20/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Face Coverings and Social Distancing in Response to COVID-19. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada on July 19, 2021. (Administrative Order # 21-07). | | 21-20791
|
07/20/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Filed in Justice Court, North Las Vegas, Clark County, Nevada on July 19, 2021. (Administrative Order #2021-05). | | 21-20886
|
07/22/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Continuing Matter of the Las Vegas Municipal Court Procedures Regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) Filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas, County of Clark, State of Nevada on July 21, 2021. | | 21-21229
|
07/28/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Customer-Service Hours of the Las Vegas Justice Court. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada on July 27, 2021. (Administrative Order # 21-08). | | 21-21856
|
08/25/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Criminal Cases Alleging Traffic Offenses. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County Nevada on August 25, 2021. (Administrative Order # 21-09). | | 21-24810
|
09/28/2021 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Face Coverings and Social Distancing in Response to COVID-19, filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada on September 28, 2021. (Amended Administrative Order # 21-07). | | 21-27941
|
02/11/2022 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Face Coverings and Social Distancing in Response to Covid-19. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada on February 10, 2022 (Amended Administrative Order # 22-01). | | 22-04610
|
02/22/2022 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In re: In the continuing Matter of the Las Vegas Municipal Court Procedures Regarding Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19). Filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas County of Clark, State of Nevada on February 16, 2022. | | 22-05739
|
03/30/2022 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding the Rescission of Administrative Order #21-09. Filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada on March 29, 2022. (Administrative Order #22-03). | | 22-09825
|
04/15/2022 | Administrative Case | Filed Notice. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Rescission of Obsolete Administrative Orders. Filed in Justice Court, Las Vegas Township Clark County, Nevada on April 12, 2022. (Administrative Order #22-04). | | 22-11945
|