Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81129
Short Caption:U.S. BANK N.A. VS. THUNDER PROPERTIES, INC. (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Court of Appeals
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/29/2021 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/29/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2020Filing FeeFiling fee due. (SC)
05/05/2020Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and the Honorables Ronald M. Gould, Carlos T. Bea, and Michelle T. Friedland, Circuit Judges. (SC)20-16906
05/11/2020Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 26001713 returned to Akerman LLP/Las Vegas. (SC)
07/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jamie K. Combs as counsel for Appellant). (SC).20-26905
09/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Questions, Directing Briefing and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Appellant's Opening Brief due: 30 days. The parties shall submit a joint appendix. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date the opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant shall then have 21 days from the date the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. Appellant and respondents shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 14 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee. (SC)20-33515
09/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates, LTD. Check no. 22936. (SC)
09/17/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001736. (SC)
10/06/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief & appendix due: October 26, 2020. (SC)20-36625
10/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Second Request) (Opening Brief). (SC)20-39028
11/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is granted. Appellant's opening and joint appendix brief due: November 25, 2020. (SC)20-40823
11/25/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-43169
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)20-43170
12/15/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Supplemental Appendix (First Request). (SC)20-45426
12/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief and Appendix due: January 27, 2021. (SC)20-45477
01/25/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02322
01/29/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Amicus curiae SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's amicus brief due: February 16, 2021. (SC)21-02830
02/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Amended Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to a telephonic request received on January 29, 2021, amicus curiae SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC shall have until February 16, 2021, to file and serve its amicus brief, accompanied by written consent to file the amicus brief that is signed by all parties, or to file a motion for leave to file an amicus brief and the proposed amicus brief. (SC)21-04232
02/16/2021MotionFiled Stipulation and Consent to File Amicus Brief. (SC)21-04575
02/16/2021BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, in Support Respondent's Brief. (SC)21-04576
02/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Response to Amicus Brief. (SC)21-04744
02/18/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-04749
02/18/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Certification of Service of Unopposed Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Response to Amicus Brief. (SC)21-04785
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC has filed a stipulation by the parties providing written consent for it to file a brief of amicus curiae. SFR filed the amicus brief, in support of respondent, on February 16, 2021. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply brief. Any response to the amicus brief shall be included within the reply brief. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is denied as moot. (SC)21-05823
03/19/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 2, 2021. (SC)21-08005
04/02/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-09627
04/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 29, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)21-14088
05/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Lilith V. Xara of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for Appellant). (SC)21-15079
05/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Rex D. Garner and Jamie K. Combs are no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (SC)21-15081
06/14/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-17000
06/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Amicus Notice of Appearance for Diana S. Ebron. (SC)21-17202
06/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jacqueline A Gilbert. (SC)21-17222
06/29/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 81129. (SC)
12/08/2021AppendixFiled Amended Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 1. (SC)21-35008
02/03/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Question answered." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Hardesty/Herndon. Pickering, J., with whom Cadish and Silver, J.J., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3. En Banc. (SC).22-03627
02/14/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Thunder Properties, Inc.'s Petition for Rehearing due: March 8, 2022. (SC)22-04953
03/07/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing (Second Request). (SC)22-07265
03/16/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Thunder Properties shall have until March 22, 2022, to file and serve any petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)22-08347
03/22/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/22/22) (SC)
03/22/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Returning Rehearing Petition Unfiled. Filing fee was not submitted with petition. (SC)22-09048
03/22/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-09050
03/22/2022Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
03/28/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Amicus Curiae's Substitution of Counsel for Karen Hanks and Chantel Schimming. (SC)22-09519
03/29/2022MotionFiled Stipulation and Consent to File Amicus Curaie. (SC)22-09677
03/29/2022BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curaie SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-09678
04/05/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation and consent to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of respondent Thunder Properties, Inc.'s petition for rehearing. The stipulation is approved. NRAP 29(a). The amicus brief was filed on March 29, 2022. (SC)22-10537
04/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)22-10878
04/19/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's answer to petition for rehearing due: May 5, 2022. (SC)22-12382
05/05/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-14452
05/18/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)22-15756
06/06/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (FILED IN WRONG CASE)(SC)
06/17/2022RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)22-19196
06/17/2022Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)