Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/07/2018 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
11/07/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 18-903268
|
11/07/2018 | Other | Justice Michael A. Cherry disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties. (SC) | | |
11/21/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 18-905266
|
11/27/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 18-905889
|
03/07/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 19-10343
|
03/15/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 5, 2019. (SC) | | 19-11700
|
06/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 19-24001
|
06/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Permit Appellant to File Brief Exceeding 37,000 Words. (SC) | | 19-25907
|
06/14/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-25909
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC) | | 19-25917
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC) | | 19-25918
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC) | | 19-25921
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4. (SC) | | 19-26069
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5. (SC) | | 19-25923
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6. (SC) | | 19-25925
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7. (SC) | | 19-25927
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8. (SC) | | 19-25928
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9. (SC) | | 19-25929
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10. (SC) | | 19-25930
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 11. (SC) | | 19-25931
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12. (SC) | | 19-25932
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 13. (SC) | | 19-25933
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 14. (SC) | | 19-25935
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 15. (SC) | | 19-25936
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 16. (SC) | | 19-25938
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 17. (SC) | | 19-25940
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 18. (SC) | | 19-25941
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 19. (SC) | | 19-25942
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 20. (SC) | | 19-25944
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 21. (SC) | | 19-25945
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 22. (SC) | | 19-25946
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 23. (SC) | | 19-25947
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 24. (SC) | | 19-25948
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 25. (SC) | | 19-25949
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 26. (SC) | | 19-25950
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 27. (SC) | | 19-25951
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 28. (SC) | | 19-25952
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 29. (SC) | | 19-25953
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 30. (SC) | | 19-25954
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 31. (SC) | | 19-25956
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 32. (SC) | | 19-25957
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 33. (SC) | | 19-25958
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 34. (SC) | | 19-25959
|
06/14/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 35. (SC) | | 19-25960
|
06/24/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Appellant's motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on June 14, 2019. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the answering brief. (SC) | | 19-27040
|
07/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 19-31216
|
08/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 23, 2019. (SC). | | 19-33168
|
09/23/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-39449
|
10/23/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 19-43883
|
11/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until December 23, 2019, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 19-45764
|
12/19/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-51357
|
12/19/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
07/09/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC). | | 20-25359
|
07/23/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 20-26971
|
05/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 28, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-14592
|
06/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-16984
|
06/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 77345. (SC) | | |
05/26/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 37. En Banc. (SC). | | 22-16711
|
05/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Megan Hopper-Rebegea; Jocelyn Murphy and Emma Smith. (SC) | | 22-16826
|
06/13/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-18719
|
06/13/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-20833
|
07/14/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answer to the petition for rehearing due: July 29, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22200
|
07/18/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Afshar. (SC) | | 22-22496
|
07/18/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-22498
|
08/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-24397
|
08/30/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-27118
|
08/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC) | | |
09/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2022. (SC) | | 22-27118
|