+
Party Information
|
Role | Party Name | Represented By |
Appellant | Greenmart of Nevada NLV LLC | Margaret A. McLetchie
(McLetchie Law)
Alina M. Shell
(McLetchie Law)
|
Appellant | Lone Mountain Partners, LLC | Eric D. Hone
(Hone Law)
Moorea L. Katz
(Hone Law)
Joel Z. Schwarz
(Hone Law)
Jamie L. Zimmerman
(Hone Law)
|
Appellant | Nevada Organic Remedies LLC | David R. Koch
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
Steven B. Scow
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
Daniel G. Scow
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
Brody R. Wight
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
|
Respondent | Fidelis Holdings, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | GBS Nevada Partners, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Gravitas Nevada, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Medifarm, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Medifarm IV LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Nevada Holistic Medicine, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Nevada Pure, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Nuleaf Incline Dispensary, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Paradise Wellness Center, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | TGIG, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | The State of Nevada Department of Taxation | Ketan D. Bhirud
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
Aaron D. Ford
(Attorney General/Carson City)
Theresa M. Haar
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
David J. Pope
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
Steven G. Shevorski
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Tryke Companies Reno, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Respondent | Tryke Companies SO NV, LLC | Michael V. Cristalli
(Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC)
Dominic P Gentile
(Clark Hill PLLC)
John A. Hunt
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Ross J. Miller
(Clark Hill PLLC)
Vincent Savarese, III
(Clark Hill PLLC)
|
Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/25/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | 19-39850
|
09/25/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | 19-39854
|
09/25/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (Appellant Nevada Organic) (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Appellant Nevada Organic) (SC) | | 19-39855
|
09/25/2019 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Margaret A. McLetchie. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC) | | 19-39886
|
09/26/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Koch & Scow. Check no. 4025. (Appellant Nevada Organic) (SC) | | |
10/01/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Lone Mountain Partners) (SC) | | |
10/01/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellant Lone Mountain Partners) (SC) | | 19-40832
|
10/01/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Lone Mountain Partners) (SC) | | 19-40834
|
10/07/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hone Law. Check no. 1053. (Appellant Lone Mountain Partners) (SC) | | |
10/09/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC) | | 19-41837
|
10/16/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-42921
|
10/28/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Motion to Suspend the Preliminary Injunction Issued Against The State of Nevada, Department of Taxation Pending Appeal, Pursuant to NRAP 8. (SC) | | 19-44338
|
10/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC) | | 19-44525
|
10/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 79668/79669/79670/79671/79672/79673. (SC) | | 19-44537
|
11/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada's Motion for Leave to File Motion in Excess of Page/Type Volume Limitation. (SC) | | 19-46123
|
11/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada's Motion to Suspend Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 19-46124
|
11/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions. (SC) | | 19-46807
|
11/18/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV, LLC's motion for leave to file a motion in excess of the page limitation is granted. The motion to suspend preliminary injunction pending appeal was filed on November 8, 2019. Respondents' motion for an extension of time to file oppositions is granted to the following extent. Respondents shall have until November 22, 2019, to file and serve oppositions to the motions to suspend preliminary injunction and motion to expedite appeal. The motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to the motion to consolidate is denied at this time. (SC). | | 19-47176
|
11/22/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant Greenmart of Nevada NLV LLC's Notice Regarding Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-47932
|
11/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellant, Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Motion to Suspend the Preliminary Injunction Issued Against the State of Nevada, Department of Taxation Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 19-47961
|
11/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellant, Greenmart of Nevada LLC's Motion to Suspend the Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 19-47962
|
11/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Appellant, Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC) | | 19-47964
|
12/30/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Stay and Granting in Part Motion to Expedite. Appellants have filed motions to stay the injunction pending appeal. The motion is denied. Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC (NOR) has also filed a motion to expedite the briefing and disposition of this appeal. The request to set an expedited briefing schedule is denied. Due to the nature of the issues involved in this matter, requests for extensions of time to file briefs will not be viewed favorably and will not be granted absent extraordinary and compelling circumstances. NOR's request to expedite review of this appeal is granted. This court will expedite a disposition of this matter once briefing is completed. (SC) | | 19-52353
|
01/13/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-01635
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-01636
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-01637
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-01690
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-01639
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-01640
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC) | | 20-01641
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC) | | 20-01642
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC) | | 20-01643
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC) | | 20-01644
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC) | | 20-01645
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. (SC) | | 20-01646
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. (SC) | | 20-01647
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. (SC) | | 20-01648
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. (SC) | | 20-01649
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15. (SC) | | 20-01651
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16. (SC) | | 20-01650
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 17. (SC) | | 20-01652
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 18. (SC) | | 20-01655
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 19. (SC) | | 20-01657
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 20. (SC) | | 20-01659
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 21. (SC) | | 20-01661
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 22. (SC) | | 20-01662
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 23. (SC) | | 20-01663
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 24. (SC) | | 20-01664
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 25. (SC) | | 20-01665
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 26. (SC) | | 20-01666
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 27. (SC) | | 20-01667
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 28. (SC) | | 20-01668
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 29. (SC) | | 20-01669
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 30. (SC) | | 20-01670
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 31. (SC) | | 20-01671
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 32. (SC) | | 20-01672
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 33. (SC) | | 20-01673
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 34. (SC) | | 20-01674
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 35. (SC) | | 20-01675
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 36. (SC) | | 20-01676
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 37. (SC) | | 20-01677
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 38. (SC) | | 20-01678
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 39. (SC) | | 20-01680
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 40. (SC) | | 20-01681
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 41. (SC) | | 20-01684
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 42. (SC) | | 20-01682
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 43. (SC) | | 20-01685
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 44. (SC) | | 20-01686
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 45. (SC) | | 20-01687
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 46. (SC) | | 20-01688
|
01/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 47. (SC) | | 20-01689
|
01/23/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Notice of Joinder to Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies LLC's Appendices Volumes 1 - 47. (SC) | | 20-03345
|
01/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 20-03352
|
01/23/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Joel Z. Schwarz of H1 Law Group hereby appears as counsel of record for Lone Mountain. (SC) | | 20-03371
|
01/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-03372
|
01/23/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-03374
|
01/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Lone Mountain shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve its opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-04157
|
02/06/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-05211
|
02/12/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-05852
|
02/12/2020 | Brief | Filed The State of Nevada ex rel. Department of Taxation's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-05905
|
02/24/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief (regarding GreenMart of Nevada NLV's LLc's Opening Brief). (REJECTED PER 02/24/20 NOTICE). (SC). | | |
02/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Answering Brief regarding GreenMart of Nevada NLV's LLc's Opening Brief) (SC). | | 20-07458
|
02/24/2020 | Brief | Filed The State of Nevada ex rel. Department of Taxation's Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-07459
|
02/25/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief (regarding GreenMart of Nevada NLV's LLc's Opening Brief). (SC). | | 20-07532
|
02/25/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-07533
|
03/06/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief regarding Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-09066
|
03/13/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Opening Brief (Reply Brief). (SC). | | 20-10041
|
03/25/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-11544
|
04/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Reply Brief in Support of Opening Brief on Appeal (REJECTED PER 4/3/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
04/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief (Appellant Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Reply Brief). Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-12801
|
04/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Reply Brief in Support of Opening Brief on Appeal. (SC) | | 20-12833
|
04/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant Lone Mountain Partners, LLC's Supplemental Appendix to Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-12834
|
04/06/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Serenity Wellness Center, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Serenity Wellness Center, LLC from Interlocutory Appeal. (SC) | | 20-18631
|
05/20/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. The parties shall have 7 days from the date of this order to advise this court of any potential conflict or impact due to my participation in this case or file a motion for disqualification based on my disclosure. (SC). | | 20-19126
|
05/22/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondent Serenity Wellness Center LLC's Motion to Dismiss Serenity Wellness Center LLC from Interlocutory Appeal. (SC) | | 20-19686
|
05/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. (SC) | | 20-19982
|
05/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Voluntary Recusal. Justice Silver has voluntarily recused herself from this matter. (SC) | | 20-20401
|
06/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss in Part. Respondent Serenity Wellness Center, LLC (Serenity) has filed a motion to dismiss itself as a respondent because it has been dismissed from the underlying district court proceedings. The motion is granted and Serenity is dismissed from this appeal. The clerk shall modify the caption accordingly. (SC) | | 20-21076
|
06/11/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice No Longer Disqualified. Justice Parraguirre is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal. (SC). | | 20-21845
|
09/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Serenity Wellness Center LLC and State of Nevada Dept. of Taxation) Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-33815
|
09/21/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal (SC) | | 20-34717
|
10/02/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP20-RP/JH./EC (SC) | | 20-36258
|
10/28/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-39410
|
10/28/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/24/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 29, 2020. (SC) | | 20-39410
|