Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie. Check no. 192594. (SC) | | |
05/03/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-19498
|
05/03/2019 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
05/03/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-19501
|
05/06/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 19-19708
|
05/07/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk - Confidential document (SEALED). (SC) | | |
05/07/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC) | | |
05/20/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/25/18. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 19-21887
|
05/24/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-22867
|
08/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extenion of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 19-36460
|
08/30/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 3, 2019. (SC) | | 19-36560
|
10/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 19-41151
|
10/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until November 4, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 19-41983
|
11/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension To File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 19-45309
|
11/05/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Peter S. Christiansen and Kendelee L. Works of Christiansen Law Offices as counsel for Respondent Aria Khiabani). (SC) | | 19-45511
|
11/05/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Aria Khiabani's Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 19-45515
|
11/21/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 4, 2019. (SC). | | 19-47657
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-49220
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2, Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49221
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-49222
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-49223
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-49224
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6 - Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49225
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7- Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49226
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-49227
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-49228
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-49229
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-49230
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-49231
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 13, Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49232
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 14. (SC) | | 19-49233
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 15. (SC) | | 19-49234
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 16. (SC) | | 19-49235
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 17. (SC) | | 19-49236
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 18. (SC) | | 19-49237
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 19. (SC) | | 19-49238
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 20. (SC) | | 19-49239
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 21. (SC) | | 19-49240
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 22. (SC) | | 19-49241
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 23. (SC) | | 19-49242
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 24. (SC) | | 19-49243
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 25. (SC) | | 19-49244
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 26. (SC) | | 19-49245
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 27. (SC) | | 19-49246
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 28. (SC) | | 19-49247
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 29. (SC) | | 19-49248
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 30. (SC) | | 19-49249
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 31. (SC) | | 19-49250
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 32. (SC) | | 19-49251
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 33. (SC) | | 19-49252
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 34. (SC) | | 19-49253
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 35. (SC) | | 19-49254
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 36. (SC) | | 19-49255
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 37. (SC) | | 19-49256
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 38. (SC) | | 19-49257
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 39. (SC) | | 19-49258
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 40. (SC) | | 19-49259
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 41. (SC) | | 19-49260
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 42. (SC) | | 19-49261
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 43. (SC) | | 19-49262
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 44. (SC) | | 19-49263
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 45. (SC) | | 19-49264
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 46, Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49265
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 47, Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49266
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 48, Part 1. (SC) | | 19-49267
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 49. (SC) | | 19-49268
|
12/04/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 50. (SC) | | 19-49269
|
12/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Portions of Opening Brief and Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 19-49271
|
12/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-49272
|
12/04/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-49273
|
12/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Opening Brief and Countermotion to Dismiss the Appeal. (SC) | | 19-50210
|
12/18/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply on Motion to Exceed Page Limit and Opposition to Countermotion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 19-51287
|
12/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 19-52198
|
12/27/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike Reply on Countermotion to Dismiss the Appeal. (SC) | | 19-52283
|
12/27/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Strike Reply and Countermotion to Submit Five-Page Reply. (SC) | | 19-52294
|
01/06/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Frist Request). (SC) | | 20-00706
|
01/13/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-01691
|
01/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. The opening brief was electronically filed and served on December 4, 2019. Having reviewed the parties' filings, this court grants the motion to exceed the type-volume limitation, denies respondents' counter-motion to dismiss the appeal, denies appellant's motion to strike respondents' reply in support of their counter-motion, and denies as moot respondents' counter-motion to submit a five-page reply. Respondents shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. The clerk shall file the portions of the opening brief and volumes 51 and 52 of the appendix, received on December 10, 2019, under seal. (SC) | | 20-02128
|
01/16/2020 | Brief | Filed Portions of Opening Brief (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 01/16/2020). (SC) | | |
01/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 51 (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 01/16/2020). (SC) | | |
01/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 52 (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 01/16/2020). (SC) | | |
03/06/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-08980
|
03/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents Answering Brief due: April 15, 2020. (SC). | | 20-10811
|
04/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC). | | 20-14141
|
04/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until April 27, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-15423
|
04/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Combined Moiton to Exceed Word Limit et. al. (Answering Brief). (SC). | | 20-15586
|
04/24/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-15596
|
04/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix- Volume 1. (SC). | | 20-15653
|
04/27/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed NRAP 26.1 Disclosure (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 20-15942
|
05/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' unopposed motion to exceed the type-volume limit for the answering brief, to include trial exhibits in the appendix, and to supplement the record with a verdict form is granted. The answering brief and appendix were filed on April 24, 2020. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief. (SC). | | 20-17514
|
06/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC). | | 20-21503
|
06/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 8, 2020. (SC). | | 20-21562
|
07/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-25258
|
07/13/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-25688
|
07/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 7, 2020. (SC). | | 20-26150
|
08/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal. (SC) | | 20-29224
|
08/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-29225
|
08/07/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief (Redacted). (SC) | | 20-29226
|
08/21/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation and to file portions of the reply brief under seal are granted. The redacted reply brief was filed on August 7, 2020. The clerk shall file the unredacted reply brief, received on August 13, 2020, under seal. (SC) | | 20-30876
|
08/21/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice No Longer Disqualified. Upon further review, Justice Parraguirre is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal. (SC). | | 20-37577
|
12/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 4, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 10 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC) | | 20-43871
|
12/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion and Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument. (SC) | | 20-45630
|
12/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Oral argument is rescheduled for March 1, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. (SC) | | 20-45837
|
01/08/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Arguing Attorney and Contact Information. (SC) | | 21-00633
|
02/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-04481
|
02/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 21-04843
|
02/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authority Under NRAP 31(e). (SC) | | 21-04849
|
03/03/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral Argument held this day (not submitted). Before the En Banc Court. 78701. (SC) | | |
04/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision to en banc court on the briefs filed herein as of the date of this order. (SC) | | 21-10273
|
08/19/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 42. En Banc. (SC). | | 21-24170
|
09/13/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-26333
|
09/13/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
10/19/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 14, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26333
|