Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/27/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
11/27/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 17-40588
|
11/27/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 17-40592
|
11/29/2017 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert | | |
11/30/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 17-41255
|
11/30/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin. | | 17-41316
|
12/06/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Copper Ridge Cmty. Ass'n) | | |
12/06/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellant Copper Ridge Cmty. Ass'n) | | 17-41915
|
12/06/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Copper Ridge Cmty. Ass'n) | | 17-41918
|
12/06/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Copper Ridge Cmty. Ass'n) | | 17-41921
|
12/06/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen & Sanders. Check no. 202824. (Appellant Copper Ridge Cmty. Ass'n) | | |
12/11/2017 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 202860 in the amount of $250 returned to Law Offices Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen & Sanders. | | |
12/18/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 18, 2018, at 9:00 am. | | 17-43609
|
12/18/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Joint Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-43730
|
12/19/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Kelly Dove as counsel for the Respondent Wells Fargo Bank). | | 17-43877
|
01/03/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice to file the case appeal statement. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. | | 18-00259
|
01/03/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant Copper Ridge Community Association's Case Appeal Statement. | | 18-00353
|
01/22/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Robert Noggle to replace Michael Bohn as counsel for the Respondent NV West Servicing). | | 18-02749
|
02/09/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 18-05501
|
02/13/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 18-05828
|
02/28/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 18-07841
|
05/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). | | 18-18521
|
05/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 28, 2018. | | 18-18523
|
05/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion To Extend Time To File Appellant's Opening Brief And Appendix (First Request). | | 18-18574
|
05/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Copper Ridge Community Association's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 29, 2018. | | 18-18589
|
05/22/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Opening Brief. | | 18-19386
|
05/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. | | 18-19388
|
05/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. | | 18-19391
|
05/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. | | 18-19393
|
05/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. | | 18-19394
|
05/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. | | 18-19397
|
05/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. | | 18-19399
|
05/29/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant Copper Ridge Community Association's Substantive Joinder To Apellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Opening Brief. | | 18-20406
|
06/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). | | 18-22856
|
06/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 30, 2018. | | 18-22859
|
06/27/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent NV West Servicing LLC's Answering Brief. | | 18-24562
|
06/27/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume I. | | 18-24563
|
06/27/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume II. | | 18-24579
|
06/27/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Volume III. | | 18-24572
|
07/30/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent U.S. Bank, N.A.'s Answering Brief. | | 18-29258
|
07/30/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent U.S. Bank, N.A.'s Supplemental Appendix Volume 1. | | 18-29259
|
07/30/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent U.S. Bank, N.A.'s Supplemental Appendix Volume 2. | | 18-29260
|
08/29/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief. | | 18-33817
|
08/29/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 28, 2018. | | 18-33820
|
10/01/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-38225
|
10/01/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
10/12/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant Copper Ridge Community Association's Substantive Joinder to Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Reply Brief. | | 18-40069
|
10/31/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. | | 18-42806
|
11/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. (SC) | | 18-903113
|
11/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. (SC) | | 18-903683
|
11/15/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Respondent U.S. Bank's motion for leave to file a sur-reply is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the sur-reply received via e-flex on October 31, 2018. Appellants' request, in their response to U.S. Bank's motion, that they be granted leave to file a response to the sur-reply, is denied. (SC) | | 18-904381
|
11/15/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Sur-Reply Brief. (SC) | | 18-904382
|
04/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 6, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 19-14732
|
04/22/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 19-17584
|
04/22/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | 19-17665
|
04/24/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Andrew M. Jacobs for Respondent U.S. Bank, N.A.). (SC) | | 19-18048
|
04/29/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument Under NRAP 46(a)(2) (Athanasios E. Agelakopoulos as Primary and Jacqueline A. Gilbert as Alternative for Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC). (SC) | | 19-18651
|
05/06/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
09/26/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 45. EN BANC. (SC) | | 19-40056
|
10/21/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-43474
|
10/21/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/08/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 29, 2019. (SC) | | 19-43474
|