Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from David P. Snyder. (SC) | | |
05/04/2023 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | Y | 23-14062
|
05/04/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-14063
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ Master Index to Petitioners' Appendix. (SC) | | 23-14065
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) | | 23-14068
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) | | 23-14069
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC) | | 23-14071
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC) | | 23-14072
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC) | | 23-14073
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC) | | 23-14074
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC) | | 23-14075
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC) | | 23-14076
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC) | | 23-14077
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC) | | 23-14078
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC) | | 23-14079
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC) | | 23-14080
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (SC) | | 23-14081
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14. (SC) | | 23-14082
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 15. (SC) | | 23-14083
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 16. (SC) | | 23-14084
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 17. (SC) | | 23-14085
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 18. (SC) | | 23-14086
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 19. (SC) | | 23-14087
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 20. (SC) | | 23-14089
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 21. (SC) | | 23-14090
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 22. (SC) | | 23-14091
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 23. (SC) | | 23-14092
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 24. (SC) | | 23-14093
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 25. (SC) | | 23-14095
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 26. (SC) | | 23-14096
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 27. (SC) | | 23-14097
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 28. (SC) | | 23-14098
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 29. (SC) | | 23-14099
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 30. (SC) | | 23-14101
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 31. (SC) | | 23-14102
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 32. (SC) | | 23-14103
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 33. (SC) | | 23-14104
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 34. (SC) | | 23-14105
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 35. (SC) | | 23-14106
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 36. (SC) | | 23-14107
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 37. (SC) | | 23-14108
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 38. (SC) | | 23-14110
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 39. (SC) | | 23-14111
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 40. (SC) | | 23-14112
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 41. (SC) | | 23-14116
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 42. (SC) | | 23-14117
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 43. (SC) | | 23-14119
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 44. (SC) | | 23-14120
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 45. (SC) | | 23-14122
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 46. (SC) | | 23-14124
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 47. (SC) | | 23-14125
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 48. (SC) | | 23-14126
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 49. (SC) | | 23-14128
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 50. (SC) | | 23-14130
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 51. (SC) | | 23-14133
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 52. (SC) | | 23-14135
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 53. (SC) | | 23-14136
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 54. (SC) | | 23-14138
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 55. (SC) | | 23-14140
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 56. (SC) | | 23-14141
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 57. (SC) | | 23-14143
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 58. (SC) | | 23-14144
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 59. (SC) | | 23-14145
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 60. (SC) | | 23-14146
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 61. (SC) | | 23-14147
|
05/04/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 62. (SC) | | 23-14149
|
05/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party In Interest's (Philip Morris USA Inc.) Response to Petitioners' Motion to Exceed Word Limit. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/11/23) (SC) | | |
05/11/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection for Response to Motion - No Notice of Appearance. Due in 5 days (SC) | | 23-14932
|
05/11/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Phillip Morris USA, INC.) Notice of Appearance for Ryan T. Gormley. (SC) | | 23-14944
|
05/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Philip Morris USA Inc.) Response to Petitioners' Motion to Exceed Word Limit. (SC) | | 23-14945
|
05/15/2023 | Motion | Filed Petitioners' Reply to Response Reply in Support of Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-15264
|
05/26/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1[ Petitioners have filed a motion to exceed word limit for petition for writ of mandamus. The motion is granted. The petition was filed on May 4, 2023.] (SC) | | 23-16632
|
06/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Phillip Morris USA) Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC) | | 23-17271
|
06/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Liggett Group, LLC) Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ and Joinder to Philip Morris USA Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time. (SC) | | 23-17680
|
06/16/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The motions of real parties in interest Philip Morris USA, Inc. and Liggett Group, LLC (collectively, Morris) for extensions of time to file their answers to the writ petition are granted. Morris shall have until August 22, 2023, to file and serve their answers. The answers of real parties in interest R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and ASM Nationwide Corporation remain due to be filed on or before June 23, 2023. (SC) | | 23-19110
|
06/23/2023 | Petition/Writ | Filed ASM Nationwide Corporation's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC). | | 23-20013
|
07/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. To date, R.J. Reynolds has failed to file an answer. R.J. Reynolds shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer. (SC) | | 23-23689
|
08/01/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company's Response to July 25, 2023 Order to File Document. (SC). | | 23-24705
|
08/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party In Interest's (Philip Morris USA Inc.) Motion to Associate Counsel for Elliott M. Davis. (SC) | | 23-25932
|
08/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party In Interest's (Philip Morris USA Inc.) Motion to Associate Counsel for Scott A. Chesin. (SC) | | 23-25934
|
08/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Associate Counsel. Mr. Davis and Mr. Chesin shall be permitted to appear on behalf of Philip Morris in this matter. Nevada attorney D. Lee Roberts, Jr. of Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Davis and Mr. Chesin in this matter. (SC) | | 23-27106
|
08/22/2023 | Petition/Writ | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Philip Morris USA, Inc.) Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC) | | 23-27378
|
08/22/2023 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Philip Morris USA, Inc.) Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-27379
|
08/22/2023 | Petition/Writ | Filed Real Party in Interest's (Liggett Group, LLC) Joinder and Answer to Writ Petition. (SC) | | 23-27421
|
08/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest Philip Morris USA, Inc.'s motion to file an answer to writ petition in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The answer was filed on August 22, 2023. (SC) | | 23-27871
|
09/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Petitioners' Stipulation to Extend Filing Deadline for Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (SC). | | 23-28911
|
09/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Petitioners' Motion to Modify Caption. (SC) | | 23-29521
|
09/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Petitioners have filed a motion to modify caption which this court construes as a motion to substitute personal representative. The motion is granted. The clerk shall amend the caption consistent with the caption on this order. The stipulation extending the time to file a reply in support of this writ petition is approved. Petitioners shall have until October 5, 2023, to file and serve any reply. (SC) | | 23-29851
|
10/04/2023 | Motion | Filed Petitioners' Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioners' Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-32536
|
10/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Petitioners shall have until November 3, 2023, to file and serve a reply in support of writ petition. (SC) | | 23-33523
|
10/31/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioners' Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH CLAGGETT & SYKES). (SC) | | |
10/31/2023 | Motion | Filed Petitioners' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-35417
|
11/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Petitioners shall have until November 13, 2023, to file and serve a reply in support of writ petition. (SC) | | 23-35903
|
11/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Petitioners' Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-36890
|
11/13/2023 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioners' Reply to Answer to Petition in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | | 23-36891
|
11/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Petitioners' Appendix to Reply to Writ - Master Index. (SC) | | 23-36894
|
11/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Petitioners' Appendix to Reply to Answer for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) | | 23-36895
|
11/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Petitioners' Appendix to Reply to Answer for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) | | 23-36896
|
11/20/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion to file a reply in support of writ petition in excess of the type-volume limit is granted. The reply and appendix were filed on November 13, 2023. (SC) | | 23-37641
|