Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/08/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from McDonald Carano. Check no. 29325. (SC) | | |
10/08/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-28978
|
10/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 21-28980
|
10/11/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 21-29167
|
10/22/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: November 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30476
|
10/22/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation. A resumed telephonic pre-mediation teleconference in this matter has been scheduled for November 18, 2021, at 8:30 AM. (SC) | | 21-30571
|
11/15/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-32798
|
11/30/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 16, 2021 at 11:15 am. (SC). | | 21-34212
|
03/10/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 14, 2022 at 8:30 am. The settlement judge request and recommends that the Court extend the time for filing of a final report in this matter for an additional 90 days. (SC). | | 22-07711
|
03/14/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to July 11, 2022. | | 22-07958
|
07/08/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. | | |
07/08/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 20, 2022, at 8:30 AM. Case Nos. 83598/84971. SJ requests additional 90 days to file final report. (SC) | | 22-21545
|
07/13/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to October 10, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22061
|
09/21/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 85358/83598/84971. (SC) | | 22-29614
|
09/21/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-29639
|
10/05/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 22-31465
|
11/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals. This court hereby consolidates these appeals. PAMPT, LLC shall have until December 20, 2022, to file and serve a combined opening brief in Docket No. 83598 and opening brief in Docket No. 85358. Kenneth F. Potashner; VTB Holdings, Inc.; Stripes Group, LLC; SG VTB Holdings, LLC; Juergen Stark; and Kenneth Fox (hereinafter collectively Potashner) shall have 30 days from service of PAMPT's combined brief to file and serve a combined answering brief in Docket No. 85398, answering brief in Docket No. 85358, and opening brief in Docket No. 84971. PAMPT shall have 30 days from service of Potashner's combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief in Docket No. 85398, reply brief in Docket No. 85358, and answering brief in Docket No. 84971. Potashner shall have 30 days from service of PAMPT's second combined brief to file and serve a reply brief in Docket No. 84971. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 22-35001
|
11/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Set Appellate Briefing Schedule. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 22-36268
|
11/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation to modify the briefing schedule in this matter. The stipulation is approved to the following extent. PAMPT, LLC shall have until January 12, 2023, to file and serve a combined opening brief in Docket No. 83598 and opening brief in Docket No. 85358. The stipulation is disapproved to the extent it purports to extend the due dates for the remaining briefs. The stipulation incorrectly suggests that the applicable type-volume limitations in this matter are those consistent with NRAP 28.1(e). NRAP 28.1 does not apply in this matter where no cross-appeals have been filed. To the extent the stipulation purports to allow the parties to file briefs in excess of the type-volume limitation, it is disapproved. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 22-36410
|
01/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant PAMTP, LLC's Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Combined Opening Brief (Brief attached). Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (DETACHED BRIEF PER 1/20/23 ORDER AND FILED)(SC). | | 23-01193
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01194
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01195
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01196
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01197
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01198
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01199
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01200
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01201
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01202
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01203
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 11 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01204
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 12 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01205
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01206
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01207
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01208
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 16 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01209
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 17 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01210
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 18 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01211
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 19 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01212
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 20 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01213
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 21 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01214
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 22 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01215
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 23 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01216
|
01/12/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 24 of 24. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC). | | 23-01217
|
01/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant PAMTP LLC's Motion to Associate Counsel Jordan Pietzsch. Nos 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-01363
|
01/19/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' VTB Holdings, Inc., Stripes Group, LLC, VTB Holdings, LLC, Juergen Stark, and Kennth Fox Notice of Appearance for Kelly Dove. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-01820
|
01/20/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. PAMTP, LLC has filed a motion to associate New York attorney Jordan L. Pietzsch of the law firm of Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP. The motion is granted. PAMTP, LLC has also filed a motion for leave to file a combined opening brief in Docket Nos. 83598 and 85358 that exceeds the permissible type-volume limitation. The motion is granted. The clerk shall detach the combined opening brief from the motion filed on January 12, 2023, and file it separately. Kenneth F. Potashner; VTB Holdings, Inc.; Stripes Group, LLC; SG VTB Holdings, LLC; Juergen Stark; and Kenneth Fox shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined answering brief in Docket No. 83598, answering brief in Docket No. 85358, and opening brief in Docket No. 84971. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-01979
|
01/20/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant PAMTP, LLC's Combined Opening Brief. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (FILED PER 1/20/23 ORDER) (SC) | | 23-01982
|
02/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadline. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-04101
|
02/10/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Combined Answering Brief in Docket 83598/85358 and Opening Brief in Docket 84971. Due: March 23, 2023. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-04145
|
03/23/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondents' (Kenneth F. Potashner; VTB Holdings, Inc.; Stripes Group, LLC; SG VTB Holdings, LLC; Juergen Stark; and Kenneth Fox) Combined Answering Brief (83598 & 85358) and Opening Brief (84971). Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-09053
|
03/23/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' (Kenneth F. Potashner; VTB Holdings, Inc.; Stripes Group, LLC; SG VTB Holdings, LLC; Juergen Stark; and Kenneth Fox) Appendix to Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-09060
|
03/23/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' (Kenneth F. Potashner; VTB Holdings, Inc.; Stripes Group, LLC; SG VTB Holdings, LLC; Juergen Stark; and Kenneth Fox) Appendix to Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Vol. 2. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-09062
|
03/23/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' (Kenneth F. Potashner; VTB Holdings, Inc.; Stripes Group, LLC; SG VTB Holdings, LLC; Juergen Stark; and Kenneth Fox) Appendix to Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Vol. 3. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-09063
|
04/10/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. PAMPT, LLC's combined reply brief in Docketing No. 85398, reply brief in Docket No. 85358, and answering brief in Docket No. 84971 due: May 8, 2023. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-10802
|
05/08/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant PAMTP, LLC's Combined Reply Brief (Nos. 83598 and 85358) and Answering Brief (No. 84971) Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-14575
|
05/08/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant PAMTP, LLC's Appendix for Combined Reply Brief (Nos. 83598 and 85358) and Answering Brief (No. 84971) Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-14576
|
06/05/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents represented by Snell & Wilmer shall have until June 21, 2023, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-17635
|
06/06/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Kenneth F. Potashner's reply brief due: June 21, 2023. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-17781
|
06/21/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondents' (VTB Holdings Inc., Stripes Group LLC, SG VTB Holdings LLC, Juergen Stark, and Kenneth Fox) Reply Brief. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-19703
|
07/11/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Kenneth Potashner) Motion for Substitution and Dismissal of PAMTP's Appeal. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-26357
|
08/15/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-26535
|
08/15/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Kenneth Potashner's) Proof of Service for Motion for Substitution and Dismissal of PAMTP's Appeal in Case No. 83598. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-26662
|
08/16/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Kenneth Potashner) Errata to Motion for Substitution and Dismissal of Pamtp's Appeal. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-26807
|
08/21/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's (Kenneth Potashner) Motion for Substitution and Dismissal of PAMTP's Appeal. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-27291
|
08/22/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-27313
|
08/23/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service for Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Substitution and Dismissal of PAMTP's Appeal. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-27568
|
08/28/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Kenneth F. Potashner shall have until September 11, 2023, to file and serve the reply to appellant's opposition to respondent's motion for substition and dismissal of PAMTP's appeal. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-27910
|
09/11/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Kenneth Potashner) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Substitution and Dismissal of PAMTP's Appeal in Case No. 83598. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-29721
|
09/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Kenneth Potashner filed a motion for substitution and dismissal of this appeal on August 14, 2023, and errata thereto on August 16, 2023.PAMPT, LLC, filed a response on August 21, 2023. This court granted an extension to file a reply on August 28, 2023, and on September 11, 2023, Potashner filed a notice of withdrawal of his motion. Accordingly, this court will take no action in regard to the motion for substitution and dismissal of appeal filed on August 14, 2023. Nos. 83598/84971/85358. (SC) | | 23-29901
|
10/25/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Disassociation of Counsel. (Jeff Silvestri's no longer counsel of record for PAMTP . Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 23-34845
|
01/22/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision before a panel of this court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 83598/84971/85358 (SC) | | 24-02286
|